Whitley v. Oklahoma Department of Human Services, Child Support Services et al
Plaintiff: Lee Michael Whitley
Defendant: Monica Danielle Morris and Oklahoma Department of Human Services, Child Support Services
Case Number: 6:2019cv00021
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Ronald A White
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White directing plaintiff supplement his "Motion for Request for Medical Extension" filed 3/13/2019 (Re: #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion ) no later than 3/20/2019(lal, Deputy Clerk)
March 13, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (entitled "Motion for Request of Medical Extension") (Re: #12 MOTION to Dismiss) by Lee Michael Whitley; Responses due by 3/27/2019 (cjt, Deputy Clerk)
March 6, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Oklahoma Department of Human Services, Child Support Services Responses due by 3/20/2019(Langford, John)
March 6, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John K.F. Langford on behalf of Oklahoma Department of Human Services, Child Support Services (Langford, John)
March 6, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Emily B. Fagan on behalf of Oklahoma Department of Human Services, Child Support Services (Fagan, Emily)
March 5, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Oklahoma Department of Human Services, Child Support Services - Served via certified mail by USMS on 2/13/2019. (lal, Deputy Clerk)
March 4, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Monica Danielle Morris - Served via certified mail by USMS on 2/20/2019. (lal, Deputy Clerk)
March 1, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint (Re: #2 Complaint) by Monica Danielle Morris (With attachments) (cjt, Deputy Clerk)
February 4, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Monica Danielle Morris (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
February 4, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Oklahoma Department of Human Services, Child Support Services (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
January 31, 2019 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 1/31/2019 in the amount of $400, receipt number 16310 (Re: #2 Complaint) by Lee Michael Whitley (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White: denying #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; Filing Fee due by 2/21/2019 (cjt, Deputy Clerk)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Lee Michael Whitley. Responses due by 2/1/2019 (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Monica Danielle Morris, Oklahoma Department of Human Services, Child Support Services by Lee Michael Whitley (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Lee Michael Whitley (pjw, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitley v. Oklahoma Department of Human Services, Child Support Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monica Danielle Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma Department of Human Services, Child Support Services
Represented By: Emily B. Fagan
Represented By: John K.F. Langford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Michael Whitley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?