Gentry v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Anthony Gentry
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2022cv00024
Filed: January 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael J Newman
Referring Judge: Peter B Silvain
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2022 Filing 5 First CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD filed by Defendant Statement of Errors due by 5/9/2022. (Attachments: #1 Court Transcript Index, #2 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable, #3 Payment Documents and Decisions, #4 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, #5 Non Disability Related Development, #6 Disability Related Development, #7 Medical Records Part 1, #8 Medical Records Part 2) (Stark, John)
February 2, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Ameenah Lewis for Defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Lewis, Ameenah)
January 27, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Anthony Gentry. (srb)
January 27, 2022 Reset Deadline: Commissioner of Social Security answer due 3/28/2022. (srb)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter B. Silvain, Jr. on 1/27/2022. (del)
January 26, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Anthony Gentry. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 USDC Form) (Walter, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gentry v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Gentry
Represented By: Robert Christopher Walter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John J. Stark
Represented By: Ameenah Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?