Norman v. Cook Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Cindy Lou Norman
Defendant: Cook Med Institute, Inc., William Cook Europe, APS, Cook Denmark Holding, APS, Cook Medical, LLC, Medical Engineering and Development Institute, Inc., Cook Denmark International, APS, Cook Medical, Incorporated, Cook Medical Technologies, Cook Nederland, BV, Cook, Incorporated, Cook Group, Inc., Med Institute, Inc. and Cook Group Europe, APS
Case Number: 6:2018cv00262
Filed: August 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Office: Muskogee Office
County: Wagoner
Presiding Judge: Steven P Shreder
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care - Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2018 ***Remark: Transferred case opened in Southern District of Indiana as case 1:18-CV-06092 on 08/31/2018 (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
August 29, 2018 Filing 8 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-62) transferring case to Southern District of Indiana (case terminated). (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
August 29, 2018 Filing 7 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-62) from United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
August 17, 2018 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk granting Defendants' First Motion for Extension of Time in Which to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint/Petition (Re: #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer). Accordingly, per LCvR 7.1 (h), defendants Cook Group, Inc., Cook Medical Incorporated, Cook Medical, LLC, Cook Incorporated, Medical Engineering and Development Institute, Inc., Cook Medical Technologies, Cook Denmark International, APS, Cook Denmark Holding, APS, Cook Group Europe, APS, Cook Nederland, BV, and William Cook Europe, APS, have until 8/31/2018 to file their answer or otherwise plead. (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
August 17, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or file Other Responsive Pleadings (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint) by Cook Denmark Holding, APS, Cook Denmark International, APS, Cook Group Europe, APS, Cook Group, Inc., Cook Medical Technologies, Cook Medical, Incorporated, Cook Medical, LLC, Cook Nederland, BV, Cook, Incorporated, Medical Engineering and Development Institute, Inc., William Cook Europe, APS Responses due by 8/31/2018(Smith, Michael)
August 14, 2018 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Cook Group Incorporated for Cook Denmark Holding, APS, Cook Denmark International, APS, Cook Group Europe, APS, Cook Group, Inc., Cook Med Institute, Inc., Cook Medical Technologies, Cook Medical, Incorporated, Cook Medical, LLC, Cook Nederland, BV, Cook, Incorporated, Med Institute, Inc., Medical Engineering and Development Institute, Inc. and William Cook Europe, APS) by Cook Denmark Holding, APS, Cook Denmark International, APS, Cook Group Europe, APS, Cook Group, Inc., Cook Med Institute, Inc., Cook Medical Technologies, Cook Medical, Incorporated, Cook Medical, LLC, Cook Nederland, BV, Cook, Incorporated, Med Institute, Inc., Medical Engineering and Development Institute, Inc., William Cook Europe, APS (Smith, Michael) Modified on 8/15/2018: added WCE APS as filer (nm, Deputy Clerk).
August 13, 2018 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 8/13/2018 in the amount of $400, receipt number 1086-1198236 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal, ) by Cook Denmark Holding, APS, Cook Denmark International, APS, Cook Group Europe, APS, Cook Group, Inc., Cook Med Institute, Inc., Cook Medical Technologies, Cook Medical, Incorporated, Cook Medical, LLC, Cook Nederland, BV, Cook, Incorporated, Med Institute, Inc., Medical Engineering and Development Institute, Inc., William Cook Europe, APS (Smith, Michael)
August 13, 2018 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk. Defendants are directed to pay the $400 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. Consent forms provided to filing party (Filing Fee due by 8/20/2018) (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
August 10, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Wagoner County District Court, case number 18-CJ-247 by Cook Denmark Holding, APS, Cook Denmark International, APS, Cook Group Europe, APS, Cook Group, Inc., Cook Medical Technologies, Cook Medical, Incorporated, Cook Medical, LLC, Cook Nederland, BV, Cook, Incorporated, William Cook Europe, APS and Medical Engineering and Development Institute, Inc. (With attachments)(pjw, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 8/13/2018 to add filer (dma, Deputy Clerk).
August 10, 2018 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Cook Denmark Holding, APS, Cook Denmark International, APS, Cook Group Europe, APS, Cook Group, Inc., Cook Medical Technologies, Cook Medical, Incorporated, Cook Medical, LLC, Cook Nederland, BV, Cook, Incorporated, Medical Engineering and Development Institute, Inc., William Cook Europe, APS (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
July 17, 2018 PETITION with Jury Demand filed in State Court against Cook Denmark Holding, APS, Cook Denmark International, APS, Cook Group Europe, APS, Cook Group, Inc., Cook Med Institute, Inc., Cook Medical Technologies, Cook Medical, Incorporated, Cook Medical, LLC, Cook Nederland, BV, Cook, Incorporated, Med Institute, Inc., Medical Engineering and Development Institute, Inc., William Cook Europe, APS by Cindy Lou Norman (pjw, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norman v. Cook Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Med Institute, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Cook Europe, APS
Represented By: Michael F. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Denmark Holding, APS
Represented By: Michael F. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Medical, LLC
Represented By: Michael F. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Engineering and Development Institute, Inc.
Represented By: Michael F. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Denmark International, APS
Represented By: Michael F. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Medical, Incorporated
Represented By: Michael F. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Medical Technologies
Represented By: Michael F. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Nederland, BV
Represented By: Michael F. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook, Incorporated
Represented By: Michael F. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Group, Inc.
Represented By: Michael F. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Med Institute, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Group Europe, APS
Represented By: Michael F. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Lou Norman
Represented By: Paul T. Boudreaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?