Longstreth v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Dawn Longstreth
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2020cv00359
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael J Newman
Referring Judge: Walter H Rice
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Michael J. Newman. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 10/7/20. (pb)
October 6, 2020 Filing 5 JOINT CONSENT OF THE PARTIES TO PROCEED BEFORE THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE . (Baltz, Shefali)
September 29, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Shefali Baltz for Defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Baltz, Shefali)
August 25, 2020 Reset Deadline: Commissioner of Social Security answer due 10/26/2020. (srb)
August 25, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Dawn Longstreth. (srb)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER GRANTING #1 PLAINTIFF'S Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 8/25/2020. (dm)
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Dawn Longstreth. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 SSA ID Form) (Rake, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Longstreth v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Longstreth
Represented By: Michael A Rake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John J. Stark
Represented By: Shefali Baltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?