Cambria Energy, LLC v. Higgins
Plaintiff: Cambria Energy, LLC
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Patrick T. Higgins
3Rd Party Defendant: Royalty Management Partners, LLC and Lee-Leigh 2012 Revocable Trust
Case Number: 6:2019cv00252
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: David L Russell
Referring Judge: Ronald A White
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #14 MOTION to Dismiss ) by Cambria Energy, LLC, Lee-Leigh 2012 Revocable Trust, Royalty Management Partners, LLC ;(Tracy, Ronald)
September 19, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion (Re: #14 MOTION to Dismiss ) by Patrick T. Higgins ;(Arrowood, John)
September 5, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims and Third-Party Petition, with Brief in Support by Cambria Energy, LLC, Lee-Leigh 2012 Revocable Trust, Royalty Management Partners, LLC Responses due by 9/19/2019(Tracy, Ronald)
August 30, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Rhonda J. McLean on behalf of Lee-Leigh 2012 Revocable Trust, Royalty Management Partners, LLC (McLean, Rhonda)
August 30, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cambria Energy, LLC (Tracy, Ronald)
August 30, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Royalty Management Partners, LLC (Tracy, Ronald)
August 30, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ronald R. Tracy on behalf of Lee-Leigh 2012 Revocable Trust, Royalty Management Partners, LLC (Tracy, Ronald)
August 28, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS on Third-Party Complaint Issued by Court Clerk as to Royalty Management Partners, LLC (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
August 28, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS on Third-Party Complaint Issued by Court Clerk as to Lee-Leigh 2012 Revocable Trust (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
August 16, 2019 Filing 7 THIRD PARTY PETITION with Jury Demand against Lee-Leigh 2012 Revocable Trust and Royalty Management Partners, LLC by Patrick T. Higgins. ***(Part 3 of 3 part document See Docket Nos. #5 and #6 )*** (tls, Deputy Clerk)
August 16, 2019 Filing 6 COUNTERCLAIM with Jury Demand against Cambria Energy, LLC by Patrick T. Higgins ***(Part 2 of 3 part document see Docket Nos. #5 and #7 )*** (tls, Deputy Clerk)
August 16, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Petition/Complaint filed in State Court (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Patrick T. Higgins (Arrowood, John) *** (Part 1 of 3 part document See Docket Nos. #6 and #7 )***
August 9, 2019 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 8/9/2019 in the amount of $400, receipt number 1086-1287406 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by Patrick T. Higgins (Arrowood, John)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: At the direction of the Court, this case is reassigned to United States District Judge David L. Russell of the Western District of Oklahoma, serving in this case by designation pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 292(b). All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-19-252-DLR. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk. Defendant is directed to pay the $400 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. (Filing Fee due by 8/14/2019)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Carter County District Court, case number CJ-19-151 by Patrick T. Higgins (With attachments) (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Patrick T. Higgins (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
July 12, 2019 PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against Patrick T. Higgins by Cambria Energy, L.L.C. (jcb, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cambria Energy, LLC v. Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cambria Energy, LLC
Represented By: Rhonda J. McLean
Represented By: Ronald R. Tracy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Patrick T. Higgins
Represented By: John R. Arrowood
Represented By: Jeff Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Royalty Management Partners, LLC
Represented By: Rhonda J. McLean
Represented By: Ronald R. Tracy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Lee-Leigh 2012 Revocable Trust
Represented By: Rhonda J. McLean
Represented By: Ronald R. Tracy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?