Midship Pipeline Company, LLC v. 2.331, 2.435, 0.458 acres, Bryan County, Oklahoma et al
Plaintiff: Midship Pipeline Company, LLC
Defendant: 1.545, 1.447, 0.154, Bryan County, Oklahoma, Anna Kathryn Chappa, Tom Morris, Michelle Leslie Prentice, Alex Wendall Wayne Murphree, 0.445, 0.481, 0.581 acres, Bryan County, Oklahoma, LC-MAC LLC, 0.854, 0.846, 0.423 acres, Bryan County, Oklahoma, 0.076, 0.015 acres, Bryan County, Oklahoma, 2.172, 2.168, 0.317, 0.494, Bryan County, Oklahoma, Kasidy Niegal Lester, Kalan Craig Richardson, LC-MAC, LLC, 3.749, 3.873, 0.573 acres, Bryan County, Oklahoma, Megan Pearl Murphree, 0.705, 0.794, 0.092 acres, Bryan County, Oklahoma, James S. Ingram, 1.739, 1.738 acres, Bryan County, Oklahoma, 3.319, 3.161, 0.941 acres, Bryan County, Oklahoma, Chris Davis, Monte Dean Drennan, 0.055, 0.021 acres, Bryan County, Oklahoma, Lucas Don Jackson, Donna Caldwell, Farm Credit Services of East Central Oklahoma, FLCA, 1.258, 1.164 acres, Bryan County, Oklahoma, Walter L. Prentice, 0.573, 0.654, 0.193 acres, Bryan County, Oklahoma, Julie D. Haynie, Dale Owens, Billy Miller, Larry Hughes, Don M. Haggerty, Central Land Consulting LLC, Hazel C. Haggerty, 3.394, 3.390, 0.234, 0.138 acres, Bryan County, Oklahoma, 3.141, 3.144, 0.791 acres, Bryan County, Oklahoma, Wayne Caldwell, 2.068, 2.153, 1.012 acres, Bryan County, Oklahoma, Bryan County Treasurer, 2.062, 2.062, 0.230 acres, Bryan County, Oklahoma, 1.595, 1.476 acres, Bryan County, Oklahoma, Donna C. Owens, Unknown Heirs of Billy Don Davis, 0.558, 0.569, 0.350 acres, Bryan County, Oklahoma, Lydia L. Roper, Jerry Hughes, 2.580, 2.572, 0.874 acres, Bryan County, Oklahoma, 1.623, 1.601, 0.230 acres, Bryan County, Oklahoma, Torrey McGraw Lester, 2.186, 2.149, 0.493 acres, Bryan County, Oklahoma, Rhonda Marie Drennan, 1.654, 1.586, 0.711 acres, Bryan County, Oklahoma, Oklahoma AgCredit, Simon Creek, Inc., 1.982, 2.024, 0.451 acres, Bryan County, Oklahoma, American Nation Bank, Delane Jackson, Tanner Blane Richardson, 4.852, 4.736, 0.762 acres, Bryan County, Oklahoma, Misty Hall Murphree, 2.331, 2.435, 0.458 acres, Bryan County, Oklahoma, Farm Credit Services of East Central Oklahoma, Michi Morris, 6.587, 6.590, 0.093 acres, Bryan County, Oklahoma, Shamrock Bank, Donald Andrew Morris, Unknown Executor of Billy Don Davis, 0.005, 0.226 acres, Bryan County, Oklahoma, Lee Chappa, 0.047, 0.047 acres, Bryan County, Oklahoma, Linda D. Ingram, M. Leslie Prentice, Marla Hall Richardson, Farm Services Agency, John W. Haynie, 2.800, 2.856, 1.011 acres, Bryan County, Oklahoma, 0.754, 0.850, 0.230 acres, Bryan County, Oklahoma, R.C. Staggs, 1.993, 1.996, 0.657 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma, 1.518, 1.317, 0.581 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma, Bernice Curlie Powell, Andre Brumfield, WLC Land and Mineral, LLC, 0.325, 0.190 acres, Bryan County, Oklahoma, Anna L. Kennemer, 0.811, 0.527, 0.530 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma, 0.154, 0.146, 0.198 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma, 0.405, 0.407, 0.128, 0.122 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma, Legend Bank, N.A., Severn Davis, Elaine Johnson, Isaac Franklin, Doretha J. Wall, First Bank and Trust Co., Estate of Billy Don Davis, Ella Fisher, 8.197, 8.278, 1.614, 1.414 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma, 0.146, 0.357, 0.169 acres, Bryan County, Oklahoma, Estate of Cecil Johnson, Ila Lawrence, Laura A. Belt, LaDonna Inman, Gary Scott Wall, 3.249, 3.216, 0.314 acres, Bryan County, Oklahoma, Bobbie Jo Wells, Homer Powell, Pamela A. Robertson, 3.453, 3.561, 1.643 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma, Virginia Johnson, Kenitra Rose Williams, Myrna R. Roberts, 0.788 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma, Tanya McCloud, Randy Taylor, Joshua Davis, 4.670, 3.526, 0.459 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma, Estate of W.D. Austin, BancFirst, Joe Davis, Billy Gene Risner, 0.019, 0.314, 0.229 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma, 0.599, 0.100, 0.288 acres, Johnston County, Oklahoma, 0.389 acres, Johnston County, Oklahoma, 1.136, 1.335, 0.337, 0.159 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma, BNK Petroleum (US) Inc., Lou Cronin, Nolen G. Grounds, Lauren B. Roesner, 3.144, 3.144, 0.668 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma, Carolyn Pirtle, 1.415, 1.203, 0.322 acres, Bryan County, Oklahoma, Inez Akers Trust dated January 17, 1994, The, 2.109, 2.117, 0.716 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma, Lydra Lofton, Franklin James Risner, Sharon K. Zondor, Bessie Harris, Mary A. Bully, Frances Gayle Pletcher, Eugene Franklin, Charleen Hunter, 0.295, 0.227 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma, L.V. Phillips, 1.531, 1.399, 0.459 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma, Rosie Breath, Barbara J. Smith, Estate of Fred O. Lofton, Sr., Travis Osborn, Mamie Bess Lawrence Collins, Central Land Consulting, LLC, 3 - J Farms, LC, Evan Carr, Estate of Verlee Jones, James A. Clark Revocable Trust, 0.124 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma, Unknown heirs of Buel Pettus, Sr., Wilma J. Peavy Lofton, Oklahomaranch.com LLC, Charles Johnson, J.T. Phillips, Michael Anthony Davis, Estate of Alberta Douglas, Denise K. Davis, 0.604, 0.678 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma, Larry D. Smith, 4.623, 4.683, 2.196 acres, Johnston County, Oklahoma, Casey B. Smith, Dorothy Olivia Ware, 1.453, 1.328, 0.510, 0.116 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma, Delores Fisher, 0.122 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma, Everett Carr, 0.570, 0.598, 0.238, 0.812 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma, Valero Partners Wynnewood, LLC, Ranada D. Hulsey, Robert L. Rosner, Dorothy Louis Davis, Alvin Bully, Quincy Jones, Unknown heirs of Clara R. Pettis, 2.878, 2.728, .404 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma, Clevonna Jones, Rona Carr, Kayrn L. Coelho, Ireatha Dickenson Davis, 0.562, 0.471, 0.163 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma, Celester Jackson, 0.011 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma, Estate of Lawrence Pettus, Andre Jones, Rosie Petties, Lorce Thompson, Unknown Heirs of Billie Gene Risener, Dorothy Givens, Daube Arbuckle Ranch, LLC, 1.531, 0.133 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma, Carlin Pennon, 1.622 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma, Estate of Craig Lofton, Melva L. Robertson, 0.945, 0.945 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma, Ruby Stevenson, James Davis, 2.313, 2.382, 0.104, 0.547 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma, Plains Pipeline LP, 0.201, 0.205, 0.159 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma, Any Unknown Owners, Citation 2004 Investment LP, Estate of Paul Akins, 2.294, 2.321, 0.528, 1.043 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma, Cheryl R. Miley, Lorren Carr, 0.445, 0.445, 0.144, 0.053 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma, St. George Fitzgerald Davis, James Robert Lawrence, III, Speake Land Holdings LLC, Gene Davis, Seretta Joyce Gaines, Larry J. Bully, 3.077, 3.104, 0.509 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma, Jamie J. Earles, Bobby Osborne, Charlene Breath, Derotha Phillips, Kimberly D. Burks, Natalia V. Lofton, 0.946, 0.967, 0.218 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma, Satchel Maurice Gaines, 0.098, 0.090, 0.007 acres, Johnston County, Oklahoma, Andrew Mark Hoelscher, Nesbitt Pettus, 1.887, 1.891, 0.595 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma, Shirley Lee Jones, Celano Jones, Henryetta Woods, 0.844, 0.869 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma, Elvin Davis, Brenda J. Lofton, Derek G. Howard, John Johnson, 0.749, 0.657, 3.259 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma, Lule H. Pettus, Gail Powell-Jones, 7.389, 7.395, 1.859 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma, Unknown Heirs of Franklin Delano Risener, Tina Pennon, 0.293, 0.170 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma, Bennie L. Carnes, Estate of L.B. Tatum, Keith B. Davis, Nover Roberts, Phyllis Hoogerhyde, Harvey Davis, Herbert Fisher, Estate of Kate Rogene Lawrence Staggs, 0.164, 0.121, 0.014, 0.033 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma, Houston O. Jones, 0.817, 0.748, 0.081 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma, Jackie M. Grounds, Estate of Geraldine Austin Carr, Robert Eugene Harris, Estate of Fred Lofton, Jr., Estate of Cecil Jones, Roderick Carr, Lois J. Lofton Revocable Trust dated August 1, 1997, David L. Walker, 1.740, 1.733, 1.218 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma, Ceon Jones, Lindmark Outdoor Advertising, Lois J. Lofton, 0.559, 0.504, 0.164 acres, Bryan County, Oklahoma, Rogna Carr, Jessie Phillips, 0.822, 0.822, 0.262 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma, 0.445, 0.445, 0.211, 0.038 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma, 0.749, 0.680, 0.203 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma, Frances L. Cooley, Estate of Dorothy Lofton, Robert R. Pennon, Raymond A. Hulsey, Estate of Luther Johnson, Albert Johnson, Freda Davis, Cleta Jones, Freddie LaVerne Davis-English, 4.462, 3.230, 0.902 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma, Nina Mae Jones, Cedre Jones, Estate of Janet McAfee Ayres, W. Lee Coffey, 0.581, 0.646, 0.289 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma, Jeffery Earles, 0.223, 0.151 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma, Katherine Johnson, 1.042, 1.149, 0.341 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma, Kristy J. Smith, William David Lawrence, 0.372 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma, Barbara Jones, 0.830, 0.835, 0.414 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma, Estate of Devola Langetta Pennon, Willene Grimes, Karen Davis Rolle, Unknown Heirs of Jack Wesley Risener, 2.103, 2.066, 0.825, 0.068 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma, 0.758, 0.779, 0.459 acres, Johnston County, Oklahoma, Any Unknown Heirs and, or Legatees, Devisees, Trustees, Creditors and Assigns of the Above-Named Defendants, Ruth Ann Polk, Larnell Dewayne Jones, 1.006, 0.986, 0.389 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma, Teresa E. Wilson, 3.049, 2.303, 1.836, 0.528 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma, Shirley A. Jones, Margaret Phillips, 0.170, 0.295, 0.430 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma, Ronald Lee Johnson, Terry L. Jones, Paul Davis, Jr., Cheri S. Clark Revocable Trust, Annie Franklin, David Wayne Ticknor, Dexter Davis, Harvey Powell, Jarva E. Oliver, Jerry Walker, Connie Conner, Sheila Y. Jones, Sherron Katherine Anderson, 2.149, 2.221, 0.357 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma, Unknown Heirs of George Gunter Risener, 3.333, 3.273, 0.676 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma, 0.638 acres, Johnston County, Oklahoma, Kermit Davis, Stewart Murray Gaines, II, 0.234, 0.348, 0.448 acres, Bryan County, Oklahoma, Farm Service Agency, Central Land Consulting, Oscar Davis, Ralph D. Ragan, Estate of Clifford Akins, Gerald W. Jones, Joe Coby Wells, 1.515, 1.593, 0.424 acres, Bryan County, Oklahoma, Henderson G. Anderson, Estate of Anna Mae Cato, Annetta Williams, Estate of Margaret A. Taylor, 3.170, 3.022, 0.628, 0.340 acres, Johnston County, Oklahoma, David Alan Risner, 2.293, 2.442, 0.566 acres, Bryan County, Oklahoma, Curtis Bully, Michelle Berdahl, William T. Cooley and Frances L. Cooley Survivors Trust, The, Willene Grimes Revocable Living Trust, dated April 17, 2014, The, Any Other Person Claiming Interest in this Tract, 1.125, 1.125 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma, 4.206, 4.268, 1.710 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma, Eric O. Jones, 3.684, 3.833, 1.641 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma, Frances Gayle Pletcher Revocable Trust, Barbara Christopher, Riesen Properties, LLC, 2.808, 2.917, 0.459 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma, Michael Ivan Lawrence, Theresa Prough, Estate of Mamie Hutchins, 0.761, 0.760 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma, Maher Farms, LLC, 3.478, 3.370, 0.695 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma, Southern Oklahoma Water Corporation, 0.035, 0.014 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma and Etoya Daly
Case Number: 6:2018cv00302
Filed: September 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: James H Payne
Referring Judge: Ronald A White
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 15:717
