Love County Board of County Commissioners v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Plaintiff: Love County Board of County Commissioners
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Mallinckrodt, LLC, Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Purdue Pharma LP, Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Morris & Dickson Co., LLC, Allergan, PLC, Purdue Frederick Company, The, Perry Fine, Insys Therapeutic, Inc., Actavis PLC, Anda, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Keysource Medical, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., Watson Pharmaceutical, Inc., Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Walgreen Co., Cephalon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Purdue Pharma Inc., McKesson Corp., AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Watson Pharma, Inc., Physicians Total Care, Inc., Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC, GCP Pharma, LLC, Mallinckrodt, PLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Lynn Webster, CVS Health Corp. and CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00320
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
Referring Judge: Ronald A White
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Filing 43 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #31 MOTION to Remand ) by McKesson Corp. ; (With attachments)(Campbell, Stuart)
November 6, 2019 Filing 42 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #32 MOTION to Expedite Ruling ) by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The, McKesson Corp. ; (With attachments)(Campbell, Stuart)
November 6, 2019 Filing 41 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #32 MOTION to Expedite Ruling ) by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. ;(Zschiesche, Ray)
November 6, 2019 Filing 40 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #31 MOTION to Remand ) by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. ;(Zschiesche, Ray)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K. Frizzell directing Defendants to file their expedited Responses by 11/6/2019 to #32 Plaintiff's MOTION to Expedite Treatment of Motion to Remand. No Replies shall be filed. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Judge Gregory K. Frizzell granting #36 Defendants Anda, Inc. and Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Judge Gregory K. Frizzell granting #33 Defendants CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C. and Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move to Dismiss or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Petition Under Rule 12. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
October 29, 2019 Filing 36 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint) by Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc. (With attachments) Responses due by 11/12/2019(Curran, Jeffrey)
October 29, 2019 Filing 35 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD for Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc.) by Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc. (Curran, Jeffrey)
October 29, 2019 Filing 34 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jeffrey A. Curran on behalf of Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc. (Curran, Jeffrey)
October 29, 2019 Filing 33 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Move to Dismiss or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Petition Under Rule 12 (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint) by CVS Health Corp., CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC, Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. Responses due by 11/12/2019(Sharpe, G.) Modified on 10/30/2019 to add filer. (tls, Deputy Clerk).
October 23, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION to Expedite Ruling (Re: #31 MOTION to Remand ) by Love County Board of County Commissioners (With attachments) Responses due by 11/6/2019(Court, Todd)
October 23, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION to Remand by Love County Board of County Commissioners (With attachments) [NOTE: Attorney Todd A. Court added to party Love County Board of County Commissioners(pty:pla)]. Responses due by 11/6/2019(Court, Todd)
October 23, 2019 Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Pursuant to receipt of an election of the District Judge Option and in accordance with LCvR 40.1(c), this case is reassigned to United States District Judge Gregory K. Frizzell of the Northern District of Oklahoma, serving in this case by designation pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 292(b). Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder no longer assigned to case. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-19-320-GKF. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder GRANTING #28 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Accordingly, Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan, PLC, Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Insys Therapeutic, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt, LLC, Mallinckrodt, PLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma LP, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharma, Inc., and Watson Pharmaceutical, Inc. shall file their answer or other responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Petition within forty-five (45) days following the entry of: (1) A decision by the JPML granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action, or (2) this Court's ruling on any motion to remand, whichever is later. (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
October 10, 2019 Filing 28 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint) by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Responses due by 10/24/2019(Zschiesche, Ray)
October 8, 2019 Filing 27 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Robert G. McCampbell on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. (McCampbell, Robert)
October 8, 2019 Filing 26 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying Corporate Parents Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. and Cupric Holding Co., Inc. for Cephalon, Inc.; Corporate Parents Orvet UK Unlimited, Teva Pharmaceuticals Europe B.V., and Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. and Other Affiliates Teva Pharmaceutical Holdings Cooperatieve U.A. and IVAX LLC for Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.; Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. for Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actvais, LLC, and Watson Laboratories, Inc.) by Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. (Quinn, Ashley) Modified on 10/9/2019: added corporate parents and other affiliates and edited text (nm, Deputy Clerk).
October 8, 2019 Filing 25 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ashley E. Quinn on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. (Quinn, Ashley)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder GRANTING #23 Unopposed Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12. Accordingly, Defendants McKesson Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., The Harvard Drug Group, LLC and AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation shall file their answer or other responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Petition within sixty (60) days following the entry of: (1) A decision by the JPML granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action, or (2) this Court's ruling on any motion to remand, whichever is later. (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
October 2, 2019 Filing 23 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint) by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The, McKesson Corp. Responses due by 10/16/2019(Campbell, Stuart)
October 2, 2019 Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk directing parties to submit a completed Consent/District Judge Option form within fourteen (14) days. Consent forms provided to parties. (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder GRANTING #16 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 by Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Accordingly, Defendant Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc. shall file its answer or other responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint within forty-five (45) days following the entry of: (1) A decision by the JPML granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action, or (2) this Court's ruling on any motion to remand, whichever is later. (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
September 30, 2019 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Corporate Parent Generic Drug Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent HDG Acquisition, Inc., Corporate Parent Cardinal Health, Inc. for Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The) by Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The (Ray, Ryan)
September 30, 2019 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cardinal Health, Inc. (Ray, Ryan)
September 30, 2019 Filing 18 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ryan A. Ray on behalf of Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The (Ray, Ryan)
September 30, 2019 Filing 17 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ryan A. Ray on behalf of Cardinal Health, Inc. (Ray, Ryan)
September 30, 2019 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint) by Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Responses due by 10/15/2019(Riddles, D.)
