Hunt v. Latimer Nursing Home

Plaintiff: April Hunt
Defendant: Latimer Nursing Home
Case Number: 6:2018cv00348
Filed: October 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Ronald A White
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk : Defendant's Application for Automatic Extension of Time to Answer or Plead filed 12/20/2018 ( #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer) is GRANTED. Accordingly, defendant Latimer Nursing Home has until 1/3/2019 within which to file its answer or otherwise plead. (lal, Deputy Clerk)
December 20, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Latimer Nursing Home Responses due by 1/3/2019(McKelvey, Sean)
December 20, 2018 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Meaghen E. Clark on behalf of Latimer Nursing Home (Clark, Meaghen)
December 20, 2018 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Sean M. McKelvey on behalf of Latimer Nursing Home (McKelvey, Sean)
December 12, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Latimer Nursing Home - Served on 11/30/2018. by April Hunt (With attachments)(Bailey, Jessica)
October 24, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Latimer Nursing Home (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
October 24, 2018 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 10/24/2018 in the amount of $400, receipt number 1086-1216945 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by April Hunt (Bailey, Jessica)
October 24, 2018 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov (Filing Fee due by 10/31/2018) (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
October 24, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Latimer Nursing Home by April Hunt (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/24/2018: #1 Exhibit A - Dismissal and Notice of Rights) (pjw, Deputy Clerk).
October 24, 2018 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by April Hunt (pjw, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunt v. Latimer Nursing Home
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Hunt
Represented By: Jessica N. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Latimer Nursing Home
Represented By: Meaghen E. Clark
Represented By: Sean M. McKelvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?