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2018 Filing 468 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #397 MOTION for Hearing ) by Henderson G. Anderson((Tract BR-0995.000) Co-Trustee of the Anderson Family Revocable Trust under written agreement dated January 21, 2009), Henderson G. Anderson((Tract BR-0994.000) Co-Trustee of the Anderson Family Revocable Trust under written agreement dated January 21, 2009), Henderson G. Anderson((Tract BR-0996.000) Co-Trustee of the Anderson Family Revocable Trust under written agreement dated January 21, 2009), Sherron Katherine Anderson((Tract BR-0995.000) Co-Trustee of the Anderson Family Revocable Trust under written agreement dated January 21, 2009), Sherron Katherine Anderson((Tract BR-0996.000) Co-Trustee of the Anderson Family Revocable Trust under written agreement dated January 21, 2009), Sherron Katherine Anderson((Tract BR-0994.000) Co-Trustee of the Anderson Family Revocable Trust under written agreement dated January 21, 2009), Michelle Berdahl, Donna Caldwell((Tract BR-0993.000)), Donna Caldwell((Tract BR-0991.000)), Wayne Caldwell((Tract BR-0991.000)), Wayne Caldwell((Tract BR-0993.000)), Central Land Consulting, Central Land Consulting, LLC((Tract BR-0995.000)), Central Land Consulting, LLC((Tract BR-0893.000)), Central Land Consulting, LLC((Tract BR-0996.000)), Central Land Consulting, LLC((Tract BR-0990.000)), Central Land Consulting, LLC((Tract BR-0894.000)), Central Land Consulting, LLC((Tract BR-0991.000)), Central Land Consulting, LLC((Tract BR-0988.000)), Central Land Consulting, LLC((Tract BR-0994.000)), Central Land Consulting, LLC((Tract BR-0993.000)), Anna Kathryn Chappa, Lee Chappa, W. Lee Coffey((Tract CR-0623.000) ), W. Lee Coffey((Tract CR-0620.000) ), W. Lee Coffey((Tract CR-0622.000) ), Frances L. Cooley, Daube Arbuckle Ranch, LLC((Tract CR-0566.000) ), Daube Arbuckle Ranch, LLC((Tract CR-0568.000) ), Daube Arbuckle Ranch, LLC((Tract CR-0563.000) ), Daube Arbuckle Ranch, LLC((Tract CR-0567.000) ), Daube Arbuckle Ranch, LLC((Tract CR-0561.000) ), Daube Arbuckle Ranch, LLC((Tract CR-0565.000) ), Daube Arbuckle Ranch, LLC((Tract CR-0564.000)), Daube Arbuckle Ranch, LLC((Tract CR-0569.000) ), Denise K. Davis((Tract CR-0703.000) Special Administrator of the Estate of Sammie J. Herriott, deceased, all heirs and, or legatees, devisees, trustees, creditors and assigns of Sammie J. Herriott, deceased), Denise K. Davis((Tract CR-0703.000) Special Administrator of the Estate of Warren H. Herriott, deceased. all heirs and, or legatees, devisees, trustees, creditors and assigns of Warren H. Herriott, deceased), Denise K. Davis((Tract CR-0701.000) Special Administrator of the Estate of Warren H. Herriott, deceased, and all heirs and, or legatees, devisees, trustees, creditors and assigns of Warren H. Herriott, deceased ), Denise K. Davis((Tract CR-0709.000) Special Administrator of the Estate of Warren H. Herriott, deceased, and all heirs and, or legatees, devisees, trustees, creditors and assigns of Warren H. Herriott, deceased), Denise K. Davis((Tract CR-0709.000) Special Administrator of the Estate of Sammie J. Herriott, deceased, and all heirs and, or legatees, devisees, trustees, creditors and assigns of Sammie J. Herriott, deceased), Denise K. Davis((Tract CR-0701.000) Special Administrator of the Estate of Sammie J. Herriott, deceased, and all heirs and, or legatees, devisees, trustees, creditors and assigns of Sammie J. Herriott, deceased), Jackie M. Grounds((Tract BR-1000.000)), Jackie M. Grounds((Tract BR-1001.000)), Nolen G. Grounds((Tract BR-1001.000)), Nolen G. Grounds((Tract BR-1000.000)), Don M. Haggerty, Hazel C. Haggerty, Bessie Harris, Robert Eugene Harris, Phyllis Hoogerhyde, Ranada D. Hulsey((Tract JO-0753.000) ), Ranada D. Hulsey((Tract JO-0754.000) ), Raymond A. Hulsey((Tract JO-0754.000) ), Raymond A. Hulsey((Tract JO-0753.000) ), Charleen Hunter, Inez Akers Trust dated January 17, 1994, The, James S. Ingram((Tract BR-0990.000)), James S. Ingram((Tract BR-0988.000)), Linda D. Ingram((Tract BR-0990.000)), Linda D. Ingram((Tract BR-0988.000)), Billy Miller((Tract BR-0909.000)), Billy Miller((Tract BR-0907.000)), Donald Andrew Morris, Tom Morris, Misty Hall Murphree((Tract BR-0904.000)), Misty Hall Murphree((Tract BR-0903.000)), Misty Hall Murphree((Tract BR-0905.000)), Ralph D. Ragan, Marla Hall Richardson((Tract BR-0905.000)), Marla Hall Richardson((Tract BR-0903.000)), Marla Hall Richardson((Tract BR-0904.000)), Riesen Properties, LLC, Unknown Heirs of George Gunter Risener, Unknown Heirs of Jack Wesley Risener, Unknown Heirs of Franklin Delano Risener, Unknown Heirs of Billie Gene Risener, Billy Gene Risner, David Alan Risner, Franklin James Risner, Lauren B. Roesner, Lydia L. Roper((Tract BR-0887.000)), Lydia L. Roper((Tract BR-0888.000)), Simon Creek, Inc., Barbara J. Smith, Casey B. Smith((Tract CR-0627.000) ), Casey B. Smith((Tract CR-0628.000) ), Casey B. Smith((Tract CR-0629.000) ), Kristy J. Smith((Tract CR-0628.000) ), Kristy J. Smith((Tract CR-0627.000) ), Kristy J. Smith((Tract CR-0629.000) ), Larry D. Smith, Speake Land Holdings LLC((Tract CR-0578.000) ), Speake Land Holdings LLC((Tract CR-0570.000) ), Speake Land Holdings LLC((Tract CR-0571.000) ), Speake Land Holdings LLC((Tract CR-0572.000) ), Speake Land Holdings LLC((Tract CR-0573.000) ), Speake Land Holdings LLC((Tract CR-0597.010) ), WLC Land and Mineral, LLC, William T. Cooley and Frances L. Cooley Survivors Trust, The, Teresa E. Wilson ; [NOTE: Attorney John M. Nelson added to party Lauren B. Roesner(pty:dft)]. (Nelson, John)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 467 ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White dismissing parties Valero Partners Wynnewood, LLC ((Tract CR-0517.010 and Tract CR-0561.000)) and Plains Pipeline LP ((Tract CR-0517.010 and Tract CR-0561.000)) (Re: #463 Notice of Dismissal) (dma, Deputy Clerk)
November 2, 2018 Filing 466 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Federal Rule 71.1 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation and Motion for Order Confirming Condemnation Authority to Gerald Jones served on 11/1/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Bourenin, Vadim)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 465 ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White dismissing party Willene Grimes ((Tract CR-0602.000) Trustee, or Successor Trustee(s)) and The Willene Grimes Revocable Living Trust, dated April 17, 2014, ((Tract CR-0602.000)) (Re: #462 Notice of Dismissal) (dma, Deputy Clerk)
November 2, 2018 Filing 464 NOTICE of Status of Service Update by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
November 1, 2018 Filing 463 NOTICE of Dismissal, dismissing Valero Partners Wynnewood, LLC and Plains Pipeline L.P., (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
November 1, 2018 Filing 462 NOTICE of Dismissal, dismissing Willene Grimes, Trustee, or Successor Trustee(s) of the Willene Grimes Revocable Living Trust, dated April 17, 2014, (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
October 31, 2018 Filing 461 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Federal Rule 71.1 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation and Motion for Order Confirming Condemnation Authority to Teresa Wilson, Trustee of Inez Akers Trust served on 10/22/2018 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Bourenin, Vadim)
October 31, 2018 Filing 460 Defendants' Brief in Support of Objections to All of Plaintiff's Condemnation Proceedings; and Claims for Damages (Re: #2 Complaint) by Ceon Jones, Gerald W. Jones, Larnell Dewayne Jones, Sheila Y. Jones, Myrna R. Roberts (With attachments) (dma, Deputy Clerk)
October 31, 2018 Filing 459 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Estate of Geraldine Austin Carr served on 10/13/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 458 ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White granting #457 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Teresa E. Wilson answer is due 11/16/18; and granting #457 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion; Responses due by 11/16/18 (Re: #164 MOTION for Hearing, #117 MOTION for Order Confirming Condemnation Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession of Easements Sought, and Expediting Briefing and Hearing Schedule) (dma, Deputy Clerk)
October 30, 2018 Filing 457 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint and MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion for order confirming condemnation authority (Re: #2 Complaint, #164 MOTION for Hearing, #117 MOTION for Order Confirming Condemnation Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession of Easements Sought, and Expediting Briefing and Hearing Schedule) by Teresa E. Wilson Responses due by 11/13/2018(Nelson, John)
October 30, 2018 Filing 456 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John M. Nelson on behalf of Teresa E. Wilson (Nelson, John)
October 30, 2018 Filing 455 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Federal Rule 71.1 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation and Motion for Order Confirming Condemnation Authority to BNK Petroleum (US), Inc served on 10/24/2018 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Bourenin, Vadim)
October 30, 2018 Filing 454 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Federal Rule 71.1 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation and Motion for Order Confirming Condemnation Authority to Eric O. Jones served on 10/17/2018 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Bourenin, Vadim)
October 30, 2018 Filing 453 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Federal Rule 71.1 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation and Motion for Order Confirming Condemnation Authority to Kimberly D. Burks served on 10/25/2018 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Bourenin, Vadim)
October 30, 2018 Filing 452 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Federal Rule 71.1 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation and Motion for Order Confirming Condemnation Authority to David Alan Risner served on 10/18/2018 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Bourenin, Vadim)
October 26, 2018 Filing 451 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Federal Rule 71.1 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation and Motion for Order Confirming Condemnation Authority to BNK Petroleum served on 10/17/2018 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Bourenin, Vadim)
October 26, 2018 Filing 450 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Federal Rule 71.1 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation and Motion for Order Confirming Condemnation Authority to BNK Petroleum served on 10/17/2018 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Bourenin, Vadim)
October 26, 2018 Filing 449 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Federal Rule 71.1 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation and Motion for Order Confirming Condemnation Authority to BNK Petroleum served on 10/17/2018 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Bourenin, Vadim)
October 26, 2018 Filing 448 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Federal Rule 71.1 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation and Motion for Order Confirming Condemnation Authority to BNK Petroleum served on 10/17/2018 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Bourenin, Vadim)
October 26, 2018 Filing 447 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to The Estate of Cecil Johnson, Deceased served on 09/21/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 446 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White granting #444 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; The Inez Akers Trust dated January 17, 1994 answer is due 11/16/2018; and granting #444 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion; Responses due by 11/16/2018 (Re: #117 MOTION for Order Confirming Condemnation Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession of Easements Sought, and Expediting Briefing and Hearing Schedule) (dma, Deputy Clerk)
October 25, 2018 Filing 445 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Federal Rule 71.1 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation and Motion for Order Confirming Condemnation Authority to Evan Carr served on 10/16/2018 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Bourenin, Vadim)
October 25, 2018 Filing 444 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint) and MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #117 MOTION for Order Confirming Condemnation Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession of Easements Sought, and Expediting Briefing and Hearing Schedule) by The Inez Akers Trust dated January 17, 1994, Responses due by 11/8/2018(Nelson, John). Added MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion and link on 10/25/2018 (dma, Deputy Clerk).
October 25, 2018 Filing 443 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John M. Nelson on behalf of Inez Akers Trust dated January 17, 1994, The (Nelson, John)
October 24, 2018 Filing 442 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Federal Rule 71.1 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation and Motion for Order Confirming Condemnation Authority to William David Lawrence served on 10/16/2018 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Bourenin, Vadim) Modified on 10/25/2018 to edit incorrect text and reflect service date (dma, Deputy Clerk).
