Curell v. Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association, The
Plaintiff: Tonya L. Curell
Defendant: House Real Estate of Oklahoma, LLC, Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association, The, Victoria Crowl and Jerry Crowl
Petitioner: House Real Estate of Oklahoma, L.L.C.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00045
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: James H Payne
Referring Judge: Kimberly E West
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Filing 45 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #43 MOTION to Compel ) by Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association, The ;(Ellis, Harvey)
March 28, 2019 Filing 44 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #43 MOTION to Compel ) by Tonya L. Curell ;(Weddle, Charles)
March 14, 2019 Filing 43 MOTION to Compel the Production of Documents and Answers to Interrogatories by Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association, The (With attachments) Responses due by 3/28/2019(Ellis, Harvey)
March 14, 2019 Filing 42 SURREPLY to Motion (Re: #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court ) by Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association, The ; (With attachments)(Ellis, Harvey)
March 14, 2019 Filing 41 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by D. Kent Meyers on behalf of Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association, The (Meyers, D.)
March 13, 2019 Filing 40 RESPONSE to Motion (Re: #27 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas Served by BONY upon House Real Estate of Oklahoma, L.L.C., Jerry Crowl, and Victoria Crowl MOTION for Protective Order ) by Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association, The ; (With attachments)(Ellis, Harvey)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by District Judge James H. Payne: granting #37 Motion for Leave to File Surreply (Re: #12 MOTION to Remand) (cjt, Deputy Clerk)
March 7, 2019 Filing 38 RESPONSE to Motion (Re: #31 Opposed MOTION to submit in camera settlement agreement for review ) by Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association, The ;(Ellis, Harvey)
March 6, 2019 Filing 37 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Surreply in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association, The Responses due by 3/20/2019(Ellis, Harvey)
March 5, 2019 Filing 36 RESPONSE in Support of Motion (Re: #31 Opposed MOTION to submit in camera settlement agreement for review ) by Tonya L. Curell ;(Weddle, Charles) (Main Document 36 was incomplete and replaced on 3/5/2019) (cjt, Deputy Clerk).
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND PROTECTIVE ORDER by District Judge James H. Payne: granting #34 Joint Motion for Protective Order (cjt, Deputy Clerk)
March 1, 2019 Filing 34 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Tonya L. Curell (With attachments) Responses due by 3/15/2019(Weddle, Charles)
March 1, 2019 Filing 33 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court ) by Tonya L. Curell ; (With attachments)(Weddle, Charles)
February 28, 2019 Filing 32 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Robert T. Mowrey by Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association, The (Mowrey, Robert) Modified on 3/1/2019 to edit text (dma, Deputy Clerk).
February 28, 2019 Filing 31 Opposed MOTION to submit in camera settlement agreement for review by Jerry Crowl, Victoria Crowl, House Real Estate of Oklahoma, L.L.C. Responses due by 3/14/2019(Colvin, Patrick)
February 28, 2019 Filing 30 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Cynthia K. Timms on behalf of Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association, The (Timms, Cynthia)
February 27, 2019 Filing 29 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by James E. Weger on behalf of Jerry Crowl, Victoria Crowl, House Real Estate of Oklahoma, L.L.C. (Weger, James)
February 27, 2019 Filing 28 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Patrick G. Colvin on behalf of Jerry Crowl, Victoria Crowl, House Real Estate of Oklahoma, L.L.C. (Colvin, Patrick)
February 27, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas Served by BONY upon House Real Estate of Oklahoma, L.L.C., Jerry Crowl, and Victoria Crowl and MOTION for Protective Order by House Real Estate of Oklahoma, L.L.C., Jerry Crowl, Victoria Crowl (With attachments) [NOTE: Attorney Patrick G. Colvin added to parties House Real Estate of Oklahoma, L.L.C. (pty:mov), Jerry Crowl (pty:mov) and Victoria Crowl (pty:mov)]. Responses due by 3/13/2019(Colvin, Patrick) Modified on 3/1/2019 to edit text (dma, Deputy Clerk).
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge James H. Payne: finding as moot #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #12 MOTION to Remand) (cjt, Deputy Clerk)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by District Judge James H. Payne: granting #18 Defendant's Motion to Expedite Discovery Responses (cjt, Deputy Clerk)
February 22, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE to Motion (Re: #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court ) by Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association, The ; (With attachments)(Ellis, Harvey)
February 21, 2019 Filing 23 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Marc D. Cabrera on behalf of Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association, The (Cabrera, Marc)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge James H. Payne: denying as moot #13 Motion for Expedited Briefing (Re: #12 MOTION to Remand) (cjt, Deputy Clerk)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge James H. Payne: granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Robert T. Mowrey, Cynthia K. Timms and Marc D. Cabrera, provided that local counsel is present at all proceedings, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This is conditioned on the filing of an entry of appearance and registration for electronic case filing by the applicants within seven (7) days from entry of this Order. See LCvR 83.4 and CM/ECF Administrative Guide of Policies and Procedures. (cjt, Deputy Clerk)
February 20, 2019 Filing 20 JURY DEMAND by Tonya L. Curell (Weddle, Charles)
February 19, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #12 MOTION to Remand) and Brief in Support by Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association, The (With attachments) Responses due by 3/5/2019(Ellis, Harvey) Modified on 2/21/2019 to edit event and text and add link (dma, Deputy Clerk).
