Tackett v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Melanie Tackett
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2020cv00348
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Ovington
Referring Judge: Thomas M Rose
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Commissioner of Social Security. Commissioner of Social Security's answer due 12/18/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 10/16/2020. (lk)
October 15, 2020 Filing 5 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer New date requested 12/18/2020. by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Kellup, Kiywhanna)
September 1, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Kiywhanna LaChic Kellup for Defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Kellup, Kiywhanna) Modified Attorney Role on 9/2/2020 (rp).
August 20, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Commissioner of Social Security answer due 10/19/2020. (kma)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Melanie Tackett. (kma)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 8/20/2020. (lk)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Melanie Tackett. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint) (Yocum, Mindy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tackett v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John J. Stark
Represented By: Kiywhanna LaChic Kellup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie Tackett
Represented By: Mindy Yocum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?