October 24, 2018 Filing 441 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Federal Rule 71.1 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation and Motion for Order Confirming Condemnation Authority to MIchelle Berdahl served on 10/16/2018 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Bourenin, Vadim)
October 24, 2018 Filing 440 CERTIFICATE for Service by Publication - JO-0822.000 Upon Unknown Owners by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 24, 2018 Filing 439 CERTIFICATE for Service by Publication - JO-0819.000 Upon Unknown Owners by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 24, 2018 Filing 438 CERTIFICATE for Service by Publication - CR-0693.000 Upon Unknown Owners by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 24, 2018 Filing 437 CERTIFICATE for Service by Publication - CR-0629.000 Upon Unknown Owners by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 24, 2018 Filing 436 CERTIFICATE for Service by Publication - CR-0628.000 Upon Unknown Owners by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 24, 2018 Filing 435 CERTIFICATE for Service by - CR-0627.000 Upon Unknown Owners by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 24, 2018 Filing 434 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Federal Rule 71.1 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation and Motion for Order Confirming Condemnation Authority to Michael Anthony Davis served on 10/16/2018 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Bourenin, Vadim)
October 24, 2018 Filing 433 CERTIFICATE for Service by Publication - CR-0566.000 Upon Unknown Owners by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 24, 2018 Filing 432 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Federal Rule 71.1 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation and Motion for Order Confirming Condemnation Authority to Lorren Carr served on 10/17/2018 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Bourenin, Vadim)
October 24, 2018 Filing 431 CERTIFICATE for Service by Publication - CR-0518.010 Upon Unknown Owners by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 24, 2018 Filing 430 CERTIFICATE for Service by Publication - CR-0473.020 Upon Unknown Owners CR- by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 24, 2018 Filing 429 CERTIFICATE for Service by Publication - CR-0473.000 Upon Unknown Owners by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 24, 2018 Filing 428 CERTIFICATE for Service by Publication - CR-0472.000 Upon Unknown Owners by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 24, 2018 Filing 427 CERTIFICATE for Service by Publication - BR-1002.000 Upon Unknown Owners by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 24, 2018 Filing 426 CERTIFICATE for Service by Publication - BR-0967.000 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 24, 2018 Filing 425 CERTIFICATE for Service by Publication - BR-0965.000 Upon Unknown Owners by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 24, 2018 Filing 424 CERTIFICATE for Service by Publication - BR-0925.000 Upon Unknown Owners by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 24, 2018 Filing 423 CERTIFICATE for Service by Publication - BR-0905.000 Upon Unknown Owners by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 24, 2018 Filing 422 CERTIFICATE for Service by Publication - BR-0904.000 Upon Unknown Owners by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 24, 2018 Filing 421 CERTIFICATE for Service by Publication - BR-0903.000 Upon Unknown Owners by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 24, 2018 Filing 420 CERTIFICATE for Service by Publication - BR-0860.000 Upon Unknown Owners by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 419 ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White granting #415 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Monte Dean Drennan and Rhonda Marie Drennan's Answers due by 11/16/2018; and granting #415 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion; Responses due by 11/16/2018 (Re: #117 MOTION for Order Confirming Condemnation Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession of Easements Sought, and Expediting Briefing and Hearing Schedule) (dma, Deputy Clerk)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 418 ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White dismissing Maher Farms, LLC ((Tract CR-0710.000), (Tract CR-0713.000), (Tract CR-0711.000) and (Tract CR-0712.000)) (Re: #406 Notice of Dismissal) (dma, Deputy Clerk)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 417 ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White granting #407 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Citation 2004 Investment LP((Tract CR-0484.010) and (Tract CR-0500.000)) answer due 11/16/18; and granting #407 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion; Responses due by 11/16/2018 (Re: #117 MOTION for Order Confirming Condemnation Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession of Easements Sought, and Expediting Briefing and Hearing Schedule) (dma, Deputy Clerk)
October 24, 2018 Filing 416 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by George S. Padgitt on behalf of Monte Dean Drennan((Tract BR-0901.000)), Monte Dean Drennan((Tract BR-0898.000)), Rhonda Marie Drennan((Tract BR-0898.000)), Rhonda Marie Drennan((Tract BR-0901.000)) (Padgitt, George)
October 24, 2018 Filing 415 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint and MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #2 Complaint, #117 MOTION for Order Confirming Condemnation Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession of Easements Sought, and Expediting Briefing and Hearing Schedule) by Monte Dean Drennan((Tract BR-0901.000)), Monte Dean Drennan((Tract BR-0898.000)), Rhonda Marie Drennan((Tract BR-0898.000)), Rhonda Marie Drennan((Tract BR-0901.000)) Responses due by 11/7/2018(Ediger, Roger)
October 24, 2018 Filing 414 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Roger L. Ediger on behalf of Monte Dean Drennan((Tract BR-0901.000)), Monte Dean Drennan((Tract BR-0898.000)), Rhonda Marie Drennan((Tract BR-0898.000)), Rhonda Marie Drennan((Tract BR-0901.000)) (Ediger, Roger)
October 24, 2018 Filing 413 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Citation 2004 Investment LP c/o The Corporation Company served on 10/19/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 24, 2018 Filing 412 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Citation 2004 Investment LP c/o The Corporation Company served on 10/19/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 24, 2018 Filing 411 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Dorothy Louis Davis served on 10/14/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 24, 2018 Filing 410 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Federal Rule 71.1 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation and Motion for Order Confirming Condemnation Authority to Dorothy Olivia Ware served on 10/15/2018 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Bourenin, Vadim)
October 23, 2018 Filing 409 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Vadim O. Bourenin on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bourenin, Vadim)
October 23, 2018 Filing 408 SPECIAL APPEARANCE by Elliot P. Anderson on behalf of Citation 2004 Investment LP((Tract CR-0484.010)), Citation 2004 Investment LP((Tract CR-0500.000) ) (Anderson, Elliot)
October 23, 2018 Filing 407 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer , Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #2 Complaint, #117 MOTION for Order Confirming Condemnation Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession of Easements Sought, and Expediting Briefing and Hearing Schedule ) by Citation 2004 Investment LP((Tract CR-0484.010)), Citation 2004 Investment LP((Tract CR-0500.000) ) [NOTE: Attorney Elliot P. Anderson added to party Citation 2004 Investment LP(pty:dft), Attorney Elliot P. Anderson added to party Citation 2004 Investment LP(pty:dft)]. Responses due by 11/6/2018(Anderson, Elliot)
October 23, 2018 Filing 406 NOTICE of Dismissal, dismissing Maher Farms, LLC, (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
October 23, 2018 Filing 404 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Federal Rule 71.1 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation and Motion for Order Confirming Condemnation Authority to Lois J. Lofton Revocable Trust served on 10/18/2018 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 405 ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White dismissing without prejudice Defendant Carlin Edward Pennon as to Tract CR-0485.000. (Re: #394 Notice of Dismissal ) (tls, Deputy Clerk)
October 22, 2018 Filing 403 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Federal Rule 71.1 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation and Motion for Order Confirming Condemnation authority to Freddie Laverene Davis-English served on 10/17/2018 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
October 22, 2018 Filing 402 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of federal Rule 71.1 Notice of Condemnation and Motion for Order Confirming Condemnation Authority to Lois J. Lofton revocable Trust served on 10/18/2018 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 401 ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White dismissing without prejudice Cheri S. Clark Revocable Trust ((Tract CR-0472.000)) (Re: #395 Notice of Dismissal ) (tls, Deputy Clerk)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 400 ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White dismissing without prejudice James A. Clark Revocable Trust ((Tract CR-0472.000)) (Re: #396 Notice of Dismissal ) (tls, Deputy Clerk)
October 22, 2018 Filing 399 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Tract Nos. BR-0903.000; BR-0904.000; BR-0905.000; BR-0907.000; BR-0909.000; BR-0925.000; BR-1000.000; BR-1001.000; BR-1002.000; BR-1002.000; CR-0472.000; CR-0514.010; CR-0627.000; CR-0628.000; CR-0629.000; CR-0701.000; CR-0703.000; CR-0709.000 c/o John Nelson, Esq. served on 10/17/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 398 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White granting #378 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Ralph D. Ragan's answer is due 11/16/18 and granting #378 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #164 MOTION for Hearing, #117 MOTION for Order Confirming Condemnation Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession of Easements Sought, and Expediting Briefing and Hearing Schedule); Responses due by 11/16/18 (dma, Deputy Clerk)
October 19, 2018 Filing 397 NOTICE of Status of Service Update and MOTION for Hearing (Re: #117 MOTION for Order Confirming Condemnation Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession of Easements Sought and Expediting Briefing and Hearing Schedule) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC; Responses due 11/2/2018 (Zabel, Thomas) Modified on 10/22/2018 to make document a motion, add link and regenerate NEF (dma, Deputy Clerk).
October 19, 2018 Filing 396 NOTICE of Dismissal, dismissing The James A. Clark Revocable Trust, (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
October 19, 2018 Filing 395 NOTICE of Dismissal, dismissing The Cheri S. Clark Revocable Trust, (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
October 19, 2018 Filing 394 NOTICE of Dismissal, dismissing Carlin Edward Pennon as to Tract CR-0485.000, (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
October 19, 2018 Filing 393 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Valero Partners Operating Co. LLC, Corporate Parent Valero Energy Partners LP for Valero Partners Wynnewood, LLC) by Valero Partners Wynnewood, LLC((Tract CR-0517.010)) (Anderson, Elliot)
October 19, 2018 Filing 392 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Plains GP LLC, Corporate Parent Plains All American Pipeline LP, Corporate Parent PAA GP LLC for Plains Pipeline LP) by Plains Pipeline LP((Tract CR-0561.000) ) (Anderson, Elliot)
October 19, 2018 Filing 391 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by George S. Padgitt on behalf of Frances Gayle Pletcher((Tract CR-0632.000) Trustee), Frances Gayle Pletcher((Tract CR-0634.000) Trustee) (Padgitt, George)
October 19, 2018 Filing 390 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Federal Rule 71.1 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation and Motion for Order Confirming Condemnation Authority to Everett Carr served on 10/16/2018 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
October 19, 2018 Filing 389 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Rule 71.1 Notice of Condemnation and Motion for Order Confirming Condemnation Authority to the Inez Akers Trust served on 10/16/2018 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
October 19, 2018 Filing 388 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Lois J. Lofton Revocable Trust served on 10/09/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 19, 2018 Filing 387 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Brenda J. Lofton served on 10/09/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 19, 2018 Filing 386 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Wilma J. Peavy Lofton served on 09/30/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 19, 2018 Filing 385 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Nover Roberts a/k/a Nova Johnson Roberts served on 10/02/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 19, 2018 Filing 384 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to The Estate of Fred Lofton, Jr. served on 09/30/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 19, 2018 Filing 383 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to The Estate of Dorothy Lofton served on 09/30/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 19, 2018 Filing 382 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Estate of Craig Lofton served on 09/30/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 19, 2018 Filing 381 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Legend Bank, N.A. served on 10/08/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 19, 2018 Filing 380 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Gail Powell-Jones served on 10/03/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 19, 2018 Filing 379 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Bernice Curlie Powell served on 10/03/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 18, 2018 Filing 378 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #2 Complaint, #164 MOTION for Hearing, #117 MOTION for Order Confirming Condemnation Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession of Easements Sought, and Expediting Briefing and Hearing Schedule) by Ralph D. Ragan Responses due by 11/1/2018(Nelson, John)
October 18, 2018 Filing 377 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John M. Nelson on behalf of Ralph D. Ragan (Nelson, John)
October 18, 2018 Filing 376 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Wilma J. Peavy Lofton served on 09/30/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 18, 2018 Filing 375 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Natalia V. Lofton served on 09/30/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 18, 2018 Filing 374 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Estate of Fred Lofton, Jr. served on 09/30/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 18, 2018 Filing 373 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to The Estate of Craig Lofton served on 09/30/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 18, 2018 Filing 372 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Andre Brumfield served on 09/30/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 18, 2018 Filing 371 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Robert L. Rosner and Lauren B. Roesner served on 10/08/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 18, 2018 Filing 370 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Joe Coby Wells and Bobbie Jo Wells served on 10/08/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 18, 2018 Filing 369 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Willene Grimes served on 10/03/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 18, 2018 Filing 368 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Travis Osborn served on 10/07/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 18, 2018 Filing 367 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Gary Scott Wall served on 10/08/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 18, 2018 Filing 366 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to L.V. Phillips served on 10/05/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 18, 2018 Filing 365 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to J.T. Phillips served on October 5, 2018 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 364 ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White granting #362 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motions; Responses due by 11/16/2018 (Re: #164 MOTION for Hearing, #117 MOTION for Order Confirming Condemnation Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession of Easements Sought, and Expediting Briefing and Hearing Schedule) and granting #362 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Answers due 11/16/2018 (dma, Deputy Clerk)
October 18, 2018 Filing 363 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Karen Davis Rolle served on 10/17/2018 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas) Modified on 10/19/2018 to edit text (dma, Deputy Clerk).
