Brister et al v. Bossen et al
Plaintiff: James L. Brister and Kathy L. Brister
Defendant: Vanessa Pierce Plunkett, RGB Eye Associates, PA, P&B Eye Investments, LLC and Andrew Douglas Bossen
Case Number: 6:2019cv00210
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Scott L Palk
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 15 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Christopher U. Brecht on behalf of Andrew Douglas Bossen, Vanessa Pierce Plunkett, RGB Eye Associates, PA (Brecht, Christopher)
August 13, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint (Re: #2 Complaint) by Vanessa Pierce Plunkett [NOTE: Attorney Gregg J. Lytle added to party Vanessa Pierce Plunkett(pty:dft)]. (Lytle, Gregg)
August 13, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint (Re: #2 Complaint) by Andrew Douglas Bossen [NOTE: Attorney Gregg J. Lytle added to party Andrew Douglas Bossen(pty:dft)]. (Lytle, Gregg)
August 5, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by RGB Eye Associates, PA (Lytle, Gregg)
August 2, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Christopher U. Brecht on behalf of RGB Eye Associates, PA (Brecht, Christopher)
August 2, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Gregg J. Lytle on behalf of RGB Eye Associates, PA (Lytle, Gregg)
August 2, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint (Re: #2 Complaint) by RGB Eye Associates, PA [NOTE: Attorney Gregg J. Lytle added to party RGB Eye Associates, PA(pty:dft)]. (Lytle, Gregg)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Vanessa Pierce Plunkett (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to P&B Eye Investments, LLC (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to RGB Eye Associates, PA (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Andrew Douglas Bossen (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
July 8, 2019 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 7/8/2019 in the amount of $400, receipt number 1086-1279280 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by James L. Brister (Bethea, Kenyatta)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: At the direction of the Court, this case is reassigned to United States District Judge Scott L. Palk of the Western District of Oklahoma, serving in this case by designation pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 292(b). All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-19-210-SLP. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk directing Plaintiffs to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiffs' failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov (Filing Fee due by 7/15/2019) (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Andrew Douglas Bossen, P&B Eye Investments, LLC, Vanessa Pierce Plunkett, RGB Eye Associates, PA by James L. Brister, Kathy L. Brister (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by James L. Brister, Kathy L. Brister (pjw, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brister et al v. Bossen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanessa Pierce Plunkett
Represented By: Christopher U. Brecht
Represented By: Gregg J. Lytle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RGB Eye Associates, PA
Represented By: Christopher U. Brecht
Represented By: Gregg J. Lytle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P&B Eye Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Douglas Bossen
Represented By: Christopher U. Brecht
Represented By: Gregg J. Lytle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James L. Brister
Represented By: Kenyatta R. Bethea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy L. Brister
Represented By: Kenyatta R. Bethea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?