Moorer v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Bruce Moorer
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Bank of America, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00263
Filed: September 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael J Newman
Referring Judge: Peter B Silvain
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Bank of America, N.A.. (Fontanazza, Melany)
November 5, 2021 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Bank of America, N.A., NB Holdings Corporation, BAC North America Holding Company, Bank of America Corporation identifying Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company, Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corporation for Bank of America, N.A... (Fontanazza, Melany)
November 3, 2021 Filing 10 Experian Information Solutions, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Rector, Emily)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER GRANTING #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. The new Answer filing date is 11/5/2021. Answer Set/Reset for: Bank of America, N.A. answer due 11/5/2021. Terminating: ( #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer New date requested 11/5/2021. filed by Bank of America, N.A..) Signed by Judge Michael J. Newman on 10/12/2021.(bjs)
October 11, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer New date requested 11/5/2021. by Defendant Bank of America, N.A.. (Fontanazza, Melany)
October 7, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Experian Information Solutions, Inc. answer due 11/5/2021. (jmb)
October 6, 2021 Filing 8 STIPULATION for an Extension of Time by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Rector, Emily)
October 6, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Experian plc, Central Source LLC, Online Data Exchange LLC, New Management Services LLC, VantageScore Solutions LLC, Opt-Out Services LLC identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc... (Rector, Emily)
October 6, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Mae Rector for Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Rector, Emily)
September 28, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Melany Kotlarek Fontanazza for Defendant Bank of America, N.A. (Fontanazza, Melany)
September 24, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 9/24/2021, answer due 10/15/2021. (Dann, Marc)
September 24, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Bank of America, N.A.. Bank of America, N.A. served on 9/24/2021, answer due 10/15/2021. (Dann, Marc)
September 22, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Bank of America, N.A. and Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (jmb)
September 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Bank of America, N.A., Experian Information Solutions, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8508649), filed by Bruce Moorer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Mortgage, #2 Exhibit 2 - Note, #3 Exhibit 3 - Plan, #4 Exhibit 4 - Experian Report, #5 Exhibit 5 - Dispute Letter, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons Form Experian Summons, #8 Summons Form BANA Summons) (Flick, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moorer v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Moorer
Represented By: Marc E Dann
Represented By: Brian Flick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Emily Mae Rector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Melany Kotlarek Fontanazza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?