Waldon v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Robert Waldon
Defendant: C. R. Bard, Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00308
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Ronald A White
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 21 MAIL to Karolina S. Southard Returned - marked Forward Time Expired - Return to Sender. (Re: 14 Ruling on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, 15 Ruling on Motion to Withdraw Attorney(s), Ruling on Motion to Substitute Attorney). Checked address on envelope for forwarding and attorney is no longer at that address. (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White. This Court has been advised by the Court Clerk that Plaintiff's counsel, Karolina S. Southard, has not obtained an Electronic Case Filing (ECF) password to permit electronic filing in this Court. In accordance with LCvR5.1 of our Local Civil Rules, electronic filing is mandatory in this District and attorneys must abide by the CM/ECF Administrative Guide of Policies and Procedures. Among other conveniences, ECF registration permits immediate electronic notification of all filings rather than notification by conventional mail. Karolina S. Southard shall comply with the registration requirement and contact the Court Clerk to take the steps necessary to obtain an ECF password no later than 10/21/2019 (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
October 3, 2019 Filing 19 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Hiba Kazim on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Incorporated (Kazim, Hiba)
October 2, 2019 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Becton Dickinson & Co., Corporate Parent C. R. Bard, Inc. for Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.) by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. (Smiley, Stephanie)
October 2, 2019 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Becton Dickinson & Co. for C. R. Bard, Incorporated) by C. R. Bard, Incorporated (Smiley, Stephanie)
September 27, 2019 Filing 16 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Stephanie R. Smiley on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Incorporated (Smiley, Stephanie)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White granting Defendants C.R. Bard, Inc. and Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc.'s Motion for Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel Following Remand filed 9/25/2019 ( #13 Motion to Withdraw Attorney(s) ; #13 Motion to Substitute Attorney ). Accordingly, Attorney Richard B. North, Jr. is deemed as WITHDRAWN and attorneys J. Craig Buchan and Micah John Petersen are SUBSTITUTED as counsel for defendants C.R. Bard, Inc. and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. (lal, Deputy Clerk)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White granting defendants' Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Hiba Kazim filed 9/25/2019 (( #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorney Hiba Kazim) for defendants. This is conditioned on the filing of an entry of appearance and registration for electronic case filing by the applicant within seven (7) days from entry of this Order. See LCvR 83.4 and CM/ECF Administrative Guide of Policies and Procedures. (lal, Deputy Clerk)
September 25, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney and MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Incorporated Responses due by 10/9/2019(Buchan, J.). Added MOTION to Substitute Attorney as docket part to entry on 9/26/2019 (lal, Deputy Clerk).
September 25, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Attorney Hiba Kazim to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 filing fee; receipt number AOKEDC-1303599) by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Incorporated (With attachments) Responses due by 10/9/2019(Buchan, J.)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorney Stephanie R. Smiley for Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. and C. R. Bard, Incorporated, provided that local counsel is present at all proceedings, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This is conditioned on the filing of an entry of appearance and registration for electronic case filing by the applicant within seven (7) days from entry of this Order. See LCvR 83.4 and CM/ECF Administrative Guide of Policies and Procedures. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
September 20, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Attorney Stephanie R. Smiley to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 filing fee; receipt number AOKEDC-1302199) by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Incorporated (With attachments) Responses due by 10/4/2019(Buchan, J.)
September 18, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Micah J. Petersen on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Incorporated (Petersen, Micah)
September 18, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by J. Craig Buchan on behalf of All Defendants (Buchan, J.)
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the Arizona
September 10, 2019 Remark: Case transferred to Eastern District of Oklahoma via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from azd on 9/10/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED Re: #5 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/19. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 9/10/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 9/10/2019.]
March 31, 2017 Remark (CD) MDL 15-2641 (TCA) [Transferred from azd on 9/10/2019.]
March 21, 2017 ***Attorney Richard B North, Jr for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated and C R Bard Incorporated added pursuant to Notice of Appearance filed 3/21/17 in Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC at (Doc. 5293). (LSP) [Transferred from azd on 9/10/2019.]
March 14, 2017 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #3 Demand for Jury Trial by Plaintiff filed by Robert Waldon. Document entered in wrong case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile document in correct case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LSP) [Transferred from azd on 9/10/2019.]
March 14, 2017 Filing 3 *PLAINTIFF'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by Robert Waldon. (Southard, Karolina) *Document filed in wrong case. Attorney noticed to re-file document in correct case on 3/14/2017 (LSP). [Transferred from azd on 9/10/2019.]
March 14, 2017 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-17-0762-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LSP) [Transferred from azd on 9/10/2019.]
March 14, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-14012782 filed by Robert Waldon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LSP) [Transferred from azd on 9/10/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waldon v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. R. Bard, Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Hiba Kazim
Represented By: J. Craig Buchan
Represented By: Stephanie R. Smiley
Represented By: Micah John Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Hiba Kazim
Represented By: J. Craig Buchan
Represented By: Stephanie R. Smiley
Represented By: Micah John Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Waldon
Represented By: Karolina S. Southard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?