United States of America v. One Hundred Twenty One Thousand, Six Hundred and 00/100 Dollars ($121,600.00) in United States Currency et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: One Hundred Twenty One Thousand, Six Hundred and 00/100 Dollars ($121,600.00) in United States Currency and One Hundred Thousand and 00/100 Dollars ($100,000.00) in United States Currency
Claimant: Phone Exchange LLC and Mohammed Khaled
Case Number: 3:2022cv00023
Filed: January 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Rose
Referring Judge: Peter B Silvain
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2022 Filing 9 CLAIM $121,600.00 and $100,000.00 by Claimant Phone Exchange LLC. (srb)
March 9, 2022 Filing 8 CLAIM $121,600.00 and $100,000.00 by Claimant Mohammed Khaled. (srb)
March 8, 2022 Filing 7 CLAIM $121,600.00 and $100,000.00 by Claimant Phone Exchange LLC. (pb)
January 31, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE by Plaintiff United States of America re 4 Seizure Warrant Issued Return of Service Defendant (2) $100,000.00 US Currency (Grimes, Deborah)
January 31, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE by Plaintiff United States of America re 4 Seizure Warrant Issued Return of Service Defendant (1) $121,600.00 US Currency (Grimes, Deborah)
January 27, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to One Hundred Thousand and 00/100 Dollars ($100,000.00) in United States Currency. (bjr) (Main Document 3 replaced on 1/27/2022) (bjr).
January 27, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to One Hundred Twenty One Thousand, Six Hundred and 00/100 Dollars ($121,600.00) in United States Currency. (bjr) (Main Document 2 replaced on 1/27/2022) (bjr).
January 26, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form $121,600.00, #3 Summons Form $100,000.00) (Grimes, Deborah) (Attachment 1-3 replaced on 1/27/2022 to correct documents that were filed as editable forms) Modified on 1/27/2022 (bjr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. One Hundred Twenty One Thousand, Six Hundred and 00/100 Dollars ($121,600.00) in United States Currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Deborah Diane Grimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Hundred Twenty One Thousand, Six Hundred and 00/100 Dollars ($121,600.00) in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Hundred Thousand and 00/100 Dollars ($100,000.00) in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Phone Exchange LLC
Represented By: Brian David Joslyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Mohammed Khaled
Represented By: Brian David Joslyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?