October 17, 2018 Filing 362 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion, MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #164 MOTION for Hearing, #117 MOTION for Order Confirming Condemnation Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession of Easements Sought, and Expediting Briefing and Hearing Schedule, #2 Complaint) by Michelle Berdahl, Frances L. Cooley, Jackie M. Grounds((Tract BR-1000.000)), Jackie M. Grounds((Tract BR-1001.000)), Nolen G. Grounds((Tract BR-1001.000)), Nolen G. Grounds((Tract BR-1000.000)), Phyllis Hoogerhyde, Charleen Hunter, Donald Andrew Morris, Tom Morris, Unknown Heirs of George Gunter Risener, Unknown Heirs of Jack Wesley Risener, Unknown Heirs of Franklin Delano Risener, Unknown Heirs of Billie Gene Risener, Billy Gene Risner, David Alan Risner, Franklin James Risner, The William T. Cooley and Frances L. Cooley Survivors Trust, Responses due by 10/31/2018(Nelson, John) Modified on 10/18/2018 to add filer (dma, Deputy Clerk).
October 17, 2018 Filing 361 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John M. Nelson on behalf of Jackie M. Grounds((Tract BR-1000.000)), Jackie M. Grounds((Tract BR-1001.000)), Nolen G. Grounds((Tract BR-1001.000)), Nolen G. Grounds((Tract BR-1000.000)) (Nelson, John)
October 17, 2018 Filing 360 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John M. Nelson on behalf of Michelle Berdahl, Frances L. Cooley, Phyllis Hoogerhyde, Charleen Hunter, Donald Andrew Morris, Tom Morris, Unknown Heirs of George Gunter Risener, Unknown Heirs of Jack Wesley Risener, Unknown Heirs of Franklin Delano Risener, Unknown Heirs of Billie Gene Risener, Billy Gene Risner, David Alan Risner, Franklin James Risner, The William T. Cooley and Frances L. Cooley Survivors Trust, Nolen G. Grounds and Jackie M. Grounds (Nelson, John) Modified on 10/18/2018 to add filers (dma, Deputy Clerk).
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 359 ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White, re: dismissing Jamie J. Earles and Jeffery Earles (Tract CR-0651.000) (Re: #338 Notice of Dismissal) (dma, Deputy Clerk)
October 16, 2018 Filing 358 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Citation 2004 Investment LP C/O Citation Oil and Gas Corp. served on 10/03/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 16, 2018 Filing 357 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Heirs of Clara Pettis, Deceased served on 10/02/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 16, 2018 Filing 356 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Heirs of Buel Pettus, Sr., Deceased served on 10/02/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 16, 2018 Filing 355 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Shirley Lee Jones served on 10/02/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 16, 2018 Filing 354 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Nina Mae Jones King served on 10/04/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 16, 2018 Filing 353 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Jarva E. Oliver served on 10/04/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 16, 2018 Filing 352 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to The Executor, Executrix, and or Administrator of the Estate of Verlee Jones, Deceased, and All Heirs and, or Legatees, Devisees, Trustees, Creditors, and Assigns of Verlee Jones, Deceased, C/O Barbara Jones served on 10/04/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 16, 2018 Filing 351 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Barbara Jones served on 10/04/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 16, 2018 Filing 350 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Andre Jones served on 10/04/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 16, 2018 Filing 349 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Jerry Walker served on 10/01/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 16, 2018 Filing 348 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Barbara Christopher served on 10/04/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 16, 2018 Filing 347 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Franklin James Risner served on 10/02/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 16, 2018 Filing 346 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Billy Gene Risner served on 10/02/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 16, 2018 Filing 345 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to LC-MAC LLC served on 10/03/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 16, 2018 Filing 344 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to LC-MAC LLC served on 10/03/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 16, 2018 Filing 343 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to LC-MAC LLC served on 10/03/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 16, 2018 Filing 342 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Monte Dean Drennan and Rhonda Marie Drennan served on 10/10/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 16, 2018 Filing 341 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Monte Dean Drennan and Rhonda Marie Drennan served on 10/10/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 15, 2018 Filing 340 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Amended Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Dorthy Givens served on 09/27/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 15, 2018 Filing 339 CERTIFICATE for Service by Publication - BR-0905.000 upon Unknown Defendants by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (With attachments)(Schwartz, Mason)
October 15, 2018 Filing 338 NOTICE of Dismissal, dismissing Jeffery Earles and Jamie J. Earles, (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 337 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White granting #329 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion; Responses due by 11/16/2018 (Re: #117 MOTION for Order Confirming Condemnation Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession of Easements Sought, and Expediting Briefing and Hearing Schedule) as to LC-MAC, LLC, M. Leslie Prentice, Michelle Leslie Prentice and Walter L. Prentice (dma, Deputy Clerk)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 336 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White granting #328 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Answer due 11/16/18 as to LC-MAC, LLC, M. Leslie Prentice, Michelle Leslie Prentice and Walter L. Prentice (dma, Deputy Clerk)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 335 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White granting #324 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer and granting #324 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion. Answer and Response due by 11/16/2018 (Re: #117 MOTION for Order Confirming Condemnation Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession of Easements Sought, and Expediting Briefing and Hearing Schedule) as to Plains Pipeline LP and Valero Partners Wynnewood, LLC (dma, Deputy Clerk)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 334 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White granting #322 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer and granting #322 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion. Answer and Response due by 11/16/2018 (Re: #117 MOTION for Order Confirming Condemnation Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession of Easements Sought, and Expediting Briefing and Hearing Schedule) as to Frances Gayle Pletcher Revocable Trust and Frances Gayle Pletcher (dma, Deputy Clerk)
October 15, 2018 Filing 333 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Melinda K. Craig served on 10/04/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 15, 2018 Filing 332 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Charlene Breath served on 10/10/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 12, 2018 Filing 331 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #322 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer and MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
October 12, 2018 Filing 330 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jacob R. Parker on behalf of LC-MAC LLC((Tract BR-0918.000)), LC-MAC, LLC((Tract BR-0921.000)), LC-MAC, LLC((Tract BR-0920.000)), M. Leslie Prentice((Tract BR-0943.000) ), M. Leslie Prentice((Tract BR-0945.000)), Michelle Leslie Prentice((Tract BR-0941.000)), Michelle Leslie Prentice((Tract BR-0940.000)), Walter L. Prentice((Tract BR-0940.000) ), Walter L. Prentice((Tract BR-0941.000)), Walter L. Prentice((Tract BR-0943.000)), Walter L. Prentice((Tract BR-0945.000)) (Parker, Jacob)
October 12, 2018 Filing 329 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #117 MOTION for Order Confirming Condemnation Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession of Easements Sought, and Expediting Briefing and Hearing Schedule ) by LC-MAC LLC((Tract BR-0918.000)), LC-MAC, LLC((Tract BR-0921.000)), LC-MAC, LLC((Tract BR-0920.000)), M. Leslie Prentice((Tract BR-0943.000) ), M. Leslie Prentice((Tract BR-0945.000)), Michelle Leslie Prentice((Tract BR-0941.000)), Michelle Leslie Prentice((Tract BR-0940.000)), Walter L. Prentice((Tract BR-0940.000) ), Walter L. Prentice((Tract BR-0941.000)), Walter L. Prentice((Tract BR-0943.000)), Walter L. Prentice((Tract BR-0945.000)) Responses due by 10/26/2018(Beadles, Logan)
October 12, 2018 Filing 328 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint ) by LC-MAC LLC((Tract BR-0918.000)), LC-MAC, LLC((Tract BR-0921.000)), LC-MAC, LLC((Tract BR-0920.000)), M. Leslie Prentice((Tract BR-0943.000) ), M. Leslie Prentice((Tract BR-0945.000)), Michelle Leslie Prentice((Tract BR-0941.000)), Michelle Leslie Prentice((Tract BR-0940.000)), Walter L. Prentice((Tract BR-0940.000) ), Walter L. Prentice((Tract BR-0941.000)), Walter L. Prentice((Tract BR-0943.000)), Walter L. Prentice((Tract BR-0945.000)) Responses due by 10/26/2018(Beadles, Logan)
October 12, 2018 Filing 327 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Richard K. Holmes on behalf of M. Leslie Prentice((Tract BR-0943.000)), M. Leslie Prentice((Tract BR-0945.000)), Michelle Leslie Prentice((Tract BR-0941.000)), Michelle Leslie Prentice((Tract BR-0940.000)), Walter L. Prentice((Tract BR-0940.000) ), Walter L. Prentice((Tract BR-0941.000)), Walter L. Prentice((Tract BR-0943.000)), Walter L. Prentice((Tract BR-0945.000)) and LC-MAC, LLC (Holmes, Richard) Modified on 10/15/2018 to add filer (dma, Deputy Clerk).
October 12, 2018 Filing 326 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by LC-MAC LLC((Tract BR-0918.000)), LC-MAC, LLC((Tract BR-0921.000)), LC-MAC, LLC((Tract BR-0920.000)) (Beadles, Logan)
October 12, 2018 Filing 325 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Logan Beadles on behalf of LC-MAC LLC((Tract BR-0918.000)), LC-MAC, LLC((Tract BR-0921.000)), LC-MAC, LLC((Tract BR-0920.000)), M. Leslie Prentice((Tract BR-0943.000) ), M. Leslie Prentice((Tract BR-0945.000)), Michelle Leslie Prentice((Tract BR-0941.000)), Michelle Leslie Prentice((Tract BR-0940.000)), Walter L. Prentice((Tract BR-0940.000) ), Walter L. Prentice((Tract BR-0941.000)), Walter L. Prentice((Tract BR-0943.000)), Walter L. Prentice((Tract BR-0945.000)) (Beadles, Logan)
October 12, 2018 Filing 324 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint) and MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #117 MOTION for Order Confirming Condemnation Authority) by Plains Pipeline LP((Tract CR-0561.000) ), Plains Pipeline LP((Tract CR-0517.010)), Valero Partners Wynnewood, LLC((Tract CR-0517.010)), Valero Partners Wynnewood, LLC((Tract CR-0561.000)) Responses due by 10/26/2018(Anderson, Elliot). Added link and MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion on 10/12/2018 (dma, Deputy Clerk).
October 12, 2018 Filing 323 SPECIAL APPEARANCE by Elliot P. Anderson on behalf of Plains Pipeline LP((Tract CR-0561.000) ), Plains Pipeline LP((Tract CR-0517.010) ), Valero Partners Wynnewood, LLC((Tract CR-0517.010)), Valero Partners Wynnewood, LLC((Tract CR-0561.000) ) (Anderson, Elliot)
October 12, 2018 Filing 322 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer and MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #2 Complaint, #117 MOTION for Order Confirming Condemnation Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession of Easements Sought, and Expediting Briefing and Hearing Schedule) by Frances Gayle Pletcher((Tract CR-0632.000) Trustee), Frances Gayle Pletcher((Tract CR-0634.000) Trustee) and Frances Gayle Pletcher Revocable Trust; Responses due by 10/26/2018(Ediger, Roger) Modified on 10/15/2018 to add filer (dma, Deputy Clerk).
October 12, 2018 Filing 321 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Roger L. Ediger on behalf of Frances Gayle Pletcher((Tract CR-0632.000) Trustee), Frances Gayle Pletcher((Tract CR-0634.000) Trustee) and Frances Gayle Pletcher Revocable Trust (Ediger, Roger) Modified on 10/15/2018 to add filer (dma, Deputy Clerk).
