Quahlity Buds, LLC v. Correa et al
Plaintiff: Quahlity Buds, LLC
Defendant: MCV Enterprises, LLC, Top Flight Distribution, LLC, Josh Berner and Kandis Correa
Case Number: 6:2019cv00257
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Ronald A White
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Filing 20 LETTER to Office of the Court Clerk, Cherokee County, with certified copy of remand order enclosed(lal, Deputy Clerk)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White granting plaintiff's motion to remand ( #7 Motion to Remand to State Court) and remanding case to the District Court of Cherokee County (case terminated) (lal, Deputy Clerk)
September 30, 2019 Filing 18 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ron Wright on behalf of Quahlity Buds, LLC (Wright, Ron)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White : In light of the filing of the Second Amended Complaint, defendant MCV Enterprises, LLC's [Sic] Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed 9/4/2019 ( #13 Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim ) is hereby deemed as MOOT. (lal, Deputy Clerk)
September 20, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim by Josh Berner, Kandis Correa Responses due by 10/4/2019(Vaughn, Christina)
September 18, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney(s) by Josh Berner, Kandis Correa Responses due by 10/2/2019(Sokolosky, Alexander)
September 6, 2019 Filing 14 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Josh Berner, Kandis Correa (Re: #8 Amended Complaint ) by Quahlity Buds, LLC (With attachments)(Bailey, Wayne)
September 4, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim by MCV Enterprises, LLC Responses due by 9/18/2019(Williams, Justin)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White inviting plaintiff if it so desires to file an amended complaint by 9/10/2019 providing additional factual averments which may vitiate defendants' claims of insufficiency (lal, Deputy Clerk)
August 29, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Josh Berner, Kandis Correa Responses due by 9/12/2019(Sokolosky, Alexander)
August 23, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion (Re: #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court ) by Josh Berner, Kandis Correa ;(Sokolosky, Alexander)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White: directing Defendants to file an expedited Response by 8/23/2019. (Re: #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court) (tls, Deputy Clerk)
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Re: #6 Amended Complaint, State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Quahlity Buds, LLC (Bailey, Wayne)
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Quahlity Buds, LLC Responses due by 8/29/2019(Bailey, Wayne)
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Quahlity Buds, LLC (Bailey, Wayne)
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Christina M. Vaughn on behalf of Josh Berner, Kandis Correa (Vaughn, Christina)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Alexander Sokolosky on behalf of Josh Berner, Kandis Correa (Sokolosky, Alexander)
August 8, 2019 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 8/8/2019 in the amount of $400, receipt number 1086-1287117 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by Josh Berner, Kandis Correa (Sokolosky, Alexander)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk. Defendants are directed to pay the $400 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling (Filing Fee due by 8/15/2019) (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Cherokee County District Court, case number 19-CJ-136 by Josh Berner, Kandis Correa (With attachments) (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Josh Berner, Kandis Correa (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
July 19, 2019 PETITION filed in State Court against Josh Berner, Kandis Correa, MCV Enterprises, LLC, Top Flight Distribution, LLC by Quahlity Buds, LLC (pjw, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quahlity Buds, LLC v. Correa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCV Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Justin R. Williams
Represented By: J. Blake Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Top Flight Distribution, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh Berner
Represented By: Alexander Sokolosky
Represented By: Christina M. Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kandis Correa
Represented By: Alexander Sokolosky
Represented By: Christina M. Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quahlity Buds, LLC
Represented By: Wayne Bailey
Represented By: Ron Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?