Taylor v. Tornichio et al
Plaintiff: Pierre Rahsaan Taylor
Defendant: Adolfo Tornichio, Stephen Wolaver, Alan Kraker, Shane Hartwell, Cheri Stout, Marcy Vonderwell, David Hayes, Steven Haller, Eric V. Robinson, Tim Shoop, Brian Cook and Warden Norm Robinson
Case Number: 3:2022cv00056
Filed: February 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Karen L Litkovitz
Referring Judge: Walter H Rice
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ADDENDUM TO AMENDED COMPLAINT/AFFIDAVIT OF TRUTH/FACT/SPECIFIC NEGATIVE AVERMENT by Plaintiff, Pierre Rahsaan Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit on the State of Ohio and Trial Courts Lack of Jurisdiction and Intentional Infliction of Emotional Distress, #2 Affidavit of Indigency, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Notary Public Certifies the Non-Response, Non-Performance and Stipulation to the Facts, #5 The Notary Public Certifies the Non-Response, Non-Performance and Stipulation to the Facts.) (bjr)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff, Pierre Rahsaan Taylor. (bjr)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff, Pierre Rahsaan Taylor (bjr)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DEFICIENCY ORDER- IT IS ORDERED THAT plaintiff pay $402 ($350 filing fee plus $52 administrative fee) or submit to the Court a certified copy of his prison trust fund account statement (or institutional equivalent) for the preceding six-month period within thirty (30) days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 3/16/2022. (kl)(A copy of this Deficiency Order has been mailed to Cashier, South Eastern Correctional Institution and the Plaintiff, in addition to an Application and Affidavit By Incarcerated Person to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees form.) (kl)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Steven Haller, Shane Hartwell, David Hayes, Alan Kraker, Cheri Stout, Adolfo Tornichio, Marcy Vonderwell, and Stephen Wolaver, filed by Pierre Rahsaan Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jmb)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Pierre Rahsaan Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Indigence, #2 Envelope) (jmb)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Deficiency re: Requires a filing fee or Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, and Civil Cover Sheet. Related Document: #1 Complaint filed by Pierre Rahsaan Taylor. Deficiency Deadline by 3/25/2022. (bjr)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants, filed by Pierre Rahsaan Taylor. (bjr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Tornichio et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pierre Rahsaan Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adolfo Tornichio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Wolaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Kraker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane Hartwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheri Stout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcy Vonderwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Haller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric V. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Shoop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Norm Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?