October 12, 2018 Filing 320 NOTICE of Dismissal, dismissing 3 - J Farms, L.C. a/k/a 3-J Farms, LLC, (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
October 12, 2018 Filing 319 NOTICE of Dismissal, dismissing OklahomaRanch.com, LLC, (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
October 11, 2018 Filing 318 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Bobby Osborne served on 09/26/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 10, 2018 Filing 317 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #249 MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION to Compel MOTION to Extend Deadline(s) ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC ; (With attachments)(Zabel, Thomas)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White (Re: #300 Notice of Dismissal ) (lal, Deputy Clerk)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 315 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White granting Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed 10/4/18 ( #245 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; #245 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion). Accordingly, these defendants have until 11/16/18 within which to file their answer or otherwise plead as well as respond to the pending motion by plaintiff for order confirming condemnation authority (Re: #117 MOTION for Order Confirming Condemnation Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession of Easements Sought, and Expediting Briefing and Hearing Schedule). (lal, Deputy Clerk)
October 10, 2018 Filing 314 CERTIFICATE for Service by Publication - CR-0517.010 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (With attachments)(Schwartz, Mason)
October 10, 2018 Filing 313 CERTIFICATE for Service by Publication - CR-0514.010 Upon Unknown Owners by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (With attachments)(Schwartz, Mason)
October 10, 2018 Filing 312 CERTIFICATE of Service by Publication - BR-1002.000 Upon Unknown Owners by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (With attachments)(Schwartz, Mason)
October 10, 2018 Filing 311 CERTIFICATE for Service by Publication - BR-0909.000 Upon Unknown Owners by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (With attachments)(Schwartz, Mason)
October 10, 2018 Filing 310 CERTIFICATE for Service by Publication - BR-0907.000 Upon Unknown Owners by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (With attachments)(Schwartz, Mason)
October 10, 2018 Filing 309 AFFIDAVIT of Attempted Service on Gerald W. Jones by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 10, 2018 Filing 308 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Larnell Dewayne Jones served on 10/09/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 9, 2018 Filing 307 CERTIFICATE for Service by Publication - CR-0700.000 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (With attachments)(Schwartz, Mason)
October 9, 2018 Filing 306 CERTIFICATE for Service by Publication - CR-0566.000 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (With attachments)(Schwartz, Mason)
October 9, 2018 Filing 305 CERTIFICATE for Service by Publication - CR-0485.000 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (With attachments)(Schwartz, Mason)
October 9, 2018 Filing 304 CERTIFICATE for Service by Publication - CR-0484.020 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (With attachments)(Schwartz, Mason)
October 9, 2018 Filing 303 CERTIFICATE for Service by Publication - BR-0905.000 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (With attachments)(Schwartz, Mason)
October 9, 2018 Filing 302 CERTIFICATE for Service by Publication - BR-0904.000 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (With attachments)(Schwartz, Mason)
October 9, 2018 Filing 301 CERTIFICATE for Service by Publication - BR-0903.000 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (With attachments)(Schwartz, Mason)
October 9, 2018 Filing 300 NOTICE of Dismissal, dismissing Farm Service Agency, USDA as it relates to Tract BR-0942.000, dismissing Plaintiff's claims, (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
October 9, 2018 Filing 299 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #245 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer; MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion) by Henderson G. Anderson((Tract BR-0995.000) Co-Trustee of the Anderson Family Revocable Trust under written agreement dated January 21, 2009), Henderson G. Anderson((Tract BR-0994.000) Co-Trustee of the Anderson Family Revocable Trust under written agreement dated January 21, 2009), Henderson G. Anderson((Tract BR-0996.000) Co-Trustee of the Anderson Family Revocable Trust under written agreement dated January 21, 2009), Sherron Katherine Anderson((Tract BR-0995.000) Co-Trustee of the Anderson Family Revocable Trust under written agreement dated January 21, 2009), Sherron Katherine Anderson((Tract BR-0996.000) Co-Trustee of the Anderson Family Revocable Trust under written agreement dated January 21, 2009), Sherron Katherine Anderson((Tract BR-0994.000) Co-Trustee of the Anderson Family Revocable Trust under written agreement dated January 21, 2009), Donna Caldwell((Tract BR-0993.000)), Donna Caldwell((Tract BR-0991.000)), Wayne Caldwell((Tract BR-0991.000)), Wayne Caldwell((Tract BR-0993.000)), Anna Kathryn Chappa, Lee Chappa, W. Lee Coffey((Tract CR-0623.000) ), W. Lee Coffey((Tract CR-0620.000) ), W. Lee Coffey((Tract CR-0622.000) ), Daube Arbuckle Ranch, LLC((Tract CR-0566.000) ), Daube Arbuckle Ranch, LLC((Tract CR-0568.000) ), Daube Arbuckle Ranch, LLC((Tract CR-0563.000) ), Daube Arbuckle Ranch, LLC((Tract CR-0567.000) ), Daube Arbuckle Ranch, LLC((Tract CR-0561.000) ), Daube Arbuckle Ranch, LLC((Tract CR-0565.000) ), Daube Arbuckle Ranch, LLC((Tract CR-0564.000)), Daube Arbuckle Ranch, LLC((Tract CR-0569.000) ), Denise K. Davis((Tract CR-0703.000) Special Administrator of the Estate of Sammie J. Herriott, deceased, all heirs and, or legatees, devisees, trustees, creditors and assigns of Sammie J. Herriott, deceased), Denise K. Davis((Tract CR-0703.000) Special Administrator of the Estate of Warren H. Herriott, deceased. all heirs and, or legatees, devisees, trustees, creditors and assigns of Warren H. Herriott, deceased), Denise K. Davis((Tract CR-0701.000) Special Administrator of the Estate of Warren H. Herriott, deceased, and all heirs and, or legatees, devisees, trustees, creditors and assigns of Warren H. Herriott, deceased ), Denise K. Davis((Tract CR-0709.000) Special Administrator of the Estate of Warren H. Herriott, deceased, and all heirs and, or legatees, devisees, trustees, creditors and assigns of Warren H. Herriott, deceased), Denise K. Davis((Tract CR-0709.000) Special Administrator of the Estate of Sammie J. Herriott, deceased, and all heirs and, or legatees, devisees, trustees, creditors and assigns of Sammie J. Herriott, deceased), Denise K. Davis((Tract CR-0701.000) Special Administrator of the Estate of Sammie J. Herriott, deceased, and all heirs and, or legatees, devisees, trustees, creditors and assigns of Sammie J. Herriott, deceased), Don M. Haggerty, Hazel C. Haggerty, Bessie Harris, Robert Eugene Harris, Ranada D. Hulsey((Tract JO-0753.000) ), Ranada D. Hulsey((Tract JO-0754.000) ), Raymond A. Hulsey((Tract JO-0754.000) ), Raymond A. Hulsey((Tract JO-0753.000) ), James S. Ingram((Tract BR-0990.000)), James S. Ingram((Tract BR-0988.000)), Billy Miller((Tract BR-0909.000)), Billy Miller((Tract BR-0907.000)), Misty Hall Murphree((Tract BR-0904.000)), Misty Hall Murphree((Tract BR-0903.000)), Misty Hall Murphree((Tract BR-0905.000)), Marla Hall Richardson((Tract BR-0905.000)), Marla Hall Richardson((Tract BR-0903.000)), Marla Hall Richardson((Tract BR-0904.000)), Riesen Properties, LLC, Lydia L. Roper((Tract BR-0887.000)), Lydia L. Roper((Tract BR-0888.000)), Simon Creek, Inc., Barbara J. Smith, Casey B. Smith((Tract CR-0627.000) ), Casey B. Smith((Tract CR-0628.000) ), Casey B. Smith((Tract CR-0629.000) ), Kristy J. Smith((Tract CR-0628.000) ), Kristy J. Smith((Tract CR-0627.000) ), Kristy J. Smith((Tract CR-0629.000) ), Larry D. Smith, Speake Land Holdings LLC((Tract CR-0578.000) ), Speake Land Holdings LLC((Tract CR-0570.000) ), Speake Land Holdings LLC((Tract CR-0571.000) ), Speake Land Holdings LLC((Tract CR-0572.000) ), Speake Land Holdings LLC((Tract CR-0573.000) ), Speake Land Holdings LLC((Tract CR-0597.010) ), WLC Land and Mineral, LLC, Linda D. Ingram, Central Land Consulting and Central Land Consulting LLC (With attachments)(Nelson, John) Modified on 10/11/2018 to add filers (dma, Deputy Clerk).
October 8, 2018 Filing 298 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Ralph D. Ragan served on 09/24/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 8, 2018 Filing 297 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Raymond A. Hulsey and Ranada D. Hulsey served on 09/24/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 8, 2018 Filing 296 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Raymond A. Hulsey and Ranada D. Hulsey served on 09/24/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 8, 2018 Filing 295 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to 4-J Farms, LC a/k/a 3-J Farms LLC served on 09/27/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 8, 2018 Filing 294 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to 3-J Farms, LC. a/k/a 3-J Farms, LLC served on 09/27/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 8, 2018 Filing 293 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Estate of Alberta Douglas, Deceased served on 09/21/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 8, 2018 Filing 292 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Katherine Johnson served on 09/21/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 8, 2018 Filing 291 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Carolyn Pirtle served on 09/25/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 8, 2018 Filing 290 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Albert Johnson served on 09/21/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 8, 2018 Filing 289 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Frances Gayle Pletcher Revocable Trust, Frances Gayle Pletcher, Trustee served on 09/25/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 8, 2018 Filing 288 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Frances Gayle Pletcher Revocable Trust, Frances Gayle Pletcher, Trustee served on 09/25/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 8, 2018 Filing 287 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Larry D. Smith and Barbara J. Smith served on 09/25/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 8, 2018 Filing 286 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Oklahomaranch.com LLC served on 09/25/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 8, 2018 Filing 285 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Theresa (Bully) Prough served on 09/27/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 8, 2018 Filing 284 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Sharon K. (Bully) Zondor served on 09/27/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 8, 2018 Filing 283 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Alvin Bully served on 09/27/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 8, 2018 Filing 282 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to The Estate of Kate Rogene Lawrence Staggs, Deceased served on 09/30/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 8, 2018 Filing 281 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to R.C. Staggs served on 09/30/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 8, 2018 Filing 280 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Michael Ivan Lawrence served on 09/27/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 8, 2018 Filing 279 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Mamie Bess Lawrence, Now Jones served on 09/30/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 8, 2018 Filing 278 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Lou Cronin served on 09/23/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 8, 2018 Filing 277 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Doretha J. Wall served on 09/30/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 8, 2018 Filing 276 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to The Estate of Isaac Franklin, Deceased served on 09/29/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 8, 2018 Filing 275 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to The Estate of Annie Franklin, Deceased served on 09/29/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 8, 2018 Filing 274 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to The Estate of Isaac Franklin, Deceased served on 09/29/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 8, 2018 Filing 273 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Estate of Annie Franklin, Deceased served on 09/29/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 8, 2018 Filing 272 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to The Estate of Devola Langetta Pennon, Deceased served on 09/29/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 8, 2018 Filing 271 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Robert R. Pennon served on 09/29/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 8, 2018 Filing 270 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to The Estate of Cecil Jones, Deceased served on 