Ezell v. Hininger et al
Plaintiff: James Ezell, James R. Ezell and James Ezell, III
Defendant: David Cincotta, Gentry, Perez, Austin Parks, Carl Hoover, Mark Knutson, Tiffany Ade, James Yates, Damon Hininger, R. Hodgson, Sgt. Walker, Terry Underwood, Jason Bryant, James Nall, Jessica Patterson, S Pfaff, Scott Crow, Carla Hoover and S. Pfaff
Case Number: 6:2019cv00302
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: James H Payne
Referring Judge: Steven P Shreder
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder : Denying #27 without prejudice Plaintiffs motion to amend for his failure to comply with Local Civil Rule 9.2(c). Plaintiff has failed to clearly set forth the reasons for requesting permission to file an amended complaint, and he has failed to submit a proposed amended complaint with the motion. The Court Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff a copy of Local Civil Rule 9.2(c). (acg, Deputy Clerk)
November 7, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Amend (Re: #1 Complaint ) (amended complaint not included in mailing) by James Ezell, III Responses due by 11/21/2019(acg, Deputy Clerk)
November 6, 2019 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Damon Hininger - Served on 10/25/2019. (acg, Deputy Clerk)
October 15, 2019 Filing 25 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to S. Pfaff (acg, Deputy Clerk)
October 15, 2019 Filing 24 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Austin Parks (acg, Deputy Clerk)
October 15, 2019 Filing 23 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Mark Knutson (acg, Deputy Clerk)
October 15, 2019 Filing 22 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to R. Hodgson(acg, Deputy Clerk)
October 15, 2019 Filing 21 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to David Cincotta (acg, Deputy Clerk)
October 15, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Jason Bryant (acg, Deputy Clerk)
October 15, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to James Yates (acg, Deputy Clerk)
October 15, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Sgt. Walker (acg, Deputy Clerk)
October 15, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Terry Underwood (acg, Deputy Clerk)
October 15, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Perez (acg, Deputy Clerk)
October 15, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Jessica Patterson (acg, Deputy Clerk)
October 15, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to James Nall (acg, Deputy Clerk)
October 15, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Carla Hoover (acg, Deputy Clerk)
October 15, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Damon Hininger (acg, Deputy Clerk)
October 15, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Gentry (acg, Deputy Clerk)
October 15, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Scott Crow (acg, Deputy Clerk)
October 15, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Tiffany Ade (acg, Deputy Clerk)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder, directing the Clerk of Court to issue Civil Summons for the named defendants and to forward the issued Summons to the U.S. Marshal for service. The plaintiff has been granted In Forma Pauperis status. (Re: #1 Complaint ) (acg, Deputy Clerk)
October 3, 2019 Filing 7 LETTER from OKED to Plaintiff re: 285 forms(acg, Deputy Clerk)
October 3, 2019 PARTIAL FILING FEES Paid on 10/3/2019 in the amount of $33.72, receipt number 17290 by James Ezell, III (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by District Judge James H. Payne : Granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, partial Filing Fee due by 10/8/2019 in the amount of $33.72. Finding as moot #2 motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. (acg, Deputy Clerk)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by James Ezell, III Responses due by 9/30/2019(acg, Deputy Clerk)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder: Directing plaintiff to submit within fourteen (14) days a Statement of Institutional Accounts form for a six-month period completed by the appropriate facility official. Failure to submit a proper Statement of Institutional Accounts as directed will result in dismissal of this action. The Court Clerk is directed to send plaintiff and the trust fund officer at his facility copies of this minute order and of the court's Statement of Institutional Accounts form.(acg, Deputy Clerk)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge James H. Payne, referring case to Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder for all further proceedings in accordance with jurisdiction pursuant to 28 USC 636. All future filings shall bear the case number CIV-19-302-JHP-SPS. (acg, Deputy Clerk)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by James Ezell Responses due by 9/23/2019(acg, Deputy Clerk)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by James Ezell (acg, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ezell v. Hininger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Ezell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James R. Ezell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Ezell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Cincotta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gentry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin Parks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Hoover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Knutson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany Ade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damon Hininger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Hodgson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Nall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Pfaff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Crow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carla Hoover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Pfaff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?