Johnson Sr. v. Warden, Lebanon Correctional Institution
Petitioner: Alfred A. Johnson Sr.
Respondent: Warden, Lebanon Correctional Institution
Case Number: 3:2023cv00109
Filed: April 10, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael J Newman
Referring Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2023 Case transferred from Ohio Southern has been opened in NORTHERN DISTRICT OF OHIO as case 3:23-cv-01103. (kh)
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of Transfer to the Northern District of Ohio, Western Division at Toledo. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 5/31/2023. (daf)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
May 31, 2023 Case transferred to District of Northern District of Ohio, Western Division at Toledo. Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (daf)
May 4, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION to Amend R. 12 by Petitioner, Alfred A. Johnson Sr. (bjr)
April 27, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Petitioner Alfred A. Johnson Sr.. (pb)
April 10, 2023 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Alfred A. Johnson Sr. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Indigency, #2 Inmate Demand Statement, #3 Motion for Habeas Corpus 2254, #4 Motion for App.R.8, App.R.9, R. 11 #5 Motion of Priors Actions 2969.25(A), #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 State Documents) (bjr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson Sr. v. Warden, Lebanon Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Alfred A. Johnson Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden, Lebanon Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?