Dunlap et al v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: William Dunlap and Martha Dunlap
Defendant: John Doe Corporation, Department of Veterans Affairs and United States of America
Case Number: 6:2019cv00341
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Steven P Shreder
Referring Judge: Ronald A White
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Petition/Complaint filed in State Court (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by United States of America [NOTE: Attorney Michael J. Cooper added to party United States of America(pty:dft)]. (Cooper, Michael)
October 29, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Pursuant to receipt of an election of the District Judge Option and in accordance with LCvR 40.1(c), this case is reassigned to District Judge Ronald A. White. Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder no longer assigned to case. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-19-341-RAW. The Scheduling Conference set 11/15/2019 at 10:15 a.m. before Judge Steven P. Shreder, and all related deadlines, are hereby STRICKEN. (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder setting Scheduling Conference for 11/15/2019 at 10:15 a.m. in Chambers, Room 425, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder. Parties directed to submit Joint Status Report by 11/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent or Reassignment Form) (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk. Consent forms provided to filing party (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Okmulgee County District Court, case number 19-CJ-72 by United States of America (With attachment) (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
October 8, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by United States of America (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
May 15, 2019 PETITION filed in State Court against Department of Veterans Affairs, John Doe Corporation by Martha Dunlap, William Dunlap (pjw, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunlap et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Dunlap
Represented By: Luke Gaither
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Dunlap
Represented By: Luke Gaither
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Veterans Affairs
Represented By: Michael J. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Michael J. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?