Stevenson v. Roll-Offs USA, Incorporated
Plaintiff: Linda Massie Stevenson
Defendant: Roll-Offs USA, Incorporated
Case Number: 6:2019cv00432
Filed: December 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Kimberly E West
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference for 3/30/2020 at 10:30 AM in Chambers, Room 430, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West. The Court will initiate the conference call. Joint Status Report due by 3/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Reassignment Form)(adw, Deputy Clerk)
January 27, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Lindsay N. Kistler on behalf of Roll-Offs USA, Incorporated (Kistler, Lindsay)
January 27, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER with Jury Demand to Complaint (Re: Complaint) by Roll-Offs USA, Incorporated (Turner, Elaine)
January 27, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Elaine R. Turner on behalf of Roll-Offs USA, Incorporated (Turner, Elaine)
January 9, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Roll-Offs USA, Incorporated - Served on 1/6/2020. by Linda Massie Stevenson (Meier, Gregory)
January 2, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Roll-Offs USA, Incorporated (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
December 31, 2019 Filing 4 SERVICE of Complaint by Publication re: Roll-Offs USA, Incorporated - Date of last publication 12/31/2019, by Linda Massie Stevenson (Meier, Gregory)
December 31, 2019 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 12/31/2019 in the amount of $400, receipt number AOKEDC-1328236 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Linda Massie Stevenson (Meier, Gregory)
December 26, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 1/2/2020)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
December 26, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Roll-Offs USA, Incorporated by Linda Massie Stevenson (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
December 26, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Linda Massie Stevenson (jcb, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stevenson v. Roll-Offs USA, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Massie Stevenson
Represented By: Gregory G. Meier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roll-Offs USA, Incorporated
Represented By: Elaine R. Turner
Represented By: Lindsay N. Kistler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?