United States of America v. Keval
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Kishor Keval
Case Number: 6:2018cv00240
Filed: July 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Office: Muskogee Office
County: Pittsburg
Presiding Judge: James H Payne
Referring Judge: Kimberly E West
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 31:5321
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference for 10/25/2018 at 10:30 AM in Chambers, Room 430, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West. The Court will initiate the conference call. Joint Status Report due by 10/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Reassignment Form)(adw, Deputy Clerk)
August 23, 2018 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: At the direction of the Court, this case is hereby randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-18-240-KEW. (cjt, Deputy Clerk)
July 30, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Kishor Keval (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
July 30, 2018 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
July 30, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Kishor Keval by United States of America (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
July 30, 2018 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by United States of America (pjw, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Keval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kishor Keval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Christopher R. Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?