09/29/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 8, 2018 Filing 269 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Myrna R. Roberts served on 09/29/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 8, 2018 Filing 268 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Cleta Jones served on 09/29/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 8, 2018 Filing 267 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Ceon Jones served on 09/28/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 8, 2018 Filing 266 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Dorthy Louis Davis served on 09/27/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 8, 2018 Filing 265 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Walter L. Prentice and Michelle Leslie Prentice served on 09/28/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 8, 2018 Filing 264 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Walter L. Prentice and Michelle Leslie Prentice served on 09/28/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 8, 2018 Filing 263 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Farm Service Agency, USDA served on 09/27/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 8, 2018 Filing 262 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Walter L. Prentice and Michelle Leslie Prentice served on 09/28/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 8, 2018 Filing 261 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Walter L. Prentice and Michelle Leslie Prentice served on 09/28/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 8, 2018 Filing 260 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Dale and Donna Owens served on 09/27/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 8, 2018 Filing 259 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Tom Morris served on 09/28/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 8, 2018 Filing 258 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Simon Creek, Inc. served on 09/27/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 8, 2018 Filing 257 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Don M. Haggerty and Hazel C. Haggerty served on 09/27/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 5, 2018 Filing 256 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Speake Land Holdings, LLC served on 09/22/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 5, 2018 Filing 255 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Speake Land Holdings, LLC served on 09/22/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 5, 2018 Filing 254 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Speake Land Holdings, LLC served on 09/22/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 5, 2018 Filing 253 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Speake Land Holdings, LLC served on 09/22/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 5, 2018 Filing 252 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Speake Land Holdings, LLC served on 09/22/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 5, 2018 Filing 251 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Speake Land Holdings, LLC served on 09/22/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 5, 2018 Filing 250 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to The Executor, Executrix, and or Administrator of the Estate of Lawrence Pettus, Deceased, and all Heirs and, or Legatees, Devisees, Trustees, Creditors, and Assigns of Lawrence Pettus,Deceased served on 09/23/918 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 5, 2018 Filing 248 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John M. Nelson on behalf of Central Land Consulting, LLC((Tract BR-0995.000)), Bessie Harris (Nelson, John)
October 4, 2018 Filing 249 PRO SE MOTION for Summary Judgment, MOTION to Compel, MOTION to Extend Deadline(s) (entitled "Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Negotiate in Good Faith for the Use of Their Real Property and, alternatively, Motion for Extension of Time to File Supporting Brief") by Gerald W. Jones, Larnell Dewayne Jones, Sheila Y. Jones and Myrna R. Roberts Responses due by 10/18/2018(lal, Deputy Clerk)
October 4, 2018 Filing 247 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #245 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (With attachments)(Zabel, Thomas)
October 4, 2018 Filing 246 NOTICE Certificate of Interest by Simon Creek, Inc. (Nelson, John)
October 4, 2018 Filing 245 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer and MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #2 Complaint, #164 MOTION for Hearing, #117 MOTION for Order Confirming Condemnation Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession of Easements Sought, and Expediting Briefing and Hearing Schedule) by Henderson G. Anderson((Tract BR-0995.000) Co-Trustee of the Anderson Family Revocable Trust under written agreement dated January 21, 2009), Henderson G. Anderson((Tract BR-0994.000) Co-Trustee of the Anderson Family Revocable Trust under written agreement dated January 21, 2009), Henderson G. Anderson((Tract BR-0996.000) Co-Trustee of the Anderson Family Revocable Trust under written agreement dated January 21, 2009), Sherron Katherine Anderson((Tract BR-0995.000) Co-Trustee of the Anderson Family Revocable Trust under written agreement dated January 21, 2009), Sherron Katherine Anderson((Tract BR-0996.000) Co-Trustee of the Anderson Family Revocable Trust under written agreement dated January 21, 2009), Sherron Katherine Anderson((Tract BR-0994.000) Co-Trustee of the Anderson Family Revocable Trust under written agreement dated January 21, 2009), Donna Caldwell((Tract BR-0993.000)), Donna Caldwell((Tract BR-0991.000)), Wayne Caldwell((Tract BR-0991.000)), Wayne Caldwell((Tract BR-0993.000)), Anna Kathryn Chappa, Lee Chappa, W. Lee Coffey((Tract CR-0623.000) ), W. Lee Coffey((Tract CR-0620.000) ), W. Lee Coffey((Tract CR-0622.000) ), Daube Arbuckle Ranch, LLC((Tract CR-0566.000) ), Daube Arbuckle Ranch, LLC((Tract CR-0568.000) ), Daube Arbuckle Ranch, LLC((Tract CR-0563.000) ), Daube Arbuckle Ranch, LLC((Tract CR-0567.000) ), Daube Arbuckle Ranch, LLC((Tract CR-0561.000) ), Daube Arbuckle Ranch, LLC((Tract CR-0565.000) ), Daube Arbuckle Ranch, LLC((Tract CR-0564.000)), Daube Arbuckle Ranch, LLC((Tract CR-0569.000) ), Denise K. Davis((Tract CR-0703.000) Special Administrator of the Estate of Sammie J. Herriott, deceased, all heirs and, or legatees, devisees, trustees, creditors and assigns of Sammie J. Herriott, deceased), Denise K. Davis((Tract CR-0703.000) Special Administrator of the Estate of Warren H. Herriott, deceased. all heirs and, or legatees, devisees, trustees, creditors and assigns of Warren H. Herriott, deceased), Denise K. Davis((Tract CR-0701.000) Special Administrator of the Estate of Warren H. Herriott, deceased, and all heirs and, or legatees, devisees, trustees, creditors and assigns of Warren H. Herriott, deceased ), Denise K. Davis((Tract CR-0709.000) Special Administrator of the Estate of Warren H. Herriott, deceased, and all heirs and, or legatees, devisees, trustees, creditors and assigns of Warren H. Herriott, deceased), Denise K. Davis((Tract CR-0709.000) Special Administrator of the Estate of Sammie J. Herriott, deceased, and all heirs and, or legatees, devisees, trustees, creditors and assigns of Sammie J. Herriott, deceased), Denise K. Davis((Tract CR-0701.000) Special Administrator of the Estate of Sammie J. Herriott, deceased, and all heirs and, or legatees, devisees, trustees, creditors and assigns of Sammie J. Herriott, deceased), Don M. Haggerty, Hazel C. Haggerty, Bessie Harris, Robert Eugene Harris, Ranada D. Hulsey((Tract JO-0753.000) ), Ranada D. Hulsey((Tract JO-0754.000) ), Raymond A. Hulsey((Tract JO-0754.000) ), Raymond A. Hulsey((Tract JO-0753.000) ), James S. Ingram((Tract BR-0990.000)), James S. Ingram((Tract BR-0988.000)), Linda D. Ingram((Tract BR-0990.000)), Linda D. Ingram((Tract BR-0988.000)), Billy Miller((Tract BR-0909.000)), Billy Miller((Tract BR-0907.000)), Misty Hall Murphree((Tract BR-0904.000)), Misty Hall Murphree((Tract BR-0903.000)), Misty Hall Murphree((Tract BR-0905.000)), Marla Hall Richardson((Tract BR-0905.000)), Marla Hall Richardson((Tract BR-0903.000)), Marla Hall Richardson((Tract BR-0904.000)), Riesen Properties, LLC, Lydia L. Roper((Tract BR-0887.000)), Lydia L. Roper((Tract BR-0888.000)), Simon Creek, Inc., Barbara J. Smith, Larry D. Smith, Speake Land Holdings LLC((Tract CR-0578.000) ), Speake Land Holdings LLC((Tract CR-0570.000) ), Speake Land Holdings LLC((Tract CR-0571.000) ), Speake Land Holdings LLC((Tract CR-0572.000) ), Speake Land Holdings LLC((Tract CR-0573.000) ), Speake Land Holdings LLC((Tract CR-0597.010) ), WLC Land and Mineral, LLC; Casey B. Smith and Kristy J. Smith (With attachments) Responses due by 10/18/2018(Nelson, John) Modified on 10/5/2018 to add filers (dma, Deputy Clerk).
October 3, 2018 Filing 244 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John M. Nelson on behalf of Henderson G. Anderson((Tract BR-0995.000) Co-Trustee of the Anderson Family Revocable Trust under written agreement dated January 21, 2009), Henderson G. Anderson((Tract BR-0994.000) Co-Trustee of the Anderson Family Revocable Trust under written agreement dated January 21, 2009), Henderson G. Anderson((Tract BR-0996.000) Co-Trustee of the Anderson Family Revocable Trust under written agreement dated January 21, 2009), Sherron Katherine Anderson((Tract BR-0995.000) Co-Trustee of the Anderson Family Revocable Trust under written agreement dated January 21, 2009), Sherron Katherine Anderson((Tract BR-0996.000) Co-Trustee of the Anderson Family Revocable Trust under written agreement dated January 21, 2009), Sherron Katherine Anderson((Tract BR-0994.000) Co-Trustee of the Anderson Family Revocable Trust under written agreement dated January 21, 2009), Donna Caldwell((Tract BR-0993.000)), Donna Caldwell((Tract BR-0991.000)), Wayne Caldwell((Tract BR-0991.000)), Wayne Caldwell((Tract BR-0993.000)), Anna Kathryn Chappa, Lee Chappa, W. Lee Coffey((Tract CR-0623.000) ), W. Lee Coffey((Tract CR-0620.000) ), W. Lee Coffey((Tract CR-0622.000) ), Daube Arbuckle Ranch, LLC((Tract CR-0566.000) ), Daube Arbuckle Ranch, LLC((Tract CR-0568.000) ), Daube Arbuckle Ranch, LLC((Tract CR-0563.000) ), Daube Arbuckle Ranch, LLC((Tract CR-0567.000) ), Daube Arbuckle Ranch, LLC((Tract CR-0561.000) ), Daube Arbuckle Ranch, LLC((Tract CR-0565.000) ), Daube Arbuckle Ranch, LLC((Tract CR-0564.000)), Daube Arbuckle Ranch, LLC((Tract CR-0569.000) ), Denise K. Davis((Tract CR-0703.000) Special Administrator of the Estate of Sammie J. Herriott, deceased, all heirs and, or legatees, devisees, trustees, creditors and assigns of Sammie J. Herriott, deceased), Denise K. Davis((Tract CR-0703.000) Special Administrator of the Estate of Warren H. Herriott, deceased. all heirs and, or legatees, devisees, trustees, creditors and assigns of Warren H. Herriott, deceased), Denise K. Davis((Tract CR-0701.000) Special Administrator of the Estate of Warren H. Herriott, deceased, and all heirs and, or legatees, devisees, trustees, creditors and assigns of Warren H. Herriott, deceased ), Denise K. Davis((Tract CR-0709.000) Special Administrator of the Estate of Warren H. Herriott, deceased, and all heirs and, or legatees, devisees, trustees, creditors and assigns of Warren H. Herriott, deceased), Denise K. Davis((Tract CR-0709.000) Special Administrator of the Estate of Sammie J. Herriott, deceased, and all heirs and, or legatees, devisees, trustees, creditors and assigns of Sammie J. Herriott, deceased), Denise K. Davis((Tract CR-0701.000) Special Administrator of the Estate of Sammie J. Herriott, deceased, and all heirs and, or legatees, devisees, trustees, creditors and assigns of Sammie J. Herriott, deceased), Don M. Haggerty, Hazel C. Haggerty, Bessie Harris, Robert Eugene Harris, Ranada D. Hulsey((Tract JO-0753.000) ), Ranada D. Hulsey((Tract JO-0754.000) ), Raymond A. Hulsey((Tract JO-0754.000) ), Raymond A. Hulsey((Tract JO-0753.000) ), James S. Ingram((Tract BR-0990.000)), James S. Ingram((Tract BR-0988.000)), Linda D. Ingram((Tract BR-0990.000)), Linda D. Ingram((Tract BR-0988.000)), Billy Miller((Tract BR-0909.000)), Billy Miller((Tract BR-0907.000)), Misty Hall Murphree((Tract BR-0904.000)), Misty Hall Murphree((Tract BR-0903.000)), Misty Hall Murphree((Tract BR-0905.000)), Marla Hall Richardson((Tract BR-0905.000)), Marla Hall Richardson((Tract BR-0903.000)), Marla Hall Richardson((Tract BR-0904.000)), Riesen Properties, LLC, Lydia L. Roper((Tract BR-0887.000)), Lydia L. Roper((Tract BR-0888.000)), Simon Creek, Inc., Barbara J. Smith, Casey B. Smith((Tract CR-0627.000) ), Casey B. Smith((Tract CR-0628.000) ), Casey B. Smith((Tract CR-0629.000) ), Kristy J. Smith((Tract CR-0628.000) ), Kristy J. Smith((Tract CR-0627.000) ), Kristy J. Smith((Tract CR-0629.000) ), Larry D. Smith, Speake Land Holdings LLC((Tract CR-0578.000) ), Speake Land Holdings LLC((Tract CR-0570.000) ), Speake Land Holdings LLC((Tract CR-0571.000) ), Speake Land Holdings LLC((Tract CR-0572.000) ), Speake Land Holdings LLC((Tract CR-0573.000) ), Speake Land Holdings LLC((Tract CR-0597.010) ), WLC Land and Mineral, LLC; Central Land Consulting and Central Land Consulting LLC (Nelson, John) Modified on 10/9/2018 to add filers (dma, Deputy Clerk).
October 2, 2018 Filing 243 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Sheila Y. Jones served on 09/24/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason) Modified on 10/5/2018 to edit date (dma, Deputy Clerk).
