American Commerce Insurance Company v. Harris

Plaintiff: American Commerce Insurance Company
Defendant: Jackie Craig Harris
Case Number: 6:2007cv00423
Filed: December 7, 2007
Court: Oklahoma Eastern District Court
Office: Muskogee Office
County: Muskogee
Presiding Judge: Ronald A. White
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 25, 2009 118 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES (Docket No. 105 ) by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder (eje, Deputy Clerk)
January 26, 2009 102 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder entering judgment in favor of Plaintiff American Commerce Insurance Company and against Defendant Jackie Craig Harris (terminates case) (eje, Deputy Clerk)
January 16, 2009 85 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF DEFENDANT'S EXPERT by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder (Re: 52 Motion to Exclude)(eje, Deputy Clerk)
January 13, 2009 79 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder (Re: 59 Motion for Summary Judgment)(eje, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Commerce Insurance Company v. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Commerce Insurance Company
Represented By: Phil R. Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackie Craig Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?