Harden et al v. Hedgecock et al
Plaintiff: Robert Harden, Misty Harden and Savanaha Works
Defendant: Timothy Byers, B.J. Hedgecock and Tamara Rashae Nichols
Case Number: 6:2019cv00379
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Kimberly E West
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Tamara Rashae Nichols (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
December 16, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Timothy Byers (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
December 16, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to B.J. Hedgecock (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
December 13, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Daniel E. Smolen on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Smolen, Daniel)
November 12, 2019 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 11/12/2019 in the amount of $400, receipt number AOKEDC-1316178 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Misty Harden, Robert Harden, Savanaha Works (Smolen, Daniel)
November 11, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Robert M. Blakemore on behalf of Misty Harden, Robert Harden, Savanaha Works (Blakemore, Robert)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party (Filing Fee due by 11/15/2019) (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Timothy Byers, B.J. Hedgecock, Tamara Rashae Nichols by Savanaha Works, Robert Harden, Misty Harden (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Misty Harden, Robert Harden, Savanaha Works (pjw, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harden et al v. Hedgecock et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Harden
Represented By: Daniel E. Smolen
Represented By: Robert M. Blakemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Misty Harden
Represented By: Daniel E. Smolen
Represented By: Robert M. Blakemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Savanaha Works
Represented By: Daniel E. Smolen
Represented By: Robert M. Blakemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Byers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B.J. Hedgecock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tamara Rashae Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?