October 2, 2018 Filing 242 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to The Executor, Executrix, or Administrator of the Estate of Paul Akins, Deceased, and All Heirs and, or Legatees, Devisees, Trustees, Creditors and Assigns of Paul Akins, Deceased served on 09/23/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 2, 2018 Filing 241 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to The Executor, Executrix and, or Administrator of the Estate of Clifford Akins, Deceased, and All Heirs and Legatees, Devisees, Trustees, Creditors, and Assigns of Clifford Akins, Deceased served on 09/23/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 2, 2018 Filing 240 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Nolen G. Grounds and Jackie M. Grounds served on 09/23/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 2, 2018 Filing 239 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Nolen G. Grounds and Jackie M. Grounds served on 09/23/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 2, 2018 Filing 238 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Henderson G. Anderson and Sherron Katherine Anderson, Co-Trustees of the Anderson Family Revocable Trust Under Written Agreement Dated 1/21/2009 served on 09/24/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 2, 2018 Filing 237 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Henderson G. Anderson and Sherron Katherine Anderson, Co-Trustees of the Anderson Family Revocable Trust Under Written Agreement Dated 1/21/2009 served on 09/24/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 2, 2018 Filing 236 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Henderson G. Anderson and Sherron Katherine Anderson, Co-Trustees of the Anderson Family Revocable Trust Under Written Agreement Dated 1/21/2009 served on 09/24/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 2, 2018 Filing 235 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Lucas Don Jackson served on 09/23/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 2, 2018 Filing 234 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Delane Jackson served on 09/23/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 1, 2018 Filing 233 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Michi Morris served on 9/25/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 1, 2018 Filing 232 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Plains Pipeline, L.P c/o Corporation Services Company served on 09/21/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 1, 2018 Filing 231 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to John Johnson served on 09/22/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 1, 2018 Filing 230 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Elaine Johnson served on 09/22/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 1, 2018 Filing 229 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to The Executor, Executrix, and or Administrator of the Estate of Fred O. Lofton, Sr., Deceased, and all Heirs and, or Legatees, Devisees, Trustees, Creditors, and Assigns of Fred O. Lofton, Sr., Deceased served on 09/22/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 1, 2018 Filing 228 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Larry J. Bully served on 09/22/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 1, 2018 Filing 227 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Curtis Bully served on 09/22/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 1, 2018 Filing 226 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Carlin Pennon served on 09/23/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 1, 2018 Filing 225 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to The Executor, Executrix, and or Administrator of the Estate of Anna Mae Cato, Nee Pettus, Deceased, and All Heirs and, or Legatees, Devisees, Trustees, Creditors, and Assigns of Anna Mae Cato, Nee Pettus, Deceased served on 09/23/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 1, 2018 Filing 224 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Carlin Pennon served on 09/23/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 1, 2018 Filing 223 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to The Executor, Executrix and, or Administrator of the Estate of Anna Mae Cato, Nee Pettus, Deceased, and All Heirs and, or Legatees, Devisees, Trustees, Creditors, and Assigns of Anna Mae Cato, Nee Pettus, Deceased served on 09/23/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 1, 2018 Filing 222 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to The Executory, Executrix and, or Administrator of the Estate of Lawrence Pettus, Deceased, and all Heirs and, or Legatees, Devisees, Trustees, Creditors, and Assigns of Lawrence Pettus, Deceased served on 09/23/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 1, 2018 Filing 221 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Carlin Pennon served on 09/23/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 1, 2018 Filing 220 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Lule H. Pettus, A/K/A Lula H. Pettus, Whether Alive or Deceased, and, if Deceased, the Executor, Executrix, and, or Administrator of the Estate of Lule H. Pettus A/K/A Lula H. Pettus, Deceased, and All Heirs And, Or Legatees, Devisees, Trustees, Creditors, and Assigns of Lule H. Pettus, Deceased served on 09/23/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 1, 2018 Filing 219 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Carlin Pennon served on 09/23/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 1, 2018 Filing 218 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Nesbitt Pettus, Whether Alive or Deceased, and, If Deceased, The Executor, Executrix and, or Administrator of the Estate of Nesbitt Pettus, Deceased, and All Heirs And, Or Legatees, Devisees, Trustees, Creditors and Assigns of Nesbitt Pettus, Deceased, or Her Known or Unknown Heirs, Executors, Administrators, Legatees, Devisees, Trustees, Creditors, and Assigns served on 09/23/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 1, 2018 Filing 217 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Henryetta Woods, Nee Pettus, Whether Alive or Deceased, and, If Deceased, The Executor, Executrix, and or Administrator of the Estate of Henryetta Woods, Nee Pettus, Deceased, and all Heirs and, or Legatees, Devisees, Trustees, Creditors, and Assigns of Celester Jackson, Nee Pettus, Deceased served on 09/23/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 1, 2018 Filing 216 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Celester Jackson, Nee Pettus, Whether Alive or Deceased, and, If Deceased, The Executor, Executrix, and or Administrator of the Estate of Celester Jackson, Nee Pettus, Deceased, and all Heirs and, or Legatees, Devisees, Trustees, Creditors, and Assigns of Celester Jackson, Nee Pettus, Deceased served on 09/23/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 1, 2018 Filing 215 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Clevonna Jones served on 09/22/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 1, 2018 Filing 214 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to The James A. Clark Revocable Trust served on 09/23/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 1, 2018 Filing 213 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to The Cheri S. Clark Revocable Trust served on 09/23/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 1, 2018 Filing 212 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Wayne Caldwell and Donna Caldwell served on 09/22/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 1, 2018 Filing 211 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Wayne Caldwell and Donna Caldwell served on 09/22/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 1, 2018 Filing 210 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to James s. Ingram and Linda D. Ingram served on 09/22/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 1, 2018 Filing 209 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to James S. Ingram and Linda D. Ingram served on 09/22/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 1, 2018 Filing 208 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possessionq to Lydia L. Roper served on 09/22/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
October 1, 2018 Filing 207 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Lydia L. Roper served on 09/22/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 28, 2018 Filing 206 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to John Nelson served on 09/21/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 28, 2018 Filing 205 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Shamrock Bank served on 09/21/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 28, 2018 Filing 204 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Maher Farms LLC c/o Mary White served on 09/21/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 28, 2018 Filing 203 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Maher Farms LLC c/o Mary White served on 09/21/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 28, 2018 Filing 202 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Maher Farms LLC c/o Mary White served on 09/21/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 28, 2018 Filing 201 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Maher Farms LLC c/o Mary White served on 09/21/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 28, 2018 Filing 200 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Charles Johnson served on 09/22/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 28, 2018 Filing 199 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Southern Oklahoma Water Corporation C/O Roger Dethloff served on 09/21/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 28, 2018 Filing 198 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to First Bank and Trust Co. served on 09/21/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 28, 2018 Filing 197 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to BancFirst served on 09/21/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 28, 2018 Filing 196 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to BancFirst served on 09/21/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 28, 2018 Filing 195 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Riesen Properties LLC c/o Marian Coffey Riesen served on 09/21/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 28, 2018 Filing 194 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to W. Lee Coffey served on 09/21/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 28, 2018 Filing 193 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to W. Lee Coffey served on 09/21/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 28, 2018 Filing 192 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Lee Coffey served on 09/21/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 28, 2018 Filing 191 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to WLC Land and Mineral LLC c/o Lee Coffey served on 09/21/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 28, 2018 Filing 190 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Daube Arbuckle Ranch LLC served on 09/21/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 28, 2018 Filing 189 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Daube Arbuckle Ranch LLC served on 09/21/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 28, 2018 Filing 188 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Daube Arbuckle Ranch LLC served on 09/21/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 28, 2018 Filing 187 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Daube Arbuckle Ranch LLC served on 09/21/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 28, 2018 Filing 186 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Anna L. (Bully) Kennemer served on 09/22/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 28, 2018 Filing 185 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Daube Arbuckle Ranch LLC served on 09/21/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 28, 2018 Filing 184 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Daube Arbuckle Ranch LLC served on 09/21/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 28, 2018 Filing 183 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Daube Arbuckle Ranch LLC served on 09/21/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 28, 2018 Filing 182 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Daube Arbuckle Ranch LLC served on 09/21/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 28, 2018 Filing 181 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Daube Arbuckle Ranch LLC served on 09/21/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 28, 2018 Filing 180 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Rosie Petties, Whether Alive or Deceased, and If Deceased, The Executor, Executrix and, All Heirs and, or Legatees, Devisees, Trustees, Creditors and Assigns of Rosie Petties, Deceased and All Heirs and, or Legatees, Devisees, Trustees, Creditors and Assigns of Rosie Petties, Deceased, or Her Known or Unknown Heirs, Executors, Administrators, Legatees, Devisees, Trustees, Creditors, and Assigns served on 09/23/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 28, 2018 Filing 179 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Celano Jones served on 09/23/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 28, 2018 Filing 178 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Child Support Services served on 09/21/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 28, 2018 Filing 177 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to American Nation Bank served on 09/21/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 28, 2018 Filing 176 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Oklahoma AgCredit served on 09/21/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 28, 2018 Filing 175 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Farm Credit Services of East Central Oklahoma, FLCA served on 09/21/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 28, 2018 Filing 174 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Bryan County Treasurer served on 09/21/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 28, 2018 Filing 173 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Kasidy Niegal Lester served on 09/22/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 28, 2018 Filing 172 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Kasidy Niegal Lester served on 09/22/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 28, 2018 Filing 171 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Kasidy Niegal Lester served on 09/22/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 28, 2018 Filing 170 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Shamrock Bank served on 09/21/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 28, 2018 Filing 169 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Shamrock Bank served on 09/21/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 28, 2018 Filing 168 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Lee Chappa and Anna Kathryn Chappa served on 09/22/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 28, 2018 Filing 167 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Farm Credit Services of East Central Oklahoma served on 09/21/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 28, 2018 Filing 166 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Shamrock Bank served on 09/21/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 28, 2018 Filing 165 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Shamrock Bank served on 09/21/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 28, 2018 Filing 164 MOTION for Hearing (Re: #117 MOTION for Order Confirming Condemnation Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession of Easements Sought, and Expediting Briefing and Hearing Schedule) by All Plaintiffs Responses due by 10/12/2018(Seidl, Scott)
September 26, 2018 Filing 163 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Plains Pipeline, L.P c/o Corporation Services Company served on 09/21/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 25, 2018 Filing 162 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Central Land Consulting LLC c/o The Corporation Company served on 09/21/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 25, 2018 Filing 161 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Oklahoma Midstream Gas Services, LLC c/o The Corporation Company served on 09/21/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 25, 2018 Filing 160 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Lindmark Outdoor Advertising served on 09/21/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 25, 2018 Filing 159 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Lindmark Outdoor Advertising served on 09/21/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 25, 2018 Filing 158 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession` to Valero Partners Wynnewood LLC c/o Corporation Company served on 09/21/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 25, 2018 Filing 157 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Plains Pipeline, L.P c/o Corporation Services Company served on 09/21/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 25, 2018 Filing 156 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Valero Partners Wynnewood LLC c/o Corporation Company served on 09/21/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 25, 2018 Filing 155 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Central Land Consulting LLC c/o The Corporation Company served on 09/21/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 25, 2018 Filing 154 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Central Land Consulting LLC c/o The Corporation Company served on 09/21/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 25, 2018 Filing 153 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Central Land Consulting LLC c/o The Corporation Company served on 09/21/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 25, 2018 Filing 152 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Central Land Consulting LLC c/o The Corporation Company served on 09/21/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 25, 2018 Filing 151 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Central Land Consulting LLC c/o The Corporation Company served on 09/21/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 25, 2018 Filing 150 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Central Land Consulting LLC c/o The Corporation Company served on 09/21/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 25, 2018 Filing 149 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Central Land Consulting LLC c/o The Corporation Company served on 09/21/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 25, 2018 Filing 148 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Central Land Consulting LLC c/o The Corporation Company served on 09/21/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 25, 2018 Filing 147 AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service of Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action and Motion for Order Confirming Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession to Central Land Consulting LLC c/o The Corporation Company served on 09/21/18 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 20, 2018 Filing 146 NOTICE of Amendment to Certain Pages of Federal Rule 71.1 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action with respect to Tract CR-0484.010 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (With attachments)(Zabel, Thomas)
September 19, 2018 Filing 145 CERTIFICATE for Service by Publication - CR-0711.000 upon Unknown Owners by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 19, 2018 Filing 144 CERTIFICATE for Service by Publication - CR-0566.000 upon Unknown Owners by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 19, 2018 Filing 143 CERTIFICATE for Service by Publication - CR-0517.010 upon Unknown Owners by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 19, 2018 Filing 142 CERTIFICATE for Service by Publication - CR-0503.000 upon Unknown Owners by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 19, 2018 Filing 141 CERTIFICATE for Service by Publication - CR-0502.000 upon Unknown Owners by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 19, 2018 Filing 140 CERTIFICATE for Service by Publication - CR-0501.000 upon Unknown Owners by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 19, 2018 Filing 139 CERTIFICATE for Service by Publication - CR-0499.000 upon Unknown Owners by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 19, 2018 Filing 138 CERTIFICATE for Service by Publication - CR-0494.000 upon Unknown Owners by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 19, 2018 Filing 137 CERTIFICATE for Service by Publication - CR-0486.020 upon Unknown Owners by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 19, 2018 Filing 136 CERTIFICATE for Service by Publication - CR-0485.000 upon Unknown Owners by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 19, 2018 Filing 135 CERTIFICATE for Service by Publication - CR-0484.020 upon Unknown Owners by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 19, 2018 Filing 134 CERTIFICATE for Service by Publication - CR-0484.010 upon Unknown Owners by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 19, 2018 Filing 133 CERTIFICATE for Service by Publication - CR-0484.000 upon Unknown Owners by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 19, 2018 Filing 132 CERTIFICATE for Service by Publication - CR-0483.000 upon Unknown Owners by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 19, 2018 Filing 131 CERTIFICATE for Service by Publication - CR-0480.010 upon Unknown Owners by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 19, 2018 Filing 130 CERTIFICATE for Service by Publication - CR-0473.020 upon Unknown Owners by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 19, 2018 Filing 129 CERTIFICATE for Service by Publication - CR-0473.010 upon Unknown Owners by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 19, 2018 Filing 128 CERTIFICATE for Service by Publication - CR-0473.000 upon Unknown Owners by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 19, 2018 Filing 127 CERTIFICATE for Service by Publication - CR-0472.000 upon Unknown Owners by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 19, 2018 Filing 126 CERTIFICATE for Service by Publication - BR-1002.000 upon Unknown Owners by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 19, 2018 Filing 125 CERTIFICATE for Service by Publication - BR-1001.000 upon Unknown Owners by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 19, 2018 Filing 124 CERTIFICATE for Service by Publication - BR-0967.000 upon Unknown Owners by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason)
September 19, 2018 Filing 123 CERTIFICATE for Service by Publication - BR-0965.000 upon Unknown Owners by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Schwartz, Mason) Modified on 9/20/2018 to edit text (dma, Deputy Clerk).
