BLS Trucking, Inc. v. Everest National Insurance Company
Plaintiff: BLS Trucking, Inc.
Defendant: Everest National Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00432
Filed: October 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Walter H Rice
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Everest National Insurance Company answer due 11/18/2020. (jmb)
October 28, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION for Leave to Plead by Defendant Everest National Insurance Company. (Gourash, Daniel)
October 26, 2020 If case is referred it will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington. (jmb)
October 26, 2020 Filing 5 (Copy of) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Everest National Insurance Company, filed by BLS Trucking, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) (Originally filed in the Common Pleas Court of Montgomery County, Case No. 20-cv-3782 on 10/02/2020) (jmb)
October 23, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Everest National Insurance Company, Everest RE Group identifying Corporate Parent Everest RE Group for Everest National Insurance Company.. (Moeller, Jeffrey)
October 23, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert D Anderle for Defendant Everest National Insurance Company (Anderle, Robert)
October 23, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel F Gourash for Defendant Everest National Insurance Company (Gourash, Daniel)
October 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Montgomery County Common Pleas, case number 20-cv-03782 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7721014), filed by Everest National Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Moeller, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BLS Trucking, Inc. v. Everest National Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Everest National Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel F Gourash
Represented By: Jeffrey Moeller
Represented By: Robert D Anderle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BLS Trucking, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?