CEVA Ground US, LP et al v. Brown
Plaintiff: CEVA Ground US, LP and Protective Insurance Company
Defendant: Malinda Brown
Case Number: 6:2019cv00383
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Kimberly E West
Referring Judge: Ronald A White
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Lauren M. Marciano on behalf of CEVA Ground US, LP, Protective Insurance Company (Marciano, Lauren)
December 30, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER with Jury Demand to Complaint (Re: #2 Complaint) by Malinda Brown (Ramsey, Mark)
December 30, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss or MOTION to Stay by Malinda Brown (With attachments) Responses due by 1/13/2020(Ramsey, Mark). Added MOTION to Stay on 1/6/2020 (dma, Deputy Clerk).
December 30, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Mark H. Ramsey on behalf of Malinda Brown (Ramsey, Mark)
December 30, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Stratton Taylor on behalf of Malinda Brown (Taylor, Stratton)
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Malinda Brown (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
November 14, 2019 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 11/14/2019 in the amount of $400, receipt number AOKEDC-1317505 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by CEVA Ground US, LP, Protective Insurance Company (McKee, William)
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk - Pursuant to receipt of an election of the District Judge Option and in accordance with LCvR 40.1(c), this case is reassigned to Judge Ronald A. White. Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West no longer assigned to case. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV 19-383-RAW. (adw, Deputy Clerk)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 11/20/2019)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Malinda Brown by CEVA Ground US, LP, Protective Insurance Company (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by CEVA Ground US, LP, Protective Insurance Company (jcb, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CEVA Ground US, LP et al v. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malinda Brown
Represented By: Stratton Taylor
Represented By: Mark H. Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CEVA Ground US, LP
Represented By: William T. McKee
Represented By: Lauren M. Marciano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Protective Insurance Company
Represented By: William T. McKee
Represented By: Lauren M. Marciano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?