September 17, 2018 Filing 122 NOTICE of Commencement CR-0484.010 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 14, 2018 Filing 121 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by David M. Box on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Box, David)
September 14, 2018 Filing 120 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Mason J. Schwartz on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Schwartz, Mason)
September 14, 2018 Filing 119 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Scott Seidl on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Seidl, Scott)
September 14, 2018 Filing 118 NOTICE OF AMENDMENT TO CERTAIN PAGES OF EXHIBIT A TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR CONDEMNATION WITH RESPECT TO TRACT CR-0484.020 by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (With attachments)(Zabel, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 117 MOTION for Order Confirming Condemnation Authority and Awarding Immediate Possession of Easements Sought, and Expediting Briefing and Hearing Schedule by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (With attachments) Responses due by 9/27/2018(Zabel, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 116 NOTICE of Commencement CR-486.020 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 115 NOTICE of Commencement CR-0709.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 114 NOTICE of Commencement CR-0701.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 113 NOTICE of Commencement CR-0693.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 112 NOTICE of Commencement CR-0636.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 111 NOTICE of Commencement CR-0632.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 110 NOTICE of Commencement CR-0700.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 109 NOTICE of Commencement CR-0634.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 108 NOTICE of Commencement CR-0628.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 107 NOTICE of Commencement CR-0651.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 106 NOTICE of Commencement CR-0701.010 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 105 NOTICE of Commencement CR-0629.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 104 NOTICE of Commencement CR-0627.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 103 NOTICE of Commencement CR-0626.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 102 NOTICE of Commencement CR-0484.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 101 NOTICE of Commencement CR-0713.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 100 NOTICE of Commencement CR-0703.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 99 NOTICE of Commencement CR-0711.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 98 NOTICE of Commencement CR-0710.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 97 NOTICE of Commencement CR-0712.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 96 NOTICE of Commencement CR-0472.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 95 NOTICE of Commencement CR-0473.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 94 NOTICE of Commencement CR-0473.010 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 93 NOTICE of Commencement CR-0473.020 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 92 NOTICE of Commencement CR-0484.010 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 91 NOTICE of Commencement CR-0482.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 90 NOTICE of Commencement CR-0483.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 89 NOTICE of Commencement CR-0485.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 88 NOTICE of Commencement CR-0497.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 87 NOTICE of Commencement CR-0502.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 86 NOTICE of Commencement CR-0501.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 85 NOTICE of Commencement CR-0500.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 84 NOTICE of Commencement CR-0499.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 83 NOTICE of Commencement CR-0514.010 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 82 NOTICE of Commencement CR-0517.010 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 81 NOTICE of Commencement CR-0566.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 80 NOTICE of Commencement CR-0565.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 79 NOTICE of Commencement CR-0564.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 78 NOTICE of Commencement CR-0563.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 77 NOTICE of Commencement CR-0561.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 76 NOTICE of Commencement CR-0518.010 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 75 NOTICE of Commencement CR-0568.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 74 NOTICE of Commencement CR-0602.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 73 NOTICE of Commencement CR-0597.010 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 72 NOTICE of Commencement CR-0597.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 71 NOTICE of Commencement CR-0573.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 70 NOTICE of Commencement CR-0572.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 69 NOTICE of Commencement CR-0571.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 68 NOTICE of Commencement CR-0578.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 67 NOTICE of Commencement CR-0570.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 66 NOTICE of Commencement CR-0569.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 65 NOTICE of Commencement CR-0567.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 64 NOTICE of Commencement CR-0616.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 63 NOTICE of Commencement CR-0484.020 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 62 NOTICE of Commencement CR-0623.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 61 NOTICE of Commencement CR-0624.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 60 NOTICE of Commencement CR-0620.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 59 NOTICE of Commencement CR-0622.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 58 NOTICE of Commencement CR-0622.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 57 NOTICE of Commencement CR-0618.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 56 NOTICE of Commencement CR-0612.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 55 NOTICE of Commencement CR-0503.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 54 NOTICE of Commencement CR-0494.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 53 NOTICE of Commencement CR-0480.010 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 12, 2018 Filing 52 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation JO-0822.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 12, 2018 Filing 51 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation JO-0819.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 12, 2018 Filing 50 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation JO-0758.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 12, 2018 Filing 49 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation JO-0754.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 12, 2018 Filing 48 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation JO-0753.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 12, 2018 Filing 47 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation JO-0740.000JO-0739.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 12, 2018 Filing 46 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation JO-0739.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 12, 2018 Filing 45 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation BR-1011.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 12, 2018 Filing 44 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation BR-1002.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 12, 2018 Filing 43 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation BR-1001.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 12, 2018 Filing 42 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation BR-1000.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 12, 2018 Filing 41 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation BR-0996.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 12, 2018 Filing 40 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation BR-0994.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 12, 2018 Filing 39 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation BR-0994.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 12, 2018 Filing 38 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation BR-0993.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 12, 2018 Filing 37 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation BR-0991.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 12, 2018 Filing 36 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation BR-0990.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 12, 2018 Filing 35 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation BR-0988.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 12, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation BR-0967.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 12, 2018 Filing 33 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation BR-0965.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 12, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation BR-0945.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 12, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation BR-0943.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 12, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation BR-0942.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 12, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation BR-0941.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 12, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation BR-0940.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 12, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation BR-0934.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 12, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation BR-0926.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 12, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation BR-0925.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 12, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation BR-0921.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 12, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation BR-0920.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 12, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation BR-0918.00 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 12, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation BR-0909.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 12, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation BR-0907.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 12, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation BR-0905.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 12, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation BR-0904.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 12, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation BR-0903.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 12, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation BR-0901.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 12, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation BR-0898.000 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 12, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation BR-0894.000 (Re: #2 Complaint) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas) Modified on 9/12/2018 to edit link (dma, Deputy Clerk).
September 12, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation BR-0893.000 (Re: #2 Complaint) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas) Modified on 9/12/2018 to edit link (dma, Deputy Clerk).
September 12, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation BR-0890.000 (Re: #2 Complaint) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas) Modified on 9/12/2018 to edit link (dma, Deputy Clerk).
September 12, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation BR-0888.000 (Re: #2 Complaint) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas) Modified on 9/12/2018 to edit link (dma, Deputy Clerk).
September 12, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation BR-0887.000 (Re: #2 Complaint) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas) Modified on 9/12/2018 to edit link (dma, Deputy Clerk).
September 12, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation BR-0866.000 (Re: #2 Complaint) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas) Modified on 9/12/2018 to edit link (dma, Deputy Clerk).
September 12, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation BR-0860.000 (Re: #2 Complaint) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas) Modified on 9/12/2018 to edit link (dma, Deputy Clerk).
September 12, 2018 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Midship Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Cheniere Energy, Inc., Corporate Parent EIG Management Company, LLC for Midship Pipeline Company, LLC) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 12, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF AMENDMENT TO CERTAIN PAGES OF EXHIBIT A TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR CONDEMNATION WITH RESPECT TO TRACT BR-0941.000 (Re: #2 Complaint) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (With attachments)(Zabel, Thomas)
September 11, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF AMENDMENT TO CERTAIN PAGES OF EXHIBIT A TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR CONDEMNATION WITH RESPECT TO TRACT JO-0754.000 (Re: #2 Complaint) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (With attachments)(Zabel, Thomas)
September 11, 2018 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 9/11/2018 in the amount of $400, receipt number 1086-1205677 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (Zabel, Thomas)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White directing plaintiff file a corporate disclosure statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure within 5 days.(lal, Deputy Clerk)
September 11, 2018 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov (Filing Fee due by 9/18/2018) (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
September 4, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (With attachments) (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
September 4, 2018 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Midship Pipeline Company, LLC (pjw, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Midship Pipeline Company, LLC v. 2.331, 2.435, 0.458 acres, Bryan County, Oklahoma et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1.545, 1.447, 0.154, Bryan County, Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anna Kathryn Chappa
Represented By: John M. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Morris
Represented By: John M. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Leslie Prentice
Represented By: Logan Beadles
Represented By: Richard K. Holmes
Represented By: Jacob R. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Wendall Wayne Murphree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.445, 0.481, 0.581 acres, Bryan County, Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LC-MAC LLC
Represented By: Logan Beadles
Represented By: Richard K. Holmes
Represented By: Jacob R. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.854, 0.846, 0.423 acres, Bryan County, Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.076, 0.015 acres, Bryan County, Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2.172, 2.168, 0.317, 0.494, Bryan County, Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kasidy Niegal Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kalan Craig Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LC-MAC, LLC
Represented By: Logan Beadles
Represented By: Richard K. Holmes
Represented By: Jacob R. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3.749, 3.873, 0.573 acres, Bryan County, Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan Pearl Murphree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.705, 0.794, 0.092 acres, Bryan County, Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James S. Ingram
Represented By: John M. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1.739, 1.738 acres, Bryan County, Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3.319, 3.161, 0.941 acres, Bryan County, Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monte Dean Drennan
Represented By: Roger L. Ediger
Represented By: George S. Padgitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.055, 0.021 acres, Bryan County, Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucas Don Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Caldwell
Represented By: John M. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farm Credit Services of East Central Oklahoma, FLCA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1.258, 1.164 acres, Bryan County, Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter L. Prentice
Represented By: Logan Beadles
Represented By: Richard K. Holmes
Represented By: Jacob R. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.573, 0.654, 0.193 acres, Bryan County, Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie D. Haynie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billy Miller
Represented By: John M. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don M. Haggerty
Represented By: John M. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Land Consulting LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hazel C. Haggerty
Represented By: John M. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3.394, 3.390, 0.234, 0.138 acres, Bryan County, Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3.141, 3.144, 0.791 acres, Bryan County, Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Caldwell
Represented By: John M. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2.068, 2.153, 1.012 acres, Bryan County, Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan County Treasurer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2.062, 2.062, 0.230 acres, Bryan County, Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1.595, 1.476 acres, Bryan County, Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna C. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Heirs of Billy Don Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.558, 0.569, 0.350 acres, Bryan County, Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lydia L. Roper
Represented By: John M. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2.580, 2.572, 0.874 acres, Bryan County, Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1.623, 1.601, 0.230 acres, Bryan County, Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Torrey McGraw Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2.186, 2.149, 0.493 acres, Bryan County, Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhonda Marie Drennan
Represented By: Roger L. Ediger
Represented By: George S. Padgitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1.654, 1.586, 0.711 acres, Bryan County, Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma AgCredit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simon Creek, Inc.
Represented By: John M. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1.982, 2.024, 0.451 acres, Bryan County, Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Nation Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delane Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanner Blane Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4.852, 4.736, 0.762 acres, Bryan County, Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Misty Hall Murphree
Represented By: John M. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2.331, 2.435, 0.458 acres, Bryan County, Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farm Credit Services of East Central Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michi Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 6.587, 6.590, 0.093 acres, Bryan County, Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shamrock Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Andrew Morris
Represented By: John M. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Executor of Billy Don Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.005, 0.226 acres, Bryan County, Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Chappa
Represented By: John M. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.047, 0.047 acres, Bryan County, Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda D. Ingram
Represented By: John M. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Leslie Prentice
Represented By: Logan Beadles
Represented By: Richard K. Holmes
Represented By: Jacob R. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marla Hall Richardson
Represented By: John M. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farm Services Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John W. Haynie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2.800, 2.856, 1.011 acres, Bryan County, Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.754, 0.850, 0.230 acres, Bryan County, Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.C. Staggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1.993, 1.996, 0.657 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1.518, 1.317, 0.581 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernice Curlie Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andre Brumfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WLC Land and Mineral, LLC
Represented By: John M. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.325, 0.190 acres, Bryan County, Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anna L. Kennemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.811, 0.527, 0.530 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.154, 0.146, 0.198 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.405, 0.407, 0.128, 0.122 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legend Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Severn Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elaine Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isaac Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doretha J. Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Bank and Trust Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Billy Don Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ella Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 8.197, 8.278, 1.614, 1.414 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.146, 0.357, 0.169 acres, Bryan County, Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Cecil Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ila Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura A. Belt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LaDonna Inman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Scott Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3.249, 3.216, 0.314 acres, Bryan County, Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobbie Jo Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homer Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela A. Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3.453, 3.561, 1.643 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenitra Rose Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Myrna R. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.788 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanya McCloud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4.670, 3.526, 0.459 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of W.D. Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BancFirst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billy Gene Risner
Represented By: John M. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.019, 0.314, 0.229 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.599, 0.100, 0.288 acres, Johnston County, Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.389 acres, Johnston County, Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1.136, 1.335, 0.337, 0.159 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNK Petroleum (US) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lou Cronin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nolen G. Grounds
Represented By: John M. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lauren B. Roesner
Represented By: John M. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3.144, 3.144, 0.668 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Pirtle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1.415, 1.203, 0.322 acres, Bryan County, Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inez Akers Trust dated January 17, 1994, The
Represented By: John M. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2.109, 2.117, 0.716 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lydra Lofton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin James Risner
Represented By: John M. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon K. Zondor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bessie Harris
Represented By: John M. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary A. Bully
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frances Gayle Pletcher
Represented By: Roger L. Ediger
Represented By: George S. Padgitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugene Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charleen Hunter
Represented By: John M. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.295, 0.227 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L.V. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1.531, 1.399, 0.459 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosie Breath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara J. Smith
Represented By: John M. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Fred O. Lofton, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Osborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mamie Bess Lawrence Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Land Consulting, LLC
Represented By: John M. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3 - J Farms, LC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evan Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Verlee Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James A. Clark Revocable Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.124 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown heirs of Buel Pettus, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilma J. Peavy Lofton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahomaranch.com LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.T. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Anthony Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Alberta Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise K. Davis
Represented By: John M. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.604, 0.678 acres, Carter County, Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing |