Rogers v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Laura D. Rogers
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2022cv00271
Filed: September 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Peter B Silvain
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2022 Filing 8 STIPULATION (Joint) for Remand by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Julis, Rachel)
November 16, 2022 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer New date requested 12/19/2022. by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Julis, Rachel)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. Commissioner of Social Security answer due 12/19/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter B. Silvain, Jr. on 11/16/2022. (jmb)
October 21, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE: As no party has indicated on the previously issued #3 Statement as to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form that they are withholding their consent to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction, the case will remain with the assigned Magistrate Judge for all matters, including entry of a final judgment pursuant to General Order 22-04. (jmb)
September 20, 2022 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Laura D. Rogers. (jmb)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. In accordance with the Southern District of Ohio Civil Rule 8.1, the Commissioner shall file and serve a certified copy of the administrative record within sixty (60) days after filing of the Social Security Identification Form, which copy shall function as the Answer. Plaintiff must file a Statement of Errors within forty-five (45) days after filing of the administrative record setting forth the bases upon which reversal or remand is sought. The Commissioner must file and serve a Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Statement of Errors within forty-five (45) days after service of the Statement of Errors. Plaintiff's Reply, if any, must be filed fifteen (15) days after the memorandum in opposition is filed. All briefing must include references to the administrative record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter B. Silvain, Jr. on 09/20/2022. (jmb)
September 20, 2022 Filing 3 Statement As To Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form. The completed Statement As To Magistrate Jurisdiction Form shall be completed and emailed to the Court's Social Security Case Coordinator at, SSA_Coordinator@ohsd.uscourts.gov or mailed to: Office of the ClerkWalter H. Rice Federal Buildingand U.S. CourthouseRoom 712Attn: Social Security Coordinator200 W. Second StreetDayton, Ohio 45402DO NOT ELECTRONICALLY FILE THIS DOCUMENT, IT MUST BE MAILED TO THE ABOVE ADDRESS OR EMAILED TO SSA_Coordinator@ohsd.uscourts.gov. The completed Statement As To Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form due by 10/20/2022 (jmb)
September 20, 2022 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE and GENERAL ORDER 22-04: Pursuant to #S.D. Ohio General Order 22-04, if no party indicates that they are withholding their consent to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction, the case will remain with the assigned Magistrate Judge for all matters, including entry of a final judgment. Further, the filing of a party's statement of errors or memorandum in opposition without first filing an executed copy of the Statement as to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form will also be deemed as consent by that party to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction over all aspects of the litigation, including entry of a final judgment. (jmb)
September 20, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Laura D. Rogers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 SSA ID Form) (Rake, Michael)
September 20, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Pursuant to 6 , Commissioner of Social Security answer due 11/21/2022. (jmb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rogers v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura D. Rogers
Represented By: Michael A Rake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John J. Stark
Represented By: Rachel Julis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?