Smith v. City of Union Police Department
Plaintiff: Jeff Smith
Defendant: City of Union Police Department
Case Number: 3:2022cv00096
Filed: April 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael J Newman
Referring Judge: Peter B Silvain
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 623 Job Discrimination (Age)
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING A PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - The parties' Rule 26(f) report shall be filed with the Court on or before July 14, 2022. A Preliminary Pretrial Scheduling Conference is set for July 21, 2022, at 11:00 a.m. by telephone before Judge Michael J. Newman. Signed by Judge Michael J. Newman on 6/9/2022. (bjr)
June 8, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by All Defendants. (Meyer, Beverly)
May 31, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur Paul Schoulties for Defendant City of Union Police Department (Schoulties, Arthur)
May 31, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas J. Ziepfel for Defendant City of Union Police Department (Ziepfel, Nicholas)
May 31, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Beverly Ann Meyer for Defendant City of Union Police Department (Meyer, Beverly)
May 11, 2022 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to City of Union Police Department on 4/12/2022, answer due 6/13/2022. (Stokely, Matthew)
April 13, 2022 Filing 2 Supplemental Memorandum Supporting Complaint (Civil Cover Sheet) by Plaintiff Jeff Smith. (Stokely, Matthew)
April 13, 2022 NOTICE re #1 Complaint - Pursuant to S.D. Ohio Civ. R. 3.1(a), every complaint or other document initiating a civil action must be accompanied by a completed civil cover sheet. The form is available on the Court's website at: http://www.ohsd.uscourts.gov/ohio-southern-district-forms. Initiating Counsel is instructed to file a civil cover sheet. (bjr)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
April 12, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND Jeff Smith against City of Union Police Department ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8818358), filed by Jeff Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Sandner, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. City of Union Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Smith
Represented By: Matthew D Stokely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Union Police Department
Represented By: Arthur Paul Schoulties
Represented By: Beverly Ann Meyer
Represented By: Nicholas J. Ziepfel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?