Miami Valley Fair Housing Center, Inc. et al v. Towne Properties Asset Management Company et al
Plaintiff: Miami Valley Fair Housing Center, Inc. and Janice Jessen
Defendant: Towne Properties Asset Management Company, Charity Vann and Governours Square, LLC
Case Number: 3:2024cv00053
Filed: February 23, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael J Newman
Referring Judge: Peter B Silvain
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Fair Housing Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2024 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Governours Square, LLC, Towne Properties Asset Management Company, Charity Vann. (Bakota, Matthew)
March 28, 2024 Reset Deadlines: Towne Properties Asset Management Company answer due 4/22/2024; Charity Vann answer due 4/22/2024 and Governours Square, LLC answer due 4/22/2024. (srb)
March 27, 2024 Filing 4 STIPULATION Extension of Time to Move or Otherwise Plead in Response to Complaint by Defendants Governours Square, LLC, Towne Properties Asset Management Company, Charity Vann. (Bakota, Matthew)
March 25, 2024 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendants Governours Square, LLC, Towne Properties Asset Management Company, Charity Vann. All Defendants. (Davis, Charles)
March 1, 2024 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Towne Properties Asset Management Company, Charity Van, and Governours Square, LLC. (srb)
February 23, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND for Violations of the Fair Housing Act against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9833859), filed by Miami Valley Fair Housing Center, Inc., Janice Jessen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Plaintiffs Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form Governours-Summons, #3 Summons Form Vann-Summons, #4 Summons Form Towne-Summons) (Davis, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miami Valley Fair Housing Center, Inc. et al v. Towne Properties Asset Management Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miami Valley Fair Housing Center, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Jacob Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Jessen
Represented By: Charles Jacob Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Towne Properties Asset Management Company
Represented By: Matthew J Bakota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charity Vann
Represented By: Matthew J Bakota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governours Square, LLC
Represented By: Matthew J Bakota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?