Dow v. TransAm Trucking, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sybil Dow
Defendant: Thomas Dean Watkins, Jr., TransAm Trucking, Inc. and Watkins
Case Number: 6:2019cv00276
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Ronald A White
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Joe S. Carson on behalf of Sybil Dow (Carson, Joe)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Jacobson Holdings, Inc. for TransAm Trucking, Inc.) by TransAm Trucking, Inc. (Shephard, C.)
August 21, 2019 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 8/21/2019 in the amount of $400, receipt number AOKEDC-1292461 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by TransAm Trucking, Inc. (Shephard, C.)
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Greg A. Castro on behalf of TransAm Trucking, Inc. (Castro, Greg)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Petition/Complaint filed in State Court (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by TransAm Trucking, Inc. (Shephard, C.)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by C. Eric Shephard on behalf of TransAm Trucking, Inc. (Shephard, C.)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk. Defendant is directed to pay the $400 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. (Filing Fee due by 8/27/2019)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Carter County District Court, case number CJ-2019-163 by TransAm Trucking, Inc. (With attachments) (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by TransAm Trucking, Inc. (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
July 18, 2019 PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against TransAm Trucking, Inc., Thomas Dean Watkins, Jr by Sybil Dow (jcb, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dow v. TransAm Trucking, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Dean Watkins, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransAm Trucking, Inc.
Represented By: C. Eric Shephard
Represented By: Greg A. Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sybil Dow
Represented By: Bradley E. Norman
Represented By: Joe S. Carson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?