Letner v. Internal Revenue Service
Petitioner: David C. Letner
Respondent: Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 3:2021cv00140
Filed: May 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael R Merz
Referring Judge: Thomas M Rose
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS #2 . It is hereby ORDERED that the Petition herein be dismissed without prejudice to refiling of a civil action for recovery of CARES Act stimulus money in the Northern District of Ohio. Petitioner is DENIED any requested certificate of appealability and the Court hereby certifies to the United States Court of Appeals that an appeal would be objectively frivolous and therefore should not be permitted to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 6-2-2021. (de)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
May 6, 2021 Filing 2 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - It is respectfully recommended that the Petition herein be dismissed without prejudice to refiling of a civil action for recovery of CARES Act stimulus money in the Northern District of Ohio. Because reasonable jurists would not disagree with this conclusion, it is also recommended that Petitioner be denied a certificate of appealability and that the Court certify to the Sixth Circuit that any appeal would be objectively frivolous and should not be permitted to proceed in forma pauperis. Objections to R&R due by 5/20/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz on 5/6/2021. (kpf)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
May 5, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Internal Revenue Service, filed by David C. Letner. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (pb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Letner v. Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David C. Letner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?