Carriage Homes Condominium at Willow Creek v. American Alternative Insurance Corporation
Plaintiff: Carriage Homes Condominium at Willow Creek
Defendant: American Alternative Insurance Corporation
Case Number: 3:2021cv00166
Filed: June 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Walter H Rice
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2021 Filing 8 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF THE PARTIES by Defendant American Alternative Insurance Corporation. (Kennedy, Katherine)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Daniel Caine as Co-Counsel. Co-Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 07/20/2021. (jmb)
July 19, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8408824) of Daniel Caine by Plaintiff Carriage Homes Condominium at Willow Creek. (Petroff, Ronald)
June 22, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Lynn Kennedy for Defendant American Alternative Insurance Corporation. (jmb)
June 22, 2021 Filing 5 (Copy of) ANSWER to #4 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by American Alternative Insurance Corporation.Originally filed in the Greene County Common Pleas Court on 06/15/2021, Case No. 2021CV0247). (jmb)
June 22, 2021 Filing 4 (Copy of) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against American Alternative Insurance Corporation, filed by Carriage Homes Condominium at Willow Creek. (Originally filed in the Greene County Common Pleas Court on 05/18/2021, Case No. 2021CV0247). (jmb)
June 22, 2021 Filing 3 CLERKS NOTICE TO PHV COUNSEL: Daniel Caine, Esq. (jmb)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) Modified on 7/13/2021 (pb).
June 22, 2021 If case is referred it will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Peter B. Silvain, Jr. (jmb)
June 17, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants American Alternative Insurance Corporation, Munich Reinsurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Munich Reinsurance Company for American Alternative Insurance Corporation.. (Kennedy, Katherine)
June 17, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Defendant from Greene County Ohio Court of Common Pleas, case number 2021CV0247 ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8366833), filed by American Alternative Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-Plaintiff's Complaint, #3 Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint, #4 Defendant's Notice of Appearance in State Court, #5 Defendant's Notice of Appearance in Federal Court) (Kennedy, Katherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carriage Homes Condominium at Willow Creek v. American Alternative Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carriage Homes Condominium at Willow Creek
Represented By: Daniel B. Caine
Represented By: Ronald R Petroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Alternative Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Katherine Lynn Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?