Miami Valley Fair Housing Center, Inc. v. Genovesi Jr.
Plaintiff: Miami Valley Fair Housing Center, Inc.
Defendant: John S. Genovesi Jr.
Case Number: 3:2023cv00186
Filed: July 7, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Caroline H Gentry
Referring Judge: Thomas M Rose
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Fair Housing Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2023 Reset Deadline: John S. Genovesi Jr. answer due 9/5/2023. (srb)
August 9, 2023 Filing 5 STIPULATION STIPULATED EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE PLEAD by Defendant John S. Genovesi Jr.. (Mitchell, Amy)
August 9, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Christine Mitchell for Defendant John S. Genovesi Jr. (Mitchell, Amy)
August 1, 2023 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Answer due 8/15/2023. (bjr)
July 27, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant, John S. Genovesi Jr. John S. Genovesi Jr. served on 7/25/2023, Answer due 8/15/2023. (Davis, Charles) Modified on 8/1/2023 to reflect service date (bjr). (bjr). (bjr).
July 7, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to John S. Genovesi Jr. (bjr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/1/2023: #1 Return of Summons) (bjr).
July 7, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND for Violations of the Fair Housing Act against John S. Genovesi Jr. ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9497230), filed by Miami Valley Fair Housing Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Genovesi-Cover-Sheet, #2 Summons Form Genovesi-Summons) (Davis, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miami Valley Fair Housing Center, Inc. v. Genovesi Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miami Valley Fair Housing Center, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Jacob Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John S. Genovesi Jr.
Represented By: Amy Christine Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?