Hill v. Okmulgee County Criminal Justice Authority et al
Plaintiff: Amy Hill
Defendant: Okmulgee County Board of County Commissioners, Galian Murphy, Sam McCoy, Ronald Spears, Okmulgee County Criminal Justice Authority, Austin Gunter and Cody Francis
Case Number: 6:2018cv00394
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Steven P Shreder
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder GRANTING #38 Motion to Withdraw Attorney(s). Accordingly, attorney Robert S. Lafferrandre, Randall J. Wood, and Jessica L. Dark are deemed withdrawn as counsel of record for Defendant Austin Gunter. (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
January 21, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney(s) by Austin Gunter Responses due by 2/4/2019(Dark, Jessica)
January 21, 2019 Filing 37 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by James L. Gibbs, II on behalf of Austin Gunter (Gibbs, James)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder granting #35 Unopposed Motion for Protective Order. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
January 18, 2019 Filing 35 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order by Sam McCoy, Galian Murphy, Okmulgee County Board of County Commissioners, Okmulgee County Criminal Justice Authority, Ronald Spears Responses due by 2/1/2019(Gooch, Ambre)
January 11, 2019 Filing 34 DISCLOSURES per FRCP 26 by Amy Hill (Miles, George)
January 11, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Subpoena by Cody Francis, Austin Gunter (With attachments)(Dark, Jessica)
January 11, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Subpoena by Cody Francis, Austin Gunter (With attachments)(Dark, Jessica)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder: Settlement Conference set for 12/2/2019 at 9:30 AM in Chambers, Room 430, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West. (Settlement Conference Statements are due 11/18/2019)(sjr, Chambers)
January 10, 2019 Filing 30 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #12 Partial MOTION to Dismiss ) by Sam McCoy, Galian Murphy, Okmulgee County Criminal Justice Authority, Ronald Spears ;(Whitson, Jamison)
January 10, 2019 Filing 29 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss ) by Okmulgee County Board of County Commissioners ;(Whitson, Jamison)
January 9, 2019 Filing 28 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #12 Partial MOTION to Dismiss ) by Amy Hill ;(Miles, George)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder setting scheduling order dates: Amended Pleadings due by 4/26/2019; Joinder of Parties due by 4/26/2019; Exhibit List due by 10/25/2019; Witness List due by 10/25/2019; Discovery due by 11/25/2019; Dispositive Motions due by 12/9/2019; Jury Instructions, Voir Dire & Trial Briefs due by 1/3/2020; Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/3/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 1/10/2020 at 10:00 a.m. in Chambers, Room 425, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder. Jury Trial set for 1/22/2020 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 3, Room 432, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder. The Scheduling Conference set for 1/11/2019 at 10:15 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder is hereby STRICKEN. (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
January 8, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE by Court Clerk of Consent by the Parties to Proceed Before the United States Magistrate. In accordance with 28 U.S.C., Section 636(c), the Magistrate Judge will exercise complete jurisdiction over all matters in this case including trial. (With attachments)(ndd, Deputy Clerk)
January 7, 2019 Filing 25 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Amy Hill (Miles, George)
January 4, 2019 Filing 24 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jamison C. Whitson on behalf of Sam McCoy, Galian Murphy, Okmulgee County Board of County Commissioners, Okmulgee County Criminal Justice Authority, Ronald Spears (Whitson, Jamison)
January 4, 2019 Filing 23 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Taylor M. Tyler on behalf of Sam McCoy, Galian Murphy, Okmulgee County Board of County Commissioners, Okmulgee County Criminal Justice Authority, Ronald Spears (Tyler, Taylor)
January 2, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss ) by Amy Hill ;(Miles, George)
December 28, 2018 Filing 21 Partial MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim by Cody Francis, Austin Gunter Responses due by 1/11/2019(Dark, Jessica)
December 28, 2018 Filing 20 Partial ANSWER to Petition/Complaint filed in State Court (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint) by Austin Gunter (Dark, Jessica)
December 28, 2018 Filing 19 Partial ANSWER to Petition/Complaint filed in State Court (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint) by Cody Francis (Dark, Jessica)
December 28, 2018 Filing 18 DISCLOSURES per FRCP 26 by Cody Francis, Austin Gunter (Dark, Jessica)
December 28, 2018 Filing 17 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by George M. Miles on behalf of Amy Hill (Miles, George)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder setting Scheduling Conference for 1/11/2019 at 10:15 a.m. in Chambers, Room 425, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder. Parties directed to file Joint Status Report by 1/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent or Reassignment Form) (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
