Peterson v. LeFlore County Board of County Commissioners et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Peterson
Defendant: Rob Seale, LeFlore County Board of County Commissioners, Kendall Morgan and Tyler Ragan
Case Number: 6:2019cv00376
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Ronald A White
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2020 Filing 14 DISCLOSURES per FRCP 26 by LeFlore County Board of County Commissioners, Rob Seale (Gooch, Ambre)
November 13, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER with Jury Demand to Petition/Complaint filed in State Court (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint, ) by Rob Seale (Carr, Michael)
November 13, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER with Jury Demand to Petition/Complaint filed in State Court (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint, ) by LeFlore County Board of County Commissioners (Carr, Michael)
November 13, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Petition/Complaint filed in State Court (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint, ) by Tyler Ragan(in his official capacity), Tyler Ragan(personally) (Gibbs, James)
November 13, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Petition/Complaint filed in State Court (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint, ) by Kendall Morgan(in his official capacity), Kendall Morgan(personally) (Gibbs, James)
November 6, 2019 Filing 9 STATUS REPORT by LeFlore County Board of County Commissioners, Kendall Morgan(in his official capacity), Kendall Morgan(personally), Tyler Ragan(in his official capacity), Tyler Ragan(personally), Rob Seale (Gibbs, James)
November 6, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION by LeFlore County Board of County Commissioners, Kendall Morgan(in his official capacity), Kendall Morgan(personally), Tyler Ragan(in his official capacity), Tyler Ragan(personally), Rob Seale (Gibbs, James)
November 6, 2019 Filing 7 JURY DEMAND by LeFlore County Board of County Commissioners, Kendall Morgan(in his official capacity), Kendall Morgan(personally), Tyler Ragan(in his official capacity), Tyler Ragan(personally), Rob Seale (Gibbs, James)
November 6, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ambre C. Gooch on behalf of LeFlore County Board of County Commissioners, Rob Seale (Gooch, Ambre)
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael L. Carr on behalf of LeFlore County Board of County Commissioners, Rob Seale (Carr, Michael)
November 6, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by James L. Gibbs, II on behalf of Kendall Morgan(in his official capacity), Kendall Morgan(personally), Tyler Ragan(in his official capacity), Tyler Ragan(personally) (Gibbs, James)
November 6, 2019 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 11/6/2019 in the amount of $400, receipt number AOKEDC-1314989 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal, ) by Kendall Morgan(in his official capacity), Kendall Morgan(personally), Tyler Ragan(in his official capacity), Tyler Ragan(personally) (Gibbs, James)
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, Defendant is directed to pay the $400 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. (Filing Fee due by 11/13/2019)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from LeFlore County District Court, case number CJ-2019-105 by LeFlore County Board of County Commissioners, Kendall Morgan(personally and in his official capacity), Tyler Ragan(personally and in his official capacity), Rob Seale (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by LeFlore County Board of County Commissioners, Kendall Morgan(personally and in his official capacity), Tyler Ragan(personally and in his official capacity), Rob Seale (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
May 15, 2019 PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against LeFlore County Board of County Commissioners, Kendall Morgan(personally and in his official capacity), Tyler Ragan(personally and in his official capacity), Rob Seale by Christopher Peterson (jcb, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peterson v. LeFlore County Board of County Commissioners et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob Seale
Represented By: Michael L. Carr
Represented By: Ambre C. Gooch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LeFlore County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: Michael L. Carr
Represented By: Ambre C. Gooch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kendall Morgan
Represented By: James L. Gibbs, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Ragan
Represented By: James L. Gibbs, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Peterson
Represented By: Gary R. Buckles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?