Atoka County Board of Commissioners v. Purdue Pharma, LP et al
Plaintiff: Atoka County Board of Commissioners and Atoka County Board of County Commissioners
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Mallinckrodt, LLC, Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Anda, Inc., Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Morris & Dickson Co., LLC, Purdue Pharma, Inc., Allergan, PLC, Purdue Frederick Company, The, Insys Therapeutic, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Keysource Medical, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis, PLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., Watson Pharmaceutical, Inc., Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Walgreen Co., Cephalon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Perry Fine, McKesson Corp., AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, Purdue Pharma, LP, Watson Pharma, Inc., Physicians Total Care, Inc., Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC, GCP Pharma, LLC, Mallinckrodt, PLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Lynn Webster and CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00279
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Charles B Goodwin
Referring Judge: Ronald A White
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Filing 48 RESPONSE to Motion (Re: #44 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation ) by Atoka County Board of County Commissioners ; (With attachments)(Court, Todd)
October 9, 2019 Filing 47 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #34 MOTION to Remand ) by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. ;(Zschiesche, Ray)
October 9, 2019 Filing 46 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #35 MOTION to Expedite Ruling ) by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The, McKesson Corp. ;(Campbell, Stuart)
October 9, 2019 Filing 45 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #34 MOTION to Remand ) by McKesson Corp. ; (With attachments)(Campbell, Stuart)
October 9, 2019 Filing 44 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The, McKesson Corp. (With attachments) Responses due by 10/23/2019(Campbell, Stuart)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER by Judge Charles B. Goodwin granting Defendants Anda, Inc. and Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s #40 Unopposed Joint Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Petition. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by Judge Charles B. Goodwin granting Defendants CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC and Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. a/k/a Walgreen Co.'s #37 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move to Dismiss or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff Petition. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
October 2, 2019 Filing 41 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: At the direction of the Court, this case is reassigned to United States District Judge Charles B. Goodwin of the Western District of Oklahoma, serving in this case by designation pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 292(b). All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-19-279-CBG. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
October 1, 2019 Filing 40 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint) by Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc. (With attachments) Responses due by 10/15/2019(Curran, Jeffrey)
October 1, 2019 Filing 39 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD for Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc.) by Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc. (Curran, Jeffrey)
October 1, 2019 Filing 38 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jeffrey A. Curran on behalf of Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc. (Curran, Jeffrey)
October 1, 2019 Filing 37 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move to Dismiss or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Petition Under Rule 12 (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint) by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC, Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. [NOTE: Attorney G. Calvin Sharpe added to parties CVS Health Corporation(pty:dft), CVS Pharmacy, Inc.(pty:dft), Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC(pty:dft)]. Responses due by 10/15/2019(Sharpe, G.)
September 26, 2019 Filing 36 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk - The Clerk's Office is in receipt of a District Judge Option in this case. Therefore, Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West is no longer assigned to this case and the Clerk awaits reassignment of this case to a District Judge. (adw, Deputy Clerk)
September 25, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION to Expedite Ruling (Re: #34 MOTION to Remand ) by Atoka County Board of County Commissioners (With attachments) Responses due by 10/9/2019(Court, Todd)
September 25, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION to Remand by Atoka County Board of County Commissioners (With attachments) [NOTE: Attorney Todd A. Court added to party Atoka County Board of County Commissioners(pty:pla)]. Responses due by 10/9/2019(Court, Todd)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West - Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record filed by Sanford C. Coats (Docket Entry #32 ) is hereby GRANTED. Since alternative counsel has entered the case for the Purdue Pharma Defendants, Mr. Coats is permitted to withdraw as counsel of record for these Defendants.(adw, Deputy Clerk)
September 24, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney Sanford C. Coats by Purdue Frederick Company, The, Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, LP Responses due by 10/8/2019(Coats, Sanford)
September 17, 2019 Filing 31 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Evan Way on behalf of Purdue Frederick Company, The, Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, LP (Way, Evan)
September 17, 2019 Filing 30 Notice of Bankruptcy as to Purdue Pharma L.P. andn Purdue Pharma Inc. by Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, LP by Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, LP (With attachments)(Burns, Joshua)
September 17, 2019 Filing 29 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Joshua D. Burns on behalf of Purdue Frederick Company, The, Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, LP (Burns, Joshua)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West granting #27 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (adw, Deputy Clerk)
September 16, 2019 Filing 27 Unopposed Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint) by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The, McKesson Corp. Responses due by 9/30/2019(Campbell, Stuart)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West granting #24 Defendant Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. (adw, Deputy Clerk)
September 3, 2019 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint) by Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Responses due by 9/17/2019(Riddles, D.)
September 3, 2019 Filing 23 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Riddles, D.)