December 26, 2018 Filing 15 DISCLOSURES per FRCP 26 by Sam McCoy, Galian Murphy, Okmulgee County Board of County Commissioners, Okmulgee County Criminal Justice Authority, Ronald Spears (Gooch, Ambre)
December 26, 2018 Filing 14 Partial ANSWER with Jury Demand to Complaint (Re: Complaint) by Okmulgee County Criminal Justice Authority (Gooch, Ambre)
December 26, 2018 Filing 13 Partial ANSWER with Jury Demand to Complaint (Re: Complaint) by Sam McCoy, Galian Murphy, Ronald Spears (Gooch, Ambre)
December 26, 2018 Filing 12 Partial MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Sam McCoy, Galian Murphy, Okmulgee County Criminal Justice Authority, Ronald Spears (With attachments) Responses due by 1/9/2019(Gooch, Ambre)
December 20, 2018 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk granting Defendants' First Motion for Extension of Time in Which to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint/Petition (Re: #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Accordingly, per LCvR 7.1 (h), defendant Cody Francis has until 1/4/2019 to file his answer or otherwise plead. Defendant Austin Gunter has until 1/9/2019 to file his answer or otherwise plead. (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
December 18, 2018 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Randall J. Wood on behalf of Cody Francis, Austin Gunter (Wood, Randall)
December 18, 2018 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Robert S. Lafferrandre on behalf of Cody Francis, Austin Gunter (Lafferrandre, Robert)
December 18, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Okmulgee County Board of County Commissioners (With attachments) Responses due by 1/2/2019(Gooch, Ambre)
December 18, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Cody Francis, Austin Gunter Responses due by 1/2/2019(Dark, Jessica)
December 18, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Consent to Removal (Re: #2 Notice of Removal) by Cody Francis, Austin Gunter (Dark, Jessica)
December 18, 2018 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jessica L. Dark on behalf of Cody Francis, Austin Gunter (Dark, Jessica)
December 17, 2018 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ambre C. Gooch on behalf of Sam McCoy, Galian Murphy, Okmulgee County Board of County Commissioners, Okmulgee County Criminal Justice Authority, Ronald Spears (Gooch, Ambre)
December 17, 2018 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 12/17/2018 in the amount of $400, receipt number 1086-1229445 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal, ) by Sam McCoy, Galian Murphy, Okmulgee County Board of County Commissioners, Okmulgee County Criminal Justice Authority, Ronald Spears (Gooch, Ambre)
December 17, 2018 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk. Defendants are directed to pay the $400 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. Consent forms provided to filing party (Filing Fee due by 12/26/2018) (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
December 17, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Okmulgee County District Court, case number 18-CJ-219 by Sam McCoy, Galian Murphy, Okmulgee County Board of County Commissioners, Okmulgee County Criminal Justice Authority, Ronald Spears (With attachments) (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Sam McCoy, Galian Murphy, Okmulgee County Board of County Commissioners, Okmulgee County Criminal Justice Authority, Ronald Spears (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
November 19, 2018 PETITION with Jury Demand filed in State Court against Cody Francis, Austin Gunter, Sam McCoy, Galian Murphy, Okmulgee County Board of County Commissioners, Okmulgee County Criminal Justice Authority, Ronald Spears by Amy Hill (pjw, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. Okmulgee County Criminal Justice Authority et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Okmulgee County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: Ambre C. Gooch
Represented By: Taylor M. Tyler
Represented By: Jamison C. Whitson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Galian Murphy
Represented By: Ambre C. Gooch
Represented By: Taylor M. Tyler
Represented By: Jamison C. Whitson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam McCoy
Represented By: Ambre C. Gooch
Represented By: Taylor M. Tyler
Represented By: Jamison C. Whitson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Spears
Represented By: Ambre C. Gooch
Represented By: Taylor M. Tyler
Represented By: Jamison C. Whitson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Okmulgee County Criminal Justice Authority
Represented By: Ambre C. Gooch
Represented By: Taylor M. Tyler
Represented By: Jamison C. Whitson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin Gunter
Represented By: Randall J. Wood
Represented By: James L. Gibbs, II
Represented By: Robert S. Lafferrandre
Represented By: Jessica L. Dark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cody Francis
Represented By: Randall J. Wood
Represented By: Robert S. Lafferrandre
Represented By: Jessica L. Dark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Hill
Represented By: James E. Frasier
Represented By: George M. Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?