Parker et al v. C. R. Bard, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Joana Parker and Ed Parker
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson, C. R. Bard, Inc., Ethicon, Inc. and Tissue Science Laboratories Limited
Case Number: 6:2019cv00121
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Ronald A White
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Filing 18 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the West Virginia Southern
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A It is ORDERED that on 4/11/2019 (14 days after the date of entry of the order) the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 4/11/2019 the parties are ORDERED to confer and to file in each individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider, as more fully set forth herein; it is ORDERED that Joint Motions to Dismiss, Stipulations of Dismissal, or Dismissals pursuant to Pretrial Order # 282 must be filed on or before 4/7/2019 (10 days after the date of entry of this order); it is further ORDERED that if a proper Joint Motion to Dismiss, Stipulation of Dismissal, or Dismissal pursuant to Pretrial Order # 282 is filed on or before the deadline set forth in this order, the parties are not required to file relevant documents from the main MDL in each member case as previously directed in this order. On the Transfer Date, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to utilize the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A. After transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/28/2019. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (brn) [Transferred from wvsd on 4/12/2019.]
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting the Motions filed in MDL 2187 by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Substitute Susan M. Robinson as Counsel in lieu of David B. Thomas, and to Substitute William M. Gage as Counsel in lieu of Christy D. Jones; the Clerk is directed to terminate Christy D. Jones and to substitute William M. Gage as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2187 with which Christy D. Jones is associated, and to terminate David B. Thomas and to substitute Susan M. Robinson as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2187 with which David B. Thomas is associated. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston and Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/16/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (lca) (ADI) [Transferred from wvsd on 4/12/2019.]
June 19, 2018 Filing 15 STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT BETWEEN CERTAIN PARTIES (Relief from deadlines set forth in PTO #275) by Tissue Science Laboratories Limited, C. R. Bard, Inc., Joana Parker, Ed Parker (Hobbs, Micah) (Modified on 6/19/2018 to add party filers) (kp). [Transferred from wvsd on 4/12/2019.]
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PRETRIAL ORDER # 283 (Amended Docket Control Order C. R. Bard Wave 7 Cases) Because the court has determined there was confusion as to expert deadlines, changes have been made to Paragraph A of PTO # 275. The parties are advised that while this order will be entered in the individual cases in the coming days, it is effective as of the day it was entered in the main MDL. The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 7 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 03/19/2018; Defendant Fact Sheets due by 04/19/2018; Deadline for written discovery requests due by 05/18/2018; Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 07/13/2018; Expert disclosure served by defendants pursuant to Fed R. Civ P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/13/2018; Expert disclosure served for rebuttal pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/20/2018; Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 10/04/2018; Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 10/18/2018; Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/25/2018; Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 11/01/2018; Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/18/2018; Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/25/2018; Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 11/01/2018. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/13/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2187; Active Bard Wave 7 Cases) (pma) [Transferred from wvsd on 4/12/2019.]
March 26, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of #12 Notice of Videotaped Deposition (Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 4/12/2019.]
January 31, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. David Powell on 3/19/2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 4/12/2019.]
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRETRIAL ORDER # 275 (Docket Control Order - C. R. Bard Wave 7 Cases) THIS PRETRIAL ORDER SETS MANDATORY DEADLINES FOR MOST OF THE REMAINING C. R. BARD, INC. CASES. The court ORDERS that this Docket Control Order be filed in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in every case listed on Exhibit A (hereinafter "Wave 7 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order. The stay on the Covidien Wave 1 cases is lifted and the Covidien Wave 1 cases are incorporated in the C. R. Bard Wave 7 cases and subject to this Docket Control Order. The following deadlines apply in all Wave 7 cases: A. Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/19/2018, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/19/2018, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 5/18/2018, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 6/04/2018, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 7/05/2018, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/23/2018, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/04/2018, Deadline to file list of general causation experts in each individual Wave 7 case due by 9/11/2018, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/05/2018, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/05/2018, Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/19/2018, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/26/2018. B.4. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/10/2018, and any response is due by 8/24/2018. Any reply is due by 8/31/2018. C.1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/27/2018 the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/03/2018. Additional directives are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2187; Bard Wave 7 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (lca) [Transferred from wvsd on 4/12/2019.]
June 14, 2017 Filing 10 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Joana Parker. (Cutter, Curtis) [Transferred from wvsd on 4/12/2019.]
November 28, 2016 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from wvsd on 4/12/2019.]
November 10, 2016 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Deborah Moeller on 11/10/16. Tissue Science Laboratories Limited waiver mailed on 10/31/2016, answer due 12/30/2016. (Moeller, Deborah) [Transferred from wvsd on 4/12/2019.]
November 10, 2016 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Micah L. Hobbs on behalf of Tissue Science Laboratories Limited. (Hobbs, Micah) [Transferred from wvsd on 4/12/2019.]
November 9, 2016 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Richard B. North, Jr. on 11/04/2016. C. R. Bard, Inc. waiver mailed on 10/31/2016, answer due 12/30/2016. (North, Richard) [Transferred from wvsd on 4/12/2019.]
November 9, 2016 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Richard B. North, Jr on behalf of C. R. Bard, Inc.. (North, Richard) [Transferred from wvsd on 4/12/2019.]
November 2, 2016 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from wvsd on 4/12/2019.]
October 6, 2016 Filing 3 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 220 (Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference for Remaining Covidien LP, Sofradim and TSL Plaintiffs) entered on 08/29/2016 in MDL 2187 to attorneys in member case. (jk) [Transferred from wvsd on 4/12/2019.]
October 6, 2016 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to C. R. Bard, Inc., Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Tissue Science Laboratories Limited, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachment: #1 Summons issued as to Tissue Science Laboratories Limited, #2 Summons Issued as to Ethicon, Inc., #3 Summons Issued as to Johnson & Johnson) (bw) [Transferred from wvsd on 4/12/2019.]
October 5, 2016 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-4958292. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (bw) [Transferred from wvsd on 4/12/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker et al v. C. R. Bard, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joana Parker
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ed Parker
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: William M. Gage
Represented By: Christy D. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. R. Bard, Inc.
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc.
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: William M. Gage
Represented By: Christy D. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tissue Science Laboratories Limited
Represented By: Micah L. Hobbs
Represented By: Deborah A. Moeller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?