Folger v. McAlester Regional Health Center
Plaintiff: Cresencia Folger
Defendant: McAlester Regional Health Center
Case Number: 6:2019cv00389
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Kimberly E West
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Change of Address by Leah M. Roper by on behalf of Cresencia Folger (Roper, Leah)
December 5, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER with Jury Demand to Complaint (Re: Complaint) by McAlester Regional Health Center (Turner, Elaine)
November 21, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. McAlester Regional Health Center answer due 12/5/2019. (adw, Deputy Clerk)
November 21, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint) by McAlester Regional Health Center Responses due by 12/5/2019(Kistler, Lindsay)
November 19, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Compliance with Requirements to Give Notice of Removal by McAlester Regional Health Center (With attachments)(Turner, Elaine)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference for 1/30/2020 at 3:00 PM in Chambers, Room 430, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West. The Court will initiate the conference call. Joint Status Report due by 1/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Reassignment Form)(adw, Deputy Clerk)
November 18, 2019 Filing 8 JURY DEMAND by Cresencia Folger (Roper, Leah)
November 18, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Leah M. Roper on behalf of Cresencia Folger (Roper, Leah)
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Lindsay N. Kistler on behalf of McAlester Regional Health Center (Kistler, Lindsay)
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Pending Motions by McAlester Regional Health Center (Turner, Elaine)
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Elaine R. Turner on behalf of McAlester Regional Health Center (Turner, Elaine)
November 14, 2019 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 11/14/2019 in the amount of $400, receipt number AOKEDC-1317799 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by McAlester Regional Health Center (Turner, Elaine)
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, Defendant is directed to pay the $400 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 11/21/2019)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Pittsburg County District Court, case number CJ-2019-143 by McAlester Regional Health Center (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by McAlester Regional Health Center (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
October 28, 2019 AMENDED PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against McAlester Regional Health Center by Cresencia Folger (jcb, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Folger v. McAlester Regional Health Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cresencia Folger
Represented By: Leah M. Roper
Represented By: D. Colby Addison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McAlester Regional Health Center
Represented By: Elaine R. Turner
Represented By: Lindsay N. Kistler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?