Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Montgomery
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Wayne Montgomery
Case Number: 6:2019cv00438
Filed: December 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Ronald A White
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:0605
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Wayne Montgomery - Served on 2/22/2020. by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Janis, Ryan)
January 10, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Wayne Montgomery (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
January 10, 2020 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 1/10/2020 in the amount of $400, receipt number AOKEDC-1331026 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Janis, Ryan)
January 6, 2020 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. (Filing Fee due by 1/13/2020)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
December 30, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Wayne Montgomery by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
December 30, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (jcb, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan R. Janis
Represented By: Ryan Janis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?