February 19, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Expedite Discovery Responses and Brief in Support by Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association, The (With attachments) Responses due by 3/5/2019(Ellis, Harvey) Modified on 2/21/2019 to edit event (dma, Deputy Clerk).
February 12, 2019 Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Pursuant to the recusal of Judge Ronald A. White and at the direction of the Court, this case is reassigned to Judge James H. Payne. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-19-45-JHP. (cjt, Deputy Clerk)
February 11, 2019 Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk - Pursuant to receipt of an election of the District Judge Option and in accordance with LCvR 40.1(c), this case is reassigned to Judge Ronald A. White. Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West no longer assigned to case. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV 19-45-RAW. (adw, Deputy Clerk)
February 11, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #13 MOTION to Expedite Ruling ) by Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association, The ; (With attachments)(Ellis, Harvey)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West - Defendant shall submit a completed Notice of Assignment to a United States Magistrate Judge With Consent to Proceed or District Judge Option form by 12:00 NOON TODAY. If you have not received a copy of the Notice from the Clerk, a copy may be obtained on this District's website at www.oked.uscourts.gov under the tab for Forms and is titled Consent or District Judge Option Form. (adw, Deputy Clerk)
February 8, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Expedite Ruling (Re: #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court ) by Tonya L. Curell (With attachments) Responses due by 2/22/2019(Weddle, Charles)
February 8, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Tonya L. Curell Responses due by 2/22/2019(Weddle, Charles)
February 8, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Charles C. Weddle, III on behalf of Tonya L. Curell (Weddle, Charles)
February 8, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Joe E. White, Jr on behalf of Tonya L. Curell (White, Joe)
February 8, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Attorney Robert T. Mowrey, Cynthia K. Timms and Marc D. Cabrera to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 filing fee; receipt number 1086-1241753) by Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association, The (With attachments) Responses due by 2/22/2019(Ellis, Harvey)
February 8, 2019 Filing 8 EXHIBITS 39 through 96 in Support of #2 Notice of Removal by Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association, The (With attachments)(Ellis, Harvey)
February 8, 2019 Filing 7 EXHIBITS 34 through 38 in Support of #2 Notice of Removal by Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association, The (With attachments)(Ellis, Harvey)
February 8, 2019 Filing 6 EXHIBITS 1 through 33 in Support of #2 Notice of Removal by Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association, The (With attachments)(Ellis, Harvey)
February 8, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent The Bank of New York Mellon Corp. for Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association, The) by Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association, The (Ellis, Harvey)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Harvey D. Ellis on behalf of Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association, The (Ellis, Harvey)
February 8, 2019 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 2/8/2019 in the amount of $400, receipt number 1086-1241570 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal, ) by Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association, The (Ellis, Harvey)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk. Defendant is directed to pay the $400 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. Consent forms provided to filing party (Filing Fee due by 2/15/2019) (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Pushmataha County District Court, case number 15-CJ-40 by Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association, The (With attachments) (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/8/2019: #7 Exhibit G- Hearing Transcript) (pjw, Deputy Clerk).
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association, The (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
January 15, 2016 AMENDED PETITION with Jury Demand filed in State Court against Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association, The, Jerry Crowl, Victoria Crowl, House Real Estate of Oklahoma, LLC by Tonya L. Curell (pjw, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curell v. Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: House Real Estate of Oklahoma, LLC
Represented By: Diane M. Black
Represented By: Jennifer L. Struble
Represented By: Charles D. Neal, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick G. Colvin
Represented By: W. Michael Hill
Represented By: Mark E. Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association, The
Represented By: Jeremy J. Overbey
Represented By: Eric A. Jacocks
Represented By: Marc D. Cabrera
Represented By: Robert T. Mowrey
Represented By: Cynthia K. Timms
Represented By: Scott F. Doering
Represented By: Harvey D. Ellis
Represented By: D. Kent Meyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victoria Crowl
Represented By: Diane M. Black
Represented By: Jennifer L. Struble
Represented By: Charles D. Neal, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick G. Colvin
Represented By: W. Michael Hill
Represented By: Mark E. Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Crowl
Represented By: Diane M. Black
Represented By: Jennifer L. Struble
Represented By: Charles D. Neal, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick G. Colvin
Represented By: W. Michael Hill
Represented By: Mark E. Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonya L. Curell
Represented By: Charles C. Weddle, III
Represented By: Joe E. White, Jr.
Represented By: Marc L. Bovos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: House Real Estate of Oklahoma, L.L.C.
Represented By: James E. Weger
Represented By: Patrick G. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?