September 3, 2019 Filing 22 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by D. Todd Riddles on behalf of Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Riddles, D.)
August 30, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint) by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Responses due by 9/13/2019(Zschiesche, Ray)
August 29, 2019 Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk : Pursuant to the recusal of Judge Ronald A. White and at the direction of the Court, this case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-19-279-KEW.(lal, Deputy Clerk)
August 28, 2019 Filing 19 SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by McKesson Corp. (With attachments)(Campbell, Stuart) Modified text on 9/3/2019 (cjt, Deputy Clerk).
August 28, 2019 Filing 18 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Robert G. McCampbell on behalf of Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. (McCampbell, Robert)
August 28, 2019 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parents Cupric Holding Co., Inc. and Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. for Cephalon, Inc.; identifying Corporate Parents Orvet UK Unlimited, Teva Pharmaceuticals Europe B.V. and Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. and Other Affiliates Teva Pharmaceutical Holdings Cooperatieve U.A. and IVAX LLC for Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.; identifying Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. for Watson laboratories, Inc., Actavis LLC, and Actavis Pharma, Inc. (Quinn, Ashley). Modified on 8/29/2019: added corporate parents and other affiliates and updated text (nm, Deputy Clerk).
August 28, 2019 Filing 16 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ashley E. Quinn on behalf of Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. (Quinn, Ashley)
August 28, 2019 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart)
August 28, 2019 Filing 14 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Stuart D. Campbell on behalf of McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart)
August 27, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Corporate Parent Generic Drug Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent HDG Acquisition, Inc., Corporate Parent Cardinal Health, Inc. for Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The) by Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The (Ray, Ryan)
August 27, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cardinal Health, Inc. (Ray, Ryan)
August 27, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ryan A. Ray on behalf of Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The (Ray, Ryan)
August 27, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ryan A. Ray on behalf of Cardinal Health, Inc. (Ray, Ryan)
August 27, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by D. Michael McBride, III on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (McBride, D.)
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation for AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation) by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (Huntsman, Susan)
August 27, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Susan E. Huntsman on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (Huntsman, Susan)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Endo International PLC for Endo Health Solutions, Inc.) by Endo Health Solutions, Inc. (Zschiesche, Ray)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Endo International PLC for Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.) by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Zschiesche, Ray)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ray E. Zschiesche on behalf of Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Zschiesche, Ray)
August 26, 2019 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 8/26/2019 in the amount of $400, receipt number AOKEDC-1293589 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Zschiesche, Ray)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk. Defendant is directed to pay the $400 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. (Filing Fee due by 9/3/2019)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Atoka County District Court, case number CJ-19-010 by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
February 25, 2019 PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Actavis, PLC, Allergan, PLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Perry Fine, GCP Pharma, LLC, Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The, Insys Therapeutic, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Keysource Medical, Inc., Mallinckrodt, LLC, Mallinckrodt, PLC, McKesson Corp., Morris & Dickson Co., LLC, Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Physicians Total Care, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, The, Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, LP, Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharma, Inc., Watson Pharmaceutical, Inc., Lynn Webster by Atoka County Board of Commissioners (jcb, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atoka County Board of Commissioners v. Purdue Pharma, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Represented By: Don W. Danz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, LLC
Represented By: Jon Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Ray E. Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda, Inc.
Represented By: Ashley E. Quinn
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Ashley E. Quinn
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris & Dickson Co., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Sanford C. Coats
Represented By: Evan Way
Represented By: Joshua D. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, The
Represented By: Sanford C. Coats
Represented By: Evan Way
Represented By: Joshua D. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutic, Inc.
Represented By: Joe M. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Robert G. McCampbell
Represented By: Ashley E. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keysource Medical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Ray E. Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan A. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: D. Todd Riddles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, LLC
Represented By: Robert G. McCampbell
Represented By: Ashley E. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The
Represented By: Ryan A. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Robert G. McCampbell
Represented By: Ashley E. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Robert G. McCampbell
Represented By: Ashley E. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: Don W. Danz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By: Robert G. McCampbell
Represented By: Ashley E. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: John H. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Fine
Represented By: Robert A. Bragalone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corp.
Represented By: Kaylee Davis-Maddy
Represented By: Stuart D. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: D. Michael McBride, III
Represented By: Susan E. Huntsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: John H. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: G. Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, LP
Represented By: Sanford C. Coats
Represented By: Evan Way
Represented By: Joshua D. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Robert G. McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Physicians Total Care, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC
Represented By: G. Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GCP Pharma, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, PLC
Represented By: Jon Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: John H. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Represented By: John H. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Webster
Represented By: Robert A. Bragalone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: G. Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atoka County Board of Commissioners
Represented By: Matthew J. Sill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atoka County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: Matthew J. Sill
Represented By: Todd A. Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?