September 30, 2019 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Riddles, D.)
September 30, 2019 Filing 14 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by D. Todd Riddles on behalf of Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Riddles, D.)
September 27, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart)
September 26, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk : Pursuant to the recusal of Judge Ronald A. White and at the direction of the Court, this case is hereby randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-19-320-SPS.(lal, Deputy Clerk)
September 24, 2019 Filing 11 SUPPLEMENTAL Notice of Removal (Re: #2 Notice of Removal) by McKesson Corp. (With attachments)(Campbell, Stuart)
September 24, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Stuart D. Campbell on behalf of McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart)
September 24, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by D. Michael McBride, III on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (McBride, D.)
September 24, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation for AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation) by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (Huntsman, Susan)
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Susan E. Huntsman on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (Huntsman, Susan)
September 23, 2019 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 9/23/2019 in the amount of $400, receipt number AOKEDC-1302598 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal) by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Zschiesche, Ray)
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Endo International PLC for Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.) by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Zschiesche, Ray)
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Endo International PLC for Endo Health Solutions, Inc.) by Endo Health Solutions, Inc. (Zschiesche, Ray)
September 23, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ray E. Zschiesche on behalf of Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Zschiesche, Ray)
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, Defendant is directed to pay the $400 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. ( Filing Fee due by 9/30/2019)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Love County District Court, case number CJ-2019-008 by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/23/2019: #32 Exhibit 32 - Summons - Morris, #33 Exhibit 33 - Summons - Quest, #34 Exhibit 34 - Summons - Harvard, #35 Exhibit 35 - Summons - PTC, #36 Exhibit 36 - Summons - PTC, #37 Exhibit 37 - Summons - PTC, #38 Exhibit 38 - Summons - CVS, #39 Exhibit 39 - Summons - CVS, #40 Exhibit 40 - Summons - Oklahoma CVS, #41 Exhibit 41 - Summons - Walgreens, #42 Exhibit 42 - Summons - Walgreens, #43 Exhibit 43 - Summons - Fine, #44 Exhibit 44 - Summons - Webster, #45 Exhibit 45 - EOA - Quest, #46 Exhibit 46 - Motion - Quest, #47 Exhibit 47 - EOA - McKesson, #48 Exhibit 48 - Motion - McKesson, #49 Exhibit 49 - EOA - Harvard Drug, #50 Exhibit 50 - EOA - Cardinal, #51 Exhibit 51 - EOA - Amerisource, #52 Exhibit 52 - EOA - Anda, #53 Exhibit 53 - Motion - Anda, #54 Exhibit 54 - Motion - CVS, #55 Exhibit 55 - Order - CVS, #56 Exhibit 56 - Order - Anda, #57 Exhibit 57 - Motion - Manufacturer Defendants, #58 Exhibit 58 - Order - McKesson, #59 Exhibit 59 - Order - Defendants Motion, #60 Exhibit 60 - Order - Manufacturer, #61 Exhibit 61 - EOA - Purdue, #62 Exhibit 62 - Notice of Bankruptcy, #63 Exhibit 63 - Docket Sheet) (jcb, Deputy Clerk).
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
February 22, 2019 PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan, PLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc., CVS Health Corp., CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Perry Fine, GCP Pharma, LLC, Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The, Insys Therapeutic, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Keysource Medical, Inc., Mallinckrodt, LLC, Mallinckrodt, PLC, McKesson Corp., Morris & Dickson Co., LLC, Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Physicians Total Care, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, The, Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma LP, Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharma, Inc., Watson Pharmaceutical, Inc., Lynn Webster by Love County Board of County Commissioners (jcb, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Love County Board of County Commissioners v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Represented By: Don W. Danz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, LLC
Represented By: Jon Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Ray E. Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma LP
Represented By: Evan Way
Represented By: Joshua D. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Curran
Represented By: Ashley E. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris & Dickson Co., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, The
Represented By: Evan Way
Represented By: Joshua D. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Fine
Represented By: Robert A. Bragalone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutic, Inc.
Represented By: Joe M. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Curran
Represented By: Ashley E. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Robert G. McCampbell
Represented By: Ashley E. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keysource Medical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Ray E. Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Robert G. McCampbell
Represented By: Ashley E. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan A. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: D. Todd Riddles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The
Represented By: Ryan A. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Robert G. McCampbell
Represented By: Ashley E. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Robert G. McCampbell
Represented By: Ashley E. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: Don W. Danz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By: Robert G. McCampbell
Represented By: Ashley E. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: John H. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Represented By: Evan Way
Represented By: Joshua D. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corp.
Represented By: Kaylee Davis-Maddy
Represented By: Stuart D. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: D. Michael McBride, III
Represented By: Susan E. Huntsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: John H. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Robert G. McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Physicians Total Care, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC
Represented By: G. Calvin Sharpe
Represented By: Amy D. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GCP Pharma, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, PLC
Represented By: Jon Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: John H. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Represented By: John H. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Webster
Represented By: Robert A. Bragalone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corp.
Represented By: G. Calvin Sharpe
Represented By: Amy D. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: G. Calvin Sharpe
Represented By: Amy D. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Love County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: Matthew J. Sill
Represented By: Todd A. Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?