Fine v. Sallisaw, City of et al
Plaintiff: Ted Fine
Defendant: Sallisaw, City of, Julian Mendiola, Ernie Martens, Sallisaw Police Department, Sequoyah County Board of County Commissioners, Gene Wheat, Phillip Gay, Ronnie Lowe, Keith Skelton, Shannon Vann, Larry Lane and Sallisaw Board of City Commissioners
Case Number: 6:2019cv00227
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Joe Heaton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 52 STIPULATION of Dismissal, dismissing Sallisaw Police Department, by Phillip Gay, Ronnie Lowe, Ernie Martens, Julian Mendiola, Sallisaw Board of City Commissioners, Sallisaw Police Department, Sallisaw, City of, Keith Skelton, Shannon Vann (Wood, Scott)
September 9, 2019 Filing 51 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #23 MOTION to Dismiss ) by Larry Lane(individually), Larry Lane(Sheriff of Sequoyah County, Oklahoma), Gene Wheat(Investigator for the Sheriff of Sequoyah County, Oklahoma), Gene Wheat(individually) ; (With attachments)(Whitson, Jamison)
August 28, 2019 Filing 50 MOTION to Dismiss Party Sallisaw Police Department by Sallisaw Police Department Responses due by 9/11/2019(Wood, Scott)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER by Judge Joe Heaton GRANTING #44 Defendants Board of Commissioners for the City of Sallisaw, Ronnie Lowe, PhillipGay, Julian Mendiola, Shannon Vann and the Sallisaw Police Department's Motion for Extension of deadline. Accordingly, the referenced Defendants shall file their answer or other responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint not later than 9/13/2019. Additionally, Plaintiff's Motions for Default Judgment docket nos. #32 , #33 , #35 , #36 , #37 , and #38 are STRICKEN as moot. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
August 27, 2019 Filing 48 ANSWER with Jury Demand to Complaint (Re: #2 Complaint) by Keith Skelton (Wood, Scott)
August 27, 2019 Filing 47 ANSWER with Jury Demand to Complaint (Re: #2 Complaint) by Ernie Martens (Wood, Scott)
August 27, 2019 Filing 46 ANSWER with Jury Demand to Complaint (Re: #2 Complaint) by Sallisaw, City of (Wood, Scott)
August 26, 2019 Filing 45 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #23 MOTION to Dismiss ) by Ted Fine ; (With attachments)(Conrady, James)
August 26, 2019 Filing 44 Unopposed MOTION to File Answer or responsive pleading Out of Time by Phillip Gay, Ronnie Lowe, Julian Mendiola, Sallisaw Police Department, Sallisaw Board of City Commissioners, Shannon Vann Responses due by 9/9/2019(Wood, Scott) Modified on 8/28/2019 to correct party name (pjw, Deputy Clerk).
August 22, 2019 Filing 43 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Scott B. Wood on behalf of Shannon Vann (Wood, Scott)
August 22, 2019 Filing 42 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Scott B. Wood on behalf of Sallisaw Board of City Commissioners (Wood, Scott) Modified on 8/28/2019 to correct party name (pjw, Deputy Clerk).
August 22, 2019 Filing 41 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Scott B. Wood on behalf of Julian Mendiola (Wood, Scott)
August 22, 2019 Filing 40 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Scott B. Wood on behalf of Ronnie Lowe (Wood, Scott)
August 22, 2019 Filing 39 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Scott B. Wood on behalf of Phillip Gay (Wood, Scott)
August 21, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION for Default Judgment against Shannon Vann by Ted Fine (With attachments) Responses due by 9/4/2019(Conrady, James)
August 21, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION for Default Judgment against Julian Mendiola by Ted Fine (With attachments) Responses due by 9/4/2019(Conrady, James)
August 21, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION for Default Judgment against Phillip Gay by Ted Fine (With attachments) Responses due by 9/4/2019(Conrady, James)
August 21, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION for Default Judgment against Ronnie Lowe by Ted Fine (With attachments) Responses due by 9/4/2019(Conrady, James)
August 21, 2019 Filing 34 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Scott B. Wood on behalf of Sallisaw Police Department (Wood, Scott)
August 21, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION for Default Judgment against Sallisaw Board of Commissioners by Ted Fine (With attachments) Responses due by 9/4/2019(Conrady, James)
August 21, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION for Default Judgment against Sallisaw Police Department by Ted Fine (With attachments) Responses due by 9/4/2019(Conrady, James)
August 20, 2019 Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Phillip Gay as AMENDED by Ted Fine (Conrady, James)
August 20, 2019 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Sallisaw Police Department - Served on 7/22/2019. by Ted Fine (Conrady, James)
August 20, 2019 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Shannon Vann - Served on 7/22/2019. by Ted Fine (Conrady, James)
August 20, 2019 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Ronnie Lowe - Served on 7/22/2019. by Ted Fine (Conrady, James)
August 20, 2019 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Larry Lane, Sheriff - Served on 7/22/2019. by Ted Fine (Conrady, James) Modified on 8/22/2019 to correct defendant served (cjt, Deputy Clerk).
August 20, 2019 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Julian Mendiola - Served on 7/22/2019. by Ted Fine (Conrady, James)
August 20, 2019 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Sallisaw Board of City Commissioners - Served on 7/22/2019. by Ted Fine (Conrady, James) Modified on 8/28/2019 to correct party name (pjw, Deputy Clerk).
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge Joe Heaton granting #21 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants Ernie Martens, City of Sallisaw, and Keith Skelton shall file answers or other responsive pleadings not later than 8/27/2019. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
August 12, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Larry Lane(individually), Larry Lane(Sheriff of Sequoyah County, Oklahoma), Gene Wheat(Investigator for the Sheriff of Sequoyah County, Oklahoma), Gene Wheat(individually) (With attachments) Responses due by 8/26/2019(Whitson, Jamison)
August 12, 2019 Filing 22 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jamison C. Whitson on behalf of Larry Lane(individually), Larry Lane(Sheriff of Sequoyah County, Oklahoma), Gene Wheat(Investigator for the Sheriff of Sequoyah County, Oklahoma), Gene Wheat(individually) (Whitson, Jamison)
August 11, 2019 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Move or Plead to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendants Ernie Martens, City of Sallisaw, and Keith Skelton (Re: #2 Complaint) Responses due by 8/26/2019. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
August 10, 2019 Filing 20 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Scott B. Wood on behalf of Ernie Martens, City of Sallisaw, and Keith Skelton (tls, Deputy Clerk)
July 18, 2019 Filing 19 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by James A. Conrady on behalf of Ted Fine (Conrady, James)
July 18, 2019 Filing 18 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Laurence K. Donahoe on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Donahoe, Laurence)
July 17, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Sallisaw Police Department (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
July 17, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Gene Wheat (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
July 17, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Larry Lane (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
July 17, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Shannon Vann (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
July 17, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Julian Mendiola (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
July 17, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Phillip Gay (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
July 17, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Ronnie Lowe (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
July 17, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Sallisaw Board of City Commissioners (jcb, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 8/28/2019 to correct party name (pjw, Deputy Clerk).
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Keith Skelton (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Ernie Martens (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Sallisaw, City of (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Laurence K. Donahoe on behalf of Ted Fine (Donahoe, Laurence)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Judge Joe Heaton: Plaintiff's entry of appearance to be filed by 07/19/2019. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
July 16, 2019 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 7/16/2019 in the amount of $400, receipt number 1086-1280995 (Re: #2 Complaint) by Ted Fine (Donahoe, Laurence)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: At the direction of the Court, this case is reassigned to United States District Judge Joe Heaton of the Western District of Oklahoma, serving in this case by designation pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 292(b). All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-19-227-JH. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov (Filing Fee due by 7/22/2019) (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Phillip Gay, Larry Lane (individually), Larry Lane (Sheriff of Sequoyah County, Oklahoma), Ronnie Lowe, Ernie Martens, Julian Mendiola, Sallisaw Police Department, Sallisaw, City of, Sallisaw Board of City Commissioners, Keith Skelton, Shannon Vann, Gene Wheat (Investigator for the Sheriff of Sequoyah County, Oklahoma), Gene Wheat (individually) by Ted Fine (pjw, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 8/28/2019 to correct party name (pjw, Deputy Clerk).
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Ted Fine (pjw, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fine v. Sallisaw, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sallisaw, City of
Represented By: Scott B. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julian Mendiola
Represented By: Scott B. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernie Martens
Represented By: Scott B. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sallisaw Police Department
Represented By: Scott B. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sequoyah County Board of County Commissioners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gene Wheat
Represented By: Jamison C. Whitson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Gay
Represented By: Scott B. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie Lowe
Represented By: Scott B. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Skelton
Represented By: Scott B. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Vann
Represented By: Scott B. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Lane
Represented By: Jamison C. Whitson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sallisaw Board of City Commissioners
Represented By: Scott B. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ted Fine
Represented By: Laurence K. Donahoe
Represented By: James A. Conrady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?