Latimore v. PepsiCo, Inc.

Plaintiff: Rodrick Latimore
Defendant: PepsiCo, Inc. and Bottling Group, LLC
Case Number: 6:2019cv00039
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Steven P Shreder
Referring Judge: Ronald A White
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Filing 28 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Rodrick Latimore (Addison, D.)
March 5, 2019 Filing 27 DISCLOSURES per FRCP 26 by Rodrick Latimore (Addison, D.)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 CONSENT to Magistrate Judge for Disposition of Case with ORDER of Reference thereon by Judge Ronald A. White reassigning case to Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-19-39-SPS (lal, Deputy Clerk)
March 4, 2019 Filing 25 First AMENDED ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: #21 Amended Complaint ) by PepsiCo, Inc. (Cowley, Raymond)
March 4, 2019 Filing 24 ANSWER with Jury Demand to Amended Complaint (Re: #21 Amended Complaint) by Bottling Group, LLC [NOTE: Attorney Raymond A. Cowley added to party Bottling Group, LLC(pty:dft)]. (Cowley, Raymond)
February 28, 2019 Filing 23 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Bottling Group, LLC (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
February 28, 2019 Filing 22 DISCLOSURES per FRCP 26 by PepsiCo, Inc. (Cowley, Raymond)
February 28, 2019 Filing 21 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Rodrick Latimore (Addison, D.)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White granting #19 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint. Plaintiff is directed to file the amended complaint within seven (7) days. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
February 26, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Amend Complaint by Rodrick Latimore (With attachments) Responses due by 3/12/2019(Addison, D.)
February 11, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER with Jury Demand to Petition/Complaint filed in State Court (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by PepsiCo, Inc. (Snyder, Mary)
February 7, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal (Re: #2 Notice of Removal) by PepsiCo, Inc. (With attachments)(Snyder, Mary)
February 7, 2019 Filing 16 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Raymond A. Cowley on behalf of PepsiCo, Inc. (Cowley, Raymond)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White granting #12 Motion to Strike Documents Filed in Error (Re: #10 #11 Attorney Appearance) (dma, Deputy Clerk)
February 6, 2019 Filing 14 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Leah M. Roper on behalf of Rodrick Latimore (Roper, Leah)
February 6, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by D. Colby Addison on behalf of Rodrick Latimore (Addison, D.)
February 6, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Strike Documents Filed in Error (Re: #11 Attorney Appearance, #10 Attorney Appearance) by Rodrick Latimore; Responses due by 2/20/2019(Roper, Leah)
February 6, 2019 Filing 11 *** STRICKEN per Minute Order 15 *** ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Leah M. Roper on behalf of Rodrick Latimore (Roper, Leah) Modified on 2/7/2019 to reflect stricken (dma, Deputy Clerk).
February 6, 2019 Filing 10 *** STRICKEN per Minute Order 15 *** ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Leah M. Roper on behalf of Rodrick Latimore (Roper, Leah) Modified on 2/7/2019 to reflect stricken (dma, Deputy Clerk).
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorney Raymond A. Cowley for PepsiCo, Inc., provided that local counsel is present at all proceedings, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This is conditioned on the filing of an entry of appearance and registration for electronic case filing by the applicant within seven (7) days from entry of this Order. See LCvR 83.4 and CM/ECF Administrative Guide of Policies and Procedures (dma, Deputy Clerk)
February 5, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Attorney Raymond A. Cowley to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 filing fee; receipt number 1086-1240351) by PepsiCo, Inc. (With attachments) Responses due by 2/19/2019(Snyder, Mary)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White directing the parties exchange and file their disclosures and joint status report no later than 3/5/2019 (lal, Deputy Clerk)
February 1, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by PepsiCo, Inc. (Snyder, Mary) Modified on 2/4/2019: removed Corporate Parent (nm, Deputy Clerk).
February 1, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Mary P. Snyder on behalf of PepsiCo, Inc. (Snyder, Mary)
February 1, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Randall J. Snapp on behalf of PepsiCo, Inc. (Snapp, Randall)
February 1, 2019 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 2/1/2019 in the amount of $400, receipt number 1086-1239688 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by PepsiCo, Inc. (Snyder, Mary)
February 1, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk. Defendant is directed to pay the $400 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling (Filing Fee due by 2/8/2019) (pjw, Deputy Clerk).
February 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Choctaw County District Court, case number 19-CJ-02 by PepsiCo, Inc. (With attachments) (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by PepsiCo, Inc. (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
January 18, 2019 PETITION filed in State Court against PepsiCo, Inc. by Rodrick Latimore (pjw, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Latimore v. PepsiCo, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodrick Latimore
Represented By: Leah M. Roper
Represented By: D. Colby Addison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PepsiCo, Inc.
Represented By: Mary P. Snyder
Represented By: Randall J. Snapp
Represented By: Raymond A. Cowley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bottling Group, LLC
Represented By: Randall J. Snapp
Represented By: Raymond A. Cowley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?