McJunkin et al v. Girdner et al
Plaintiff: Cami McJunkin and Molly McJunkin
Defendant: Adair County Board of County Commissioners, David Hardin, Jason Ritchie, Bob Girdner and Robert Hardwick
Case Number: 6:2019cv00018
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Ronald A White
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Charles C. Vaught on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Vaught, Charles)
January 18, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Adair County Board of County Commissioners (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
January 18, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Jason Ritchie (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
January 18, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to David Hardin (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
January 18, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Robert Hardwick (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Bob Girdner (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Molly McJunkin, Cami McJunkin (Bailey, Jessica)
January 18, 2019 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 1/18/2019 in the amount of $400, receipt number 1086-1236452 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Cami McJunkin, Molly McJunkin (Bailey, Jessica)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov (Filing Fee due by 1/24/2019) (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Adair County Board of County Commissioners, Bob Girdner, David Hardin, Robert Hardwick, Jason Ritchie by Molly McJunkin, Cami McJunkin (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Cami McJunkin, Molly McJunkin (pjw, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McJunkin et al v. Girdner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adair County Board of County Commissioners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Hardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Ritchie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Girdner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Hardwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cami McJunkin
Represented By: Jessica N. Bailey
Represented By: Charles C. Vaught
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Molly McJunkin
Represented By: Jessica N. Bailey
Represented By: Charles C. Vaught
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?