Dumont v. Sun Communities, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Tierney Dumont
Defendant: Sun Communities, Inc., Ohio Department of Medicaid, Oakwood Village and Oakwood Village, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00350
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Walter H Rice
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #7 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim filed by Sun Communities, Inc.. (Kern, David)
September 21, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #3 Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Ohio Department of Medicaid filed by Ohio Department of Medicaid. (McCandlish, Joseph)
September 10, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Sun Communities, Inc.. (Kern, David)
September 10, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Sun Communities, Inc.. (Kern, David)
August 20, 2020 Notice: If case is to be referred it will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman. (kma)
August 20, 2020 Case transferred in from Western Division at Cincinnati on 08/20/2020. Case Number 1:20-cv-642. Case assigned to Judge Walter H. Rice. (eh)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 8/20/20. This case is hereby transferred from the docket of the Honorable Michael R. Barrett to the Office of the Clerk for reassignment to the Western Division of the Southern District of Ohio at Dayton. (eh)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND originally filed 7/23/2020 in Montgomery County Court of Common Pleas (Case No. 2020 CV02863) by Tierney Dumont against Oakwood Village, Oakwood Village, Inc., Ohio Department of Medicaid, Sun Communities, Inc. (eh)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Defendant Sun Communities, Inc.. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal, Civil and Supplemental Cover Sheets. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Kern, David)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Montgomery County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020 CV 02853 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7616127), filed by Sun Communities, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit State Court Filings) (Kern, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dumont v. Sun Communities, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tierney Dumont
Represented By: John R Hilgeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Communities, Inc.
Represented By: David Graham Kern
Represented By: Amy L Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Department of Medicaid
Represented By: Joseph Michael McCandlish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oakwood Village
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oakwood Village, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?