United States Postal Service v. Prather
Plaintiff: United States Postal Service
Defendant: Leanda Joanne Prather
Case Number: 6:2019cv00228
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 AGREED JUDGMENT by Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti entering judgment in favor of Plaintiff, United States Postal Service, against Defendant, Leanda Joanne Prather (terminates case) (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Approve Agreed Judgment by United States Postal Service Responses due by 8/5/2019(Poe, Jason) Modified on 7/24/2019 to edit event (dma, Deputy Clerk).
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: At the direction of the Court, this case is reassigned to United States District Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti of the Western District of Oklahoma, serving in this case by designation pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 292(b). All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-19-228-TDD. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Leanda Joanne Prather by United States Postal Service (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by United States Postal Service (pjw, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Postal Service v. Prather
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Postal Service
Represented By: Jason Poe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leanda Joanne Prather
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?