Hardwick v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Linda Hardwick
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2020cv00343
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Douglas R Cole
Referring Judge: Michael J Newman
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:425
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman. Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole on 9/30/20. (sct)
September 29, 2020 Filing 5 JOINT CONSENT OF THE PARTIES TO PROCEED BEFORE THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE . (Ochoa, Susana)
September 1, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Susana Ochoa for Defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Ochoa, Susana)
August 20, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Commissioner of Social Security answer due 10/19/2020. (kma)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Linda Hardwick. (kma)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER GRANTING #1 PLAINTIFF'S Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperiA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 8/19/2020. (dm)
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Linda Hardwick. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 SS ID Form, #4 Summons Form Commissioner of Social Security, #5 Summons Form Attorney General, #6 Summons Form Regional Chief Counsel, #7 Summons Form US Attorney Office, #8 US Marshal) (Nicholson, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hardwick v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Hardwick
Represented By: John T Nicholson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John J. Stark
Represented By: Susana Ochoa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?