Nugent v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Barbara Nugent
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2020cv00470
Filed: November 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Ovington
Referring Judge: Thomas M Rose
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. This case is referred to the US Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and order the entry of a final judgment in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 12/28/2020. (jmb)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 JOINT CONSENT OF THE PARTIES TO PROCEED BEFORE THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE . (Sorkin, Adam)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam R. Sorkin for Defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Sorkin, Adam)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Barbara Nugent. (kma)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Commissioner of Social Security answer due 2/5/2021. (kma)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 12/4/2020. (lk)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Case referred to Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington. (ss)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Barbara Nugent. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 SSA ID Form) (Rake, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nugent v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Adam R. Sorkin
Represented By: John J. Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Nugent
Represented By: Michael A Rake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?