McCluskey v. Wilberforce University
Plaintiff: Dr. James McCluskey
Defendant: Wilberforce University
Case Number: 3:2024cv00203
Filed: July 15, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Walter H Rice
Referring Judge: Peter B Silvain
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures due by 9/13/2024. Settlement Demand due by 9/15/2024. Response to Settlement Demand due by 10/15/2024. Notification re: Contingent Consent/Non-Consent to MJ for Trial Purposes Only due by 9/10/2024. Motions directed to pleadings due by 9/30/2024. Motions to Amend and/or Add Parties due by 9/30/2024. Lay Witness due by 12/31/2024. Plaintiff Primary Expert due by 2/1/2025. Plaintiff Rebuttal Expert due by 2/21/2025. Defendant Primary Expert due by 2/1/2025. Defendant Rebuttal Expert due by 2/21/2025. Request for Admissions due by 2/7/2025. Discovery due by 3/10/2025. Status Conference set for 3/11/2025 05:00 PM in Teleconference before Judge Walter H. Rice. Summary Judgment Motions Deadline by 4/4/2025. Motions due by 7/8/2025. Proposed Final Pretrial Order due by 7/15/2025. Exhibit List due by 7/18/2025. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/22/2025 05:00 PM in Teleconference before Judge Walter H. Rice. Jury Instructions Submission due by 7/24/2025. Transcripts (Counter Designations of Testimony) due by 7/30/2025. Jury Trial set for 8/4/2025 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Dayton before Judge Walter H. Rice. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 8/27/2024. (acw) Modified on 8/28/2024 correcting typographical error. (bjr)
August 13, 2024 Minute Entry for proceedings held: Telephone Conference held on 8/13/2024. (Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/22/2025 at 5:00 p.m. by Teleconference before Judge Walter H. Rice. Jury Trial set for 8/4/2025 beginning at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 1 - Dayton before Judge Walter H. Rice.) Scheduling Order to issue. (bjr)
August 12, 2024 Filing 8 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendant Wilberforce University. (Stokely, Matthew)
August 6, 2024 Filing 7 ENTRY GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS CO-COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT WILBERFORCE UNIVERSITY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter B. Silvain, Jr on 8/6/2024. (srb)
August 5, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION to Withdraw as Co-Counsel by Defendant Wilberforce University. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Entry) (Reynolds, Walter)
August 1, 2024 Filing 5 ANSWER to #2 Complaint filed by Wilberforce University. (Stokely, Matthew)
July 19, 2024 Filing 4 STIPULATION Agreed Entry for Extension of Time for Defendant to File Answer by Defendant Wilberforce University. (Stokely, Matthew)
July 16, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE by Defendant Wilberforce University re #1 Notice of Removal, Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet (Reynolds, Walter)
July 16, 2024 Filing 2 Copy of COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Wilberforce University, filed by James McCluskey. (acw)
July 15, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Greene County Common Pleas Court, case number 2024CV0467 ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-10066527), filed by Wilberforce University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Reynolds, Walter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCluskey v. Wilberforce University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. James McCluskey
Represented By: Michael W DeWitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilberforce University
Represented By: Matthew D Stokely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?