Johnson v. Warden
Plaintiff: Michael Vincent Johnson
Defendant: Warden LECI Chae Harris and Warden, Lebanon Correctional Institution
Case Number: 3:2023cv00251
Filed: August 30, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Michael J Newman
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Hilda Rosenberg for Defendant Warden, Lebanon Correctional Institution (Rosenberg, Hilda)
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: It is ORDERED that Respondent shall file an answer conforming to the requirements of Rule 5 of the Rules Governing 2254 Cases within sixty (60) days of the date of filing of this Order. Petitioner may, not later than twenty-one (21) days after the answer is filed, file and serve a reply to the answer. The Clerk is ordered to serve the petition on respondent and the Attorney General of Ohio, Habeas Corpus Unit of the Corrections Litigation Section c/o Brian.Higgins@OhioAGO.gov and Habeas.docketclerk@OhioAGO.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 9/1/2023. (er)
August 31, 2023 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet - by Plaintiff, Michael Vincent Johnson re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Jackson, Kory)
August 30, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number AOHSDC-9578390.), filed by Michael Vincent Johnson. (Jackson, Kory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Vincent Johnson
Represented By: Kory A Jackson
Represented By: Kory Akin Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden LECI Chae Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden, Lebanon Correctional Institution
Represented By: Hilda Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?