United States of America v. Two Thousand, Six Hundred Fifty-Four and 00/100 Dollars ($2,654.00) in United States Currency et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Two Thousand, Six Hundred Fifty-Four and 00/100 Dollars ($2,654.00) in United States Currency, Six Thousand and 00/100 Dollars ($6,000.00) in United States Currency and Four Thousand and 00/100 Dollars ($4,000.00) in United States Currency
Case Number: 3:2021cv00099
Filed: March 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Rose
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Six Thousand and 00/100 Dollars ($6,000.00) in United States Currency. Six Thousand and 00/100 Dollars ($6,000.00) in United States Currency served on 9/28/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. (Grimes, Deborah)
March 29, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Four Thousand and 00/100 Dollars ($4,000.00) in United States Currency. Four Thousand and 00/100 Dollars ($4,000.00) in United States Currency served on 9/28/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. (Grimes, Deborah)
March 29, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Two Thousand, Six Hundred Fifty-Four and 00/100 Dollars ($2,654.00) in United States Currency. Two Thousand, Six Hundred Fifty-Four and 00/100 Dollars ($2,654.00) in United States Currency served on 9/28/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. (Grimes, Deborah)
March 24, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants (srb).
March 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form, #3 Summons Form, #4 Summons Form) (Grimes, Deborah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Two Thousand, Six Hundred Fifty-Four and 00/100 Dollars ($2,654.00) in United States Currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Two Thousand, Six Hundred Fifty-Four and 00/100 Dollars ($2,654.00) in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Six Thousand and 00/100 Dollars ($6,000.00) in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Four Thousand and 00/100 Dollars ($4,000.00) in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Deborah Diane Grimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?