Smith v. Whitaker et al
Petitioner: Lincoln Smith
Respondent: Barbara Owlett, US Department of Homeland Security, Matthew Whitaker and Kirstjen Nielsen
Case Number: 6:2019cv00060
Filed: February 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Ronald A White
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 3/18/2019 in the amount of $5, receipt number 16509 (Re: #1 ) by Lincoln Smith (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White directing petitioner to pay the filing fee of $5.00 or submit an Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs no later than 3/18/2019. The Clerk of Court is directed to provide petitioner with the applicable form along with this minute order.(lal, Deputy Clerk)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White directing Respondents to respond to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus within sixty (60) days of service of this order (dma, Deputy Clerk)
February 20, 2019 Filing 3 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the New York Southern
February 14, 2019 Mailed a copy of #2 Order, to Lincoln Smith 111 S. Alabama Okmulgee, OK 74447. (vba) [Transferred from nysd on 2/20/2019.]
February 13, 2019 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Eastern District of Oklahoma (rjm) [Transferred from nysd on 2/20/2019.]
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 TRANSFER ORDER. In the interest of justice, this Court transfers this petition to the Eastern District of Oklahoma. See 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket, mail a copy of this order to Petitioner, and note service on the docket. The Clerk of Court is further directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma. Whether Petitioner should be permitted to proceed further without payment of fees is a determination to be made by the transferee court. This order closes this case. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 2/13/2019) (rjm) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from nysd on 2/20/2019.]
February 13, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (rjm) [Transferred from nysd on 2/20/2019.]
February 12, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (rdz) [Transferred from nysd on 2/20/2019.]
February 12, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. Document filed by Lincoln Smith.(rdz) [Transferred from nysd on 2/20/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Whitaker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Barbara Owlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: US Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kirstjen Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lincoln Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?