Hudgins v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Betty Hudgins
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2021cv00210
Filed: August 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael J Newman
Referring Judge: Peter B Silvain
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2021 Filing 5 First CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD filed by Defendant Statement of Errors due by 11/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Court Transcript 09-28-2021, #2 Documents Related to Administrative Process 08-15-2019, #3 Payment Documents and Decisions 08-15-2019, #4 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices 08-15-2019, #5 Non Disability Related Developments 08-15-2019, #6 Disability Related Developments 08-15-2019, #7 Medical Records Part 1 08-15-2019, #8 Medical Records Part 2 08-15-2019, #9 Documents Related to Administrative Process 09-28-2021, #10 Payment Documents and Decisions 09-28-2021, #11 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices 09-28-2021, #12 Non Disability Related Developments 09-28-2021, #13 Disability Related Developments 09-28-2021, #14 Medical Records 09-28-2021) (Stark, John)
September 8, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Kiywhanna LaChic Kellup for Defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Kellup, Kiywhanna)
August 3, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Betty Hudgins. (srb)
August 3, 2021 Reset Deadline: Commissioner of Social Security answer due 10/4/2021. (srb)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter B. Silvain, Jr. on 8/3/2021. (del)
August 2, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Betty Hudgins. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 USDC Form) (Walter, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hudgins v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Hudgins
Represented By: Robert Christopher Walter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John J. Stark
Represented By: Kiywhanna